Sak Limited, a registered company, was launched on 09 Jul 2004. 9429035292883 is the NZBN it was issued. The company has been run by 2 directors: Steven John Roughan - an active director whose contract began on 09 Jul 2004,
Kim Louise Roughan - an active director whose contract began on 09 Jul 2004.
Last updated on 20 Aug 2024, BizDb's data contains detailed information about 1 address: 19 Tararua Crescent, Otaki, Otaki, 5512 (category: registered, service).
Sak Limited had been using Unit 4, 73 Kenepuru Drive, Porirua as their physical address up to 28 Jul 2016.
A total of 1000 shares are allocated to 2 shareholders (2 groups). The first group includes 1 share (0.1%) held by 1 entity. Next there is the second group which consists of 1 shareholder in control of 999 shares (99.9%).
Previous addresses
Address #1: Unit 4, 73 Kenepuru Drive, Porirua, 5022 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 17 Jul 2013 to 28 Jul 2016
Address #2: Deans & Rees Ltd, Unit 4, 73 Kenepuru Drive, Porirua, 5022 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 02 Aug 2010 to 17 Jul 2013
Address #3: C/-s Johnston Ltd, Chartered Accountants, 1st Floor, 81e Kenepuru Drive, Porirua New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 18 Jul 2007 to 02 Aug 2010
Address #4: C/-s Johnston Ltd, Chartered, Accountants, 1st Floor, 8 Lyttelton, Ave, Porirua City
Physical & registered address used from 09 Jul 2004 to 18 Jul 2007
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 1000
Annual return filing month: July
Annual return last filed: 31 Jul 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 1 | |||
Individual | Roughan, Kim Louise |
Otaki Otaki 5512 New Zealand |
09 Jul 2004 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 999 | |||
Individual | Roughan, Steven John |
Otaki Otaki 5512 New Zealand |
09 Jul 2004 - |
Steven John Roughan - Director
Appointment date: 09 Jul 2004
Address: Otaki, Otaki, 5512 New Zealand
Address used since 31 Jul 2023
Address: Whitby, Wellington, 5024 New Zealand
Address used since 19 Jul 2007
Kim Louise Roughan - Director
Appointment date: 09 Jul 2004
Address: Otaki, Otaki, 5512 New Zealand
Address used since 31 Jul 2023
Address: Whitby, Wellington, 5024 New Zealand
Address used since 11 Jul 2007
Plantation Nz Limited
25 Endeavour Drive
Nexpoint Limited
31 Endeavour Drive
Daz Limited
33 Endeavour Drive
Poise Consulting Limited
22 Port Lane
Reggie Investments Limited
12 Endeavour Drive
Aydlyn Enterprises Limited
14 Endeavour Drive