Vr Concepts Limited was registered on 08 Aug 2002 and issued an NZ business number of 9429036382071. The registered LTD company has been supervised by 2 directors: Mathew John Keech - an active director whose contract started on 08 Aug 2002,
Anthony Ernest Birchall - an inactive director whose contract started on 08 Aug 2002 and was terminated on 20 Aug 2004.
According to BizDb's database (last updated on 06 Aug 2024), the company registered 4 addresses: 2/168 Rangitikei Street, Palmerston North, 4412 (office address),
166 Rangitkei Street, Unit 3, Palmerston North, 4412 (service address),
166 Rangitkei Street, Unit 3, Palmerston North, 4412 (registered address),
166 Rangitikei Street, Palmerston North, Palmerston North, 4410 (postal address) among others.
Up until 18 Jul 2022, Vr Concepts Limited had been using 2/168 Rangitkei Street, Palmerston North as their registered address.
A total of 100 shares are issued to 2 groups (2 shareholders in total). As far as the first group is concerned, 1 share is held by 1 entity, namely:
Keech, Elgene (an individual) located at Awapuni, Palmerston North postcode 4412.
The 2nd group consists of 1 shareholder, holds 99% shares (exactly 99 shares) and includes
Keech, Mathew John - located at Awapuni, Palmerston North. Vr Concepts Limited has been classified as "Computer retailing" (ANZSIC G422210).
Other active addresses
Principal place of activity
2/168 Rangitikei Street, Palmerston North, 4412 New Zealand
Previous addresses
Address #1: 2/168 Rangitkei Street, Palmerston North New Zealand
Registered address used from 23 Jun 2010 to 18 Jul 2022
Address #2: 2/168 Rangitikei Street, Palmerston North New Zealand
Physical address used from 28 Jul 2008 to 18 Jul 2022
Address #3: 16 Capri Place, Palmerston North
Physical address used from 14 Oct 2005 to 28 Jul 2008
Address #4: 16 Capri Place, Palmerston North
Registered address used from 14 Oct 2005 to 23 Jun 2010
Address #5: 9 Fairview Avenue, Feilding
Physical & registered address used from 08 Aug 2002 to 14 Oct 2005
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: July
Annual return last filed: 01 Jul 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 1 | |||
Individual | Keech, Elgene |
Awapuni Palmerston North 4412 New Zealand |
19 Mar 2020 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 99 | |||
Individual | Keech, Mathew John |
Awapuni Palmerston North 4412 New Zealand |
08 Aug 2002 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Birchall, Anthony Ernest |
, Feilding |
08 Aug 2002 - 20 Aug 2004 |
Mathew John Keech - Director
Appointment date: 08 Aug 2002
Address: Awapuni, Palmerston North, 4412 New Zealand
Address used since 14 Jul 2015
Anthony Ernest Birchall - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 08 Aug 2002
Termination date: 20 Aug 2004
Address: , Feilding,
Address used since 08 Aug 2002
Green Heart Productions Trust
160 Rangitikei Street
Leader & Watt (levin) Limited
157 Rangitikei St
Leader & Watt Limited
157 Rangitikei St
Frontal Limited
Level 8, 65 Rangitikei Street
Corporate Grooming Limited
C/-62c Manawatu Street
Fr Trustee Company 3 Limited
Level 8, 65 Rangitikei Street
Enhanced Solutions Limited
29c Mchardie Road
Feilding Computers Limited
37 Kimbolton Road
Mainbeam Limited
44 French Street
Net Trust Limited
18 Viking Street
Tech Success Limited
31 Philip Street
Twisted Nz Limited
6 Kittyhawk Row