Melzavin Farms Limited was incorporated on 20 Jun 2005 and issued a business number of 9429034706992. This registered LTD company has been supervised by 2 directors: Gavin Kenley Pendergrast - an active director whose contract began on 20 Jun 2005,
Demelza Marie Pendergrast - an active director whose contract began on 20 Jun 2005.
According to our information (updated on 20 Aug 2024), the company filed 1 address: 415 Cameron Road, Tauranga, Tauranga, 3110 (category: delivery, postal).
Until 20 Mar 2008, Melzavin Farms Limited had been using C/-Walton Railton & Co Ltd, Cnr Eighth Ave & Cameron Road, Tauranga as their physical address.
BizDb found more names for the company: from 27 Mar 2020 to 06 Apr 2020 they were named Melzavin Limited, from 04 Dec 2018 to 27 Mar 2020 they were named Planworks Limited and from 03 Feb 2017 to 04 Dec 2018 they were named Vr-It Limited.
A total of 120 shares are issued to 3 groups (5 shareholders in total). As far as the first group is concerned, 10 shares are held by 1 entity, namely:
Pendergrast, Gavin Kenley (an individual) located at R.d.3, Tauranga.
Then there is a group that consists of 1 shareholder, holds 8.33 per cent shares (exactly 10 shares) and includes
Pendergrast, Demelza Marie - located at R.d.3, Tauranga.
The next share allocation (100 shares, 83.33%) belongs to 3 entities, namely:
Ottoway, Harry John, located at Rd 3, Tauranga (an individual),
Pendergrast, Demelza Marie, located at R.d.3, Tauranga (an individual),
Pendergrast, Gavin Kenley, located at R.d.3, Tauranga (an individual). Melzavin Farms Limited was classified as "Farm animal investment (not actively farming)" (ANZSIC L662065).
Principal place of activity
415 Cameron Road, Tauranga, Tauranga, 3110 New Zealand
Previous addresses
Address #1: C/-walton Railton & Co Ltd, Cnr Eighth Ave & Cameron Road, Tauranga
Physical address used from 06 Sep 2007 to 20 Mar 2008
Address #2: C/-walton Railton & Co Ltd, Cnr 8th Ave & Cameron Road, Tauranga
Registered address used from 15 Mar 2007 to 20 Mar 2008
Address #3: C/-walotn Railton & Co Ltd, Cnr 8th Ave & Cameron Road, Tauranga
Physical address used from 15 Mar 2007 to 06 Sep 2007
Address #4: 1 Alfred Street, Hamilton
Registered & physical address used from 20 Jun 2005 to 15 Mar 2007
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 120
Annual return filing month: August
Annual return last filed: 12 Aug 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 10 | |||
Individual | Pendergrast, Gavin Kenley |
R.d.3 Tauranga New Zealand |
20 Jun 2005 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 10 | |||
Individual | Pendergrast, Demelza Marie |
R.d.3 Tauranga New Zealand |
20 Jun 2005 - |
Shares Allocation #3 Number of Shares: 100 | |||
Individual | Ottoway, Harry John |
Rd 3 Tauranga 3173 New Zealand |
06 Apr 2011 - |
Individual | Pendergrast, Demelza Marie |
R.d.3 Tauranga New Zealand |
20 Jun 2005 - |
Individual | Pendergrast, Gavin Kenley |
R.d.3 Tauranga New Zealand |
20 Jun 2005 - |
Gavin Kenley Pendergrast - Director
Appointment date: 20 Jun 2005
Address: Rd 3, Tauranga, 3173 New Zealand
Address used since 13 Sep 2007
Demelza Marie Pendergrast - Director
Appointment date: 20 Jun 2005
Address: Rd 3, Tauranga, 3173 New Zealand
Address used since 13 Sep 2007
Zj Builders Limited
Suite 1
C A Murray Trustee Company Limited
Suite 1
Belmondo Bakery & Cafe Limited
415 Cameron Road
Pcm Properties Limited
Suite 1
Crows Haulage Limited
Suite 1
E & M Farms Limited
Suite 1
Brightside Estate Limited
247 Cameron Road
Ferncliffe Limited
Suite 3, 13 Mclean Street
Global Genetic Solutions Limited
11a Kulim Avenue
Kaimai Venture Holdings Limited
239b Soldiers Road
Maestro Farms Limited
Flat 2, 144 Third Avenue
Wright's Farm Limited
119 Kayelene Place