K & L Services 2000 Limited, a registered company, was started on 14 Nov 2002. 9429036250295 is the New Zealand Business Number it was issued. "Windscreen repairing" (business classification S941280) is how the company has been classified. The company has been run by 1 director, named Lindsay Todd Rabbitte - an active director whose contract began on 14 Nov 2002.
Last updated on 29 Aug 2024, the BizDb data contains detailed information about 1 address: 60 Oxford Street, Te Puke, Te Puke, 3119 (type: registered, physical).
K & L Services 2000 Limited had been using 97 Edgecumbe Road, Tauranga, Tauranga as their registered address up to 10 Nov 2017.
Other names used by this company, as we identified at BizDb, included: from 16 May 2016 to 07 Dec 2017 they were called Custom Mattresses Limited, from 16 Mar 2010 to 16 May 2016 they were called South Auckland Windscreens (2000) Limited and from 09 Mar 2010 to 16 Mar 2010 they were called 18 Volts Limited.
A total of 100 shares are allotted to 4 shareholders (3 groups). The first group consists of 1 share (1 per cent) held by 1 entity. Next there is the second group which includes 2 shareholders in control of 90 shares (90 per cent). Finally the third share allotment (9 shares 9 per cent) made up of 1 entity.
Principal place of activity
60 Oxford Street, Te Puke, Tauranga, 3119 New Zealand
Previous addresses
Address #1: 97 Edgecumbe Road, Tauranga, Tauranga, 3110 New Zealand
Registered address used from 11 Jan 2017 to 10 Nov 2017
Address #2: 120 Eleventh Avenue, Tauranga, Tauranga, 3110 New Zealand
Registered address used from 09 Dec 2015 to 11 Jan 2017
Address #3: 146 Ranginui Road, Rd 5, Tauranga, 3175 New Zealand
Physical address used from 09 Dec 2015 to 28 Jun 2017
Address #4: 15 Castellina Drive, Karaka, 2580 New Zealand
Physical address used from 25 May 2015 to 09 Dec 2015
Address #5: 15 Castellina Drive, Karaka, Papakura, 2113 New Zealand
Physical address used from 22 May 2015 to 25 May 2015
Address #6: 13a Alma Crescent, Papakura New Zealand
Physical address used from 22 Oct 2008 to 22 May 2015
Address #7: 16 Ryan Place, Manukau New Zealand
Registered address used from 22 Oct 2008 to 09 Dec 2015
Address #8: 190 Flanagan Road, Drury
Registered address used from 02 Dec 2003 to 22 Oct 2008
Address #9: 190 Flangan Road, Drury
Physical address used from 02 Dec 2003 to 22 Oct 2008
Address #10: 13 Alma Crescent, Papakura
Physical & registered address used from 14 Nov 2002 to 02 Dec 2003
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: November
Annual return last filed: 28 Nov 2023
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 1 | |||
Individual | Rabbitte, Kathryn Patricia |
Te Puke Te Puke 3119 New Zealand |
03 Nov 2015 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 90 | |||
Individual | Rabbitte, Lindsay Todd |
Te Puke Te Puke 3119 New Zealand |
14 Nov 2002 - |
Individual | Rabbitte, Kathryn Patricia |
Te Puke Te Puke 3119 New Zealand |
03 Nov 2015 - |
Shares Allocation #3 Number of Shares: 9 | |||
Individual | Rabbitte, Lindsay Todd |
Te Puke Te Puke 3119 New Zealand |
14 Nov 2002 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Rabbitte, Julia |
Papakura |
14 Nov 2002 - 29 Oct 2004 |
Entity | Annette Giles Trustee Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429036071364 Company Number: 1285254 |
06 Jun 2006 - 10 Feb 2014 | |
Entity | Ag Trustee Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429034848128 Company Number: 1618174 |
10 Feb 2014 - 05 Sep 2014 | |
Individual | Rabbitte, Janice |
Papakura |
14 Nov 2002 - 03 Nov 2015 |
Entity | Ag Trustee Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429034848128 Company Number: 1618174 |
10 Feb 2014 - 05 Sep 2014 | |
Entity | Annette Giles Trustee Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429036071364 Company Number: 1285254 |
06 Jun 2006 - 10 Feb 2014 |
Lindsay Todd Rabbitte - Director
Appointment date: 14 Nov 2002
Address: Te Puke, 3119 New Zealand
Address used since 20 Jun 2017
Te Puke Tigers Rugby League Club Incorporated
85 Boucher Ave
Omc Investments Limited
7 Otawa Street
Plastertec 2008 Limited
111 Boucher Avenue
Uli Holdings Limited
Fenton Mc Fadden
Mnm Design Limited
123 Boucher Avenue
The Life Foundation Trust
74 Boucher Avenue
Bay Of Plenty Windscreens (2017) Limited
70 Albert Park Drive
Bj & Gj Switalla Limited
8 More Close
One Stop Auto Limited
60 Bryant Road
Rotorua Windscreens And Glass Limited
C/o David Russell & Co Limited
Stieger Armoured 2016 Limited
31a North Ridge Drive
Yosemite Limited
14 Merlot Place