Jaytwo Corporation Limited, a registered company, was started on 22 Jan 2003. 9429036166718 is the NZBN it was issued. The company has been supervised by 2 directors: Jose Kristene Green - an active director whose contract began on 22 Jan 2003,
Elizabeth Jo Warren - an inactive director whose contract began on 22 Jan 2003 and was terminated on 01 Jan 2008.
Updated on 22 Jul 2024, our database contains detailed information about 1 address: Unit 5, 6 Tukorako Drive, Mount Maunganui, 3116 (types include: physical, registered).
Jaytwo Corporation Limited had been using 9 Prince Avenue, Mount Maunganui, Mount Maunganui as their registered address until 21 Mar 2017.
One entity controls all company shares (exactly 100 shares) - Green, Jose Kristene - located at 3116, Mount Maunganui.
Previous addresses
Address: 9 Prince Avenue, Mount Maunganui, Mount Maunganui, 3116 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 03 Dec 2013 to 21 Mar 2017
Address: Second Floor, 60 Durham Street, Tauranga, 3110 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 31 May 2013 to 03 Dec 2013
Address: Ingham Mora Ltd, 2nd Floor Realty House, 60 Durham Street, Tauranga New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 17 May 2004 to 31 May 2013
Address: Jb Lloyd Chartered Accountants Ltd, Rendells Building, 155 Maunganui Road, Mount Maunganui
Registered & physical address used from 22 Jan 2003 to 17 May 2004
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: March
Annual return last filed: 26 Mar 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation Number of Shares: 100 | |||
Individual | Green, Jose Kristene |
Mount Maunganui 3116 New Zealand |
22 Jan 2003 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Warren, Elizabeth Jo |
Mount Maunganui |
22 Jan 2003 - 25 Jan 2008 |
Jose Kristene Green - Director
Appointment date: 22 Jan 2003
Address: Mount Maunganui, Mount Maunganui, 3116 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Jan 2016
Elizabeth Jo Warren - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 22 Jan 2003
Termination date: 01 Jan 2008
Address: Mount Maunganui,
Address used since 22 Jan 2003
Rjr Holdings Limited
Unit 5, 6 Tukorako Drive
Jro Limited
Unit 5, 6 Tukorako Drive
A & K Cozi Limited
Unit 5, 6 Tukorako Drive
Total Business Accounting Limited
Unit 5, 6 Tukorako Drive
Acme Properties Limited
Unit 5, 6 Tukorako Drive
Palm Beach Realty Limited
Unit 5, 6 Tukorako Drive