Sunblock Tinting Company Limited, a registered company, was started on 15 Oct 2004. 9429035137702 is the NZ business number it was issued. The company has been supervised by 2 directors: Victor Gunyin Chu - an active director whose contract began on 15 Oct 2004,
Raymond Glen Frost - an inactive director whose contract began on 15 Oct 2004 and was terminated on 24 Dec 2004.
Last updated on 19 Aug 2024, our data contains detailed information about 1 address: G/F, 52 Cook Street,, Auckland City (types include: physical, service).
A total of 1000 shares are allocated to 2 shareholders (2 groups). The first group is comprised of 700 shares (70%) held by 1 entity. Next there is the second group which consists of 1 shareholder in control of 300 shares (30%).
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 1000
Annual return filing month: June
Annual return last filed: 30 Jun 2016
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 700 | |||
Individual | Chu, Victor Gunyin |
Auckland City |
15 Oct 2004 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 300 | |||
Individual | Leung, Man Lai |
Bucklands Beach Auckland New Zealand |
02 Oct 2006 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Frost, Raymond Glen |
Auckland City |
15 Oct 2004 - 27 Jun 2010 |
Individual | Lim, Hockgeh |
Auckland City |
15 Oct 2004 - 26 Apr 2006 |
Entity | Tyre Mate (east Tamaki) Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429036958276 Company Number: 1125766 |
15 Oct 2004 - 18 Mar 2005 | |
Entity | Tyre Mate (east Tamaki) Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429036958276 Company Number: 1125766 |
15 Oct 2004 - 18 Mar 2005 |
Victor Gunyin Chu - Director
Appointment date: 15 Oct 2004
Address: Auckland City, Auckland, 1010 New Zealand
Address used since 30 Jun 2016
Raymond Glen Frost - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 15 Oct 2004
Termination date: 24 Dec 2004
Address: Auckland City,
Address used since 15 Oct 2004
Williams Property Group Limited
1/171 Hobson Street
Rw Taupo Limited
171 Hobson Street
Car Lab Limited
183 Hobson Street
Global Fortune Limited
185 Hobson Street
Nz Best Childcare Centres Limited
185 Hobson Street
New Zealand Budget Travel&tours Limited
Flat 1312, 53 Cook Street