Shamroc Holdings Limited, a registered company, was registered on 15 Jul 2003. 9429035889892 is the business number it was issued. "Gold mining - opencast" (ANZSIC B080420) is how the company was classified. The company has been run by 3 directors: Mark William Dixon - an active director whose contract started on 11 Oct 2022,
Darcy Mark Lucas - an inactive director whose contract started on 15 Jul 2003 and was terminated on 30 Nov 2022,
Donna Marie Meates - an inactive director whose contract started on 15 Jul 2003 and was terminated on 08 Aug 2016.
Updated on 04 Sep 2024, BizDb's data contains detailed information about 1 address: 51 Tancred Street, Hokitika, Hokitika, 7810 (type: service, delivery).
Shamroc Holdings Limited had been using The Hub, Level 1, 525 Cameron Road, Tauranga as their physical address up to 11 Jul 2016.
Old names used by the company, as we found at BizDb, included: from 15 Jul 2003 to 07 Oct 2022 they were named Shamroc Minerals Limited.
A single entity controls all company shares (exactly 4500 shares) - Dixon, Mark - located at 7810, Hokitika, Hokitika.
Other active addresses
Address #4: 51 Tancred Street, Hokitika, Hokitika, 7810 New Zealand
Delivery address used from 04 Jul 2023
Address #5: 51 Tancred Street, Hokitika, Hokitika, 7810 New Zealand
Service address used from 12 Jul 2023
Principal place of activity
26 Whitcombe Terrace, Hokitika, Hokitika, 7810 New Zealand
Previous addresses
Address #1: The Hub, Level 1, 525 Cameron Road, Tauranga, 3144 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 14 Jun 2016 to 11 Jul 2016
Address #2: 90 Second Street, Kumara, 7832 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 19 Jun 2007 to 14 Jun 2016
Address #3: 58 Fifth Street, Kumara, West Coast, South Island
Physical & registered address used from 15 Jul 2003 to 19 Jun 2007
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 9000
Annual return filing month: July
Annual return last filed: 07 Jul 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation Number of Shares: 4500 | |||
Individual | Dixon, Mark |
Hokitika Hokitika 7810 New Zealand |
11 Oct 2022 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Lucas, Darcy Mark |
Hokitika West Coast, South Island |
15 Jul 2003 - 02 Feb 2023 |
Individual | Lucas, Darcy Mark |
Hokitika West Coast, South Island |
15 Jul 2003 - 02 Feb 2023 |
Individual | Meates, Donna Marie |
Kumara 7832 West Coast, South Island New Zealand |
15 Jul 2003 - 11 Apr 2017 |
Mark William Dixon - Director
Appointment date: 11 Oct 2022
Address: Hokitika, Hokitika, 7810 New Zealand
Address used since 11 Oct 2022
Darcy Mark Lucas - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 15 Jul 2003
Termination date: 30 Nov 2022
Address: Hokitika, West Coast, South Island, 7810 New Zealand
Address used since 11 Aug 2015
Donna Marie Meates - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 15 Jul 2003
Termination date: 08 Aug 2016
Address: Kumara 7832, West Coast, South Island, 7832 New Zealand
Address used since 11 Aug 2015
Westland Building Supplies Limited
19 Whitcombe Terrace
Mackay Premises Limited
41 Whitcombe Terrace
Franish Limited
41 Whitcombe Terrace
Style Consulting Limited
41 Whitcombe Terrace
Karere Consultancy Services Limited
11 Bonar Drive
Westland Rural Education Activities Programme Society Incorporated
72 Tudor Street
Blackgold Mining Limited
62 Mehrtens Road
Brownsgold Limited
91 Third Street
Dempster Limited
Level 3, Como House
Double H Mining Limited
Molloy & Associates Ca Limited
Golden Terrace Mining Limited
223 Blue Spur Road
Infants Creek Resources Limited
Rutherglen