Chalk Designstudio Limited, a registered company, was launched on 26 Feb 2004. 9429035513681 is the business number it was issued. "Design services nec" (ANZSIC M692435) is how the company is classified. This company has been managed by 1 director, named Monika Conway - an active director whose contract started on 26 Feb 2004.
Updated on 17 Aug 2024, our data contains detailed information about 1 address: 15 Westridge Road, Titirangi, Auckland, 0604 (type: physical, registered).
Chalk Designstudio Limited had been using Level 29, 188 Quay Street, Auckland Central, Auckland as their registered address up until 16 Mar 2021.
A single entity owns all company shares (exactly 100 shares) - Conway, Monika - located at 0604, Titirangi, Auckland.
Principal place of activity
15 Westridge Road, Titirangi, Auckland, 0604 New Zealand
Previous addresses
Address: Level 29, 188 Quay Street, Auckland Central, Auckland, 1010 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 15 Jul 2014 to 16 Mar 2021
Address: Level 6, 51 Shortland Street, Auckland, 1010 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 12 Mar 2014 to 15 Jul 2014
Address: Level 6, 51-53 Shortland Street, Auckland, 1010 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 29 Mar 2011 to 12 Mar 2014
Address: Whk, Level 6, 51-53 Shortland Street, Auckland 1010 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 19 Mar 2010 to 29 Mar 2011
Address: Whk Gosling Chapman, Level 6, 51-53 Shortland Street, Auckland
Registered & physical address used from 06 Mar 2009 to 19 Mar 2010
Address: Whk Gosling Chapman, Level 6, Whk Gosling Chapman Tower, 51-53 Shortland Street, Auckland 1010
Registered & physical address used from 30 Aug 2006 to 06 Mar 2009
Address: C/- Burns Mccurrach, The Top Floor, Citibank Centre, 23 Customs Street East, Auckland City
Registered & physical address used from 17 Mar 2004 to 30 Aug 2006
Address: 2a/3 Edinburgh Street, Newton, Auckland 1001, New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 26 Feb 2004 to 17 Mar 2004
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: March
Annual return last filed: 05 Mar 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation Number of Shares: 100 | |||
Individual | Conway, Monika |
Titirangi Auckland 0604 New Zealand |
26 Feb 2004 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Entity | Bm Trustee Company Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037542641 Company Number: 967934 |
Central Auckland Auckland 1010 New Zealand |
24 Jan 2006 - 05 Mar 2021 |
Individual | Moyes, Nicholas |
Titirangi Waitakere 0604 New Zealand |
26 Feb 2004 - 05 Mar 2021 |
Entity | Bm Trustee Company Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037542641 Company Number: 967934 |
Auckland Central Auckland 1010 New Zealand |
24 Jan 2006 - 05 Mar 2021 |
Individual | Moyes, Nicholas |
Titirangi Waitakere 0604 New Zealand |
26 Feb 2004 - 05 Mar 2021 |
Individual | Moyes, Nicholas |
Titirangi Waitakere 0604 New Zealand |
26 Feb 2004 - 05 Mar 2021 |
Monika Conway - Director
Appointment date: 26 Feb 2004
Address: Titirangi, Auckland, 0604 New Zealand
Address used since 31 Jul 2016
Address: Titirangi, Waitakere, 0604 New Zealand
Address used since 12 Mar 2010
Bucklands Beach Investments Limited
Level 6, 59 High Street
Maui Finance Limited
Level 10, 34 Shortland Street
Rosenthal Trustee Company Limited
Level 14, 34 Shortland Street
Lzy Trustee Company Limited
Level 1, 2 Princes Street
New Zealand Academic And Learning Institute Limited
Level 29, 188 Quay Street
Rennie Cox Trustees No.7 Limited
Level 15, 126 Vincent Street
Boei Solutions Limited
Level 4, 154 Queen Street,
Degree Design Limited
35 High Street
Jacks Ip Limited
Level 1, 171 Hobson Street
North Island Design Limited
Level 4 Unit E2,210 Khyber Pass Rd
The Clean Glass Company Limited
Level 9,45 Queen St
Theia Limited
Level One, 127 Hobson Street