Developmentactive Limited was started on 23 Dec 2004 and issued an NZ business identifier of 9429035034902. The registered LTD company has been supervised by 1 director, named Jonathan Ash - an active director whose contract began on 23 Dec 2004.
According to our data (last updated on 08 Aug 2024), this company registered 1 address: 34 Cardigan Street, Arrowtown, Arrowtown, 9302 (type: registered, service).
Up until 12 Apr 2024, Developmentactive Limited had been using 14 Vauxhall Road, Devonport, Auckland as their registered address.
A total of 100 shares are allocated to 3 groups (4 shareholders in total). In the first group, 2 shares are held by 1 entity, namely:
Ash, Jonathan (an individual) located at Arrowtown, Arrowtown postcode 9302.
The 2nd group consists of 1 shareholder, holds 2 per cent shares (exactly 2 shares) and includes
Ash, Kerry - located at Arrowtown, Arrowtown.
The 3rd share allocation (96 shares, 96%) belongs to 2 entities, namely:
Ash, Jonathan, located at Arrowtown, Arrowtown (an individual),
Ash, Kerry, located at Arrowtown, Arrowtown (an individual). Developmentactive Limited was classified as "Management consultancy service" (business classification M696245).
Other active addresses
Address #4: 34 Cardigan Street, Arrowtown, Arrowtown, 9302 New Zealand
Shareregister address used from 26 Mar 2024
Address #5: 34 Cardigan Street, Arrowtown, Arrowtown, 9302 New Zealand
Postal address used from 03 Apr 2024
Address #6: 34 Cardigan Street, Arrowtown, Arrowtown, 9302 New Zealand
Service address used from 05 Apr 2024
Address #7: 34 Cardigan Street, Arrowtown, Arrowtown, 9302 New Zealand
Registered address used from 12 Apr 2024
Principal place of activity
120 St Andrews Road, Epsom, Auckland, 1023 New Zealand
Previous addresses
Address #1: 14 Vauxhall Road, Devonport, Auckland, 0624 New Zealand
Registered address used from 05 May 2016 to 12 Apr 2024
Address #2: 158 Campbell Road, Greenlane, Auckland, 1061 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 04 May 2015 to 05 May 2016
Address #3: 120a St Andrews Rd, Epsom, Auckland New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 01 Jun 2010 to 04 May 2015
Address #4: 120 St Andrews Rd, Epsom, Auckland
Registered & physical address used from 12 Nov 2007 to 01 Jun 2010
Address #5: 24a Pukenui Road, Royal Oak, Auckland
Physical & registered address used from 25 Oct 2006 to 12 Nov 2007
Address #6: 158 Campbell Rd, Greenlane, Auckland
Registered & physical address used from 23 Dec 2004 to 25 Oct 2006
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: April
Annual return last filed: 02 Apr 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 2 | |||
Individual | Ash, Jonathan |
Arrowtown Arrowtown 9302 New Zealand |
23 Dec 2004 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 2 | |||
Individual | Ash, Kerry |
Arrowtown Arrowtown 9302 New Zealand |
23 Dec 2004 - |
Shares Allocation #3 Number of Shares: 96 | |||
Individual | Ash, Jonathan |
Arrowtown Arrowtown 9302 New Zealand |
23 Dec 2004 - |
Individual | Ash, Kerry |
Arrowtown Arrowtown 9302 New Zealand |
23 Dec 2004 - |
Jonathan Ash - Director
Appointment date: 23 Dec 2004
Address: Arrowtown, Arrowtown, 9302 New Zealand
Address used since 12 Apr 2024
Address: Devonport, Auckland, 0624 New Zealand
Address used since 27 Apr 2016
Kanani Dental Care Limited
118b St Andrews Road
Spp Investments Limited
111 St Andrews Road
Celsius Control Limited
111 St Andrews Road
Papaver Limited
113 St Andrews Road
Paja Products Limited
27 Atherton Road
Pure & Fresh Milk Limited
112 St Andrews Road
Apc Consulting Limited
8 Morvern Road
Aplot Trustee Limited
24a Atherton Road
Freight Checker Limited
12c Coronation Road
Kimber Consulting Limited
74 Empire Road
Morrison Engineered Solutions Limited
126b St Andrews Rd
The Krewe Limited
2/9b Watling Street