Elena's Mobile Services Limited was incorporated on 09 Dec 2004 and issued an NZBN of 9429035040699. This registered LTD company has been supervised by 2 directors: Pavel Prokofyev - an active director whose contract began on 02 Jan 2012,
Elena Cairns - an inactive director whose contract began on 09 Dec 2004 and was terminated on 30 Jul 2015.
As stated in our information (updated on 08 Sep 2024), the company uses 1 address: 45 Urlich Drive, Ranui, Auckland, 0612 (category: postal, office).
Up to 14 Sep 2015, Elena's Mobile Services Limited had been using 90, Rosebank Road, Avondale, Auckland, Auckland as their registered address.
BizDb identified former names used by the company: from 30 Jan 2007 to 15 May 2007 they were called Elenas Limited, from 09 Dec 2004 to 30 Jan 2007 they were called Elena's Products Limited.
A total of 100 shares are allotted to 1 group (1 sole shareholder). As far as the first group is concerned, 100 shares are held by 1 entity, namely:
Prokofyev, Pavel (a director) located at Ranui, Auckland postcode 0612. Elena's Mobile Services Limited is categorised as "Accounting service" (ANZSIC M693220).
Principal place of activity
45 Urlich Drive, Ranui, Auckland, 0612 New Zealand
Previous addresses
Address #1: 90, Rosebank Road, Avondale, Auckland, Auckland, 0612 New Zealand
Registered address used from 03 Sep 2015 to 14 Sep 2015
Address #2: 90, Rosebank Road, Avondale,, Auckland, 0612 New Zealand
Physical address used from 03 Sep 2015 to 14 Sep 2015
Address #3: 45 Urlich Drive, Ranui, Auckland, 0612 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 31 Aug 2015 to 03 Sep 2015
Address #4: 90 Rosebank Road, Avondale Auckland New Zealand
Physical address used from 07 Feb 2007 to 31 Aug 2015
Address #5: 60 Stoddard Road, Mt Roskill, Auckland
Physical address used from 22 Jul 2005 to 07 Feb 2007
Address #6: 90, Rosebank Road, Avondale, Auckland
Physical address used from 09 Dec 2004 to 22 Jul 2005
Address #7: 90, Rosebank Road, Avondale, Auckland New Zealand
Registered address used from 09 Dec 2004 to 31 Aug 2015
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: August
Annual return last filed: 06 Sep 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation Number of Shares: 100 | |||
Director | Prokofyev, Pavel |
Ranui Auckland 0612 New Zealand |
22 Aug 2015 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Prokofyev, Pavel |
Ranui Auckland 0612 New Zealand |
06 Jan 2012 - 12 Aug 2012 |
Individual | Cairns, Elena |
Avondale Auckland 1026 New Zealand |
09 Dec 2004 - 22 Aug 2015 |
Individual | Cairns, Anthony |
Avondale, Auckland |
09 Dec 2004 - 06 Jan 2012 |
Individual | Cairns, Anthony |
Avondale Auckland 1026 New Zealand |
12 Aug 2012 - 22 Aug 2015 |
Pavel Prokofyev - Director
Appointment date: 02 Jan 2012
Address: Ranui, Auckland, 0612 New Zealand
Address used since 02 Jan 2012
Elena Cairns - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 09 Dec 2004
Termination date: 30 Jul 2015
Address: Avondale, Auckland, 1026 New Zealand
Address used since 09 Dec 2004
Progressive Building Solutions Limited
45 Urlich Drive
Tipaio Kant Board
39 Urlich Drive
All In Glass Limited
52 Urlich Drive
Panaki Rental Limited
55 Urlich Drive
Purely Massage Limited
3 Mayer Place
Phil Light Limited
70 Urlich Drive
Braemar Consulting Limited
564 Swanson Road
Cbg International Limited
68 Tiriwa Drive
Matrix Business Services Limited
564 Swanson Road
Mba Accounting & Taxation Limited
4 Candia Road
The Now Group Limited
52 Swanson Road
West Auckland Tax Agents Limited
110 Chamberlain Road