Tv & Mk Troughton Limited, a registered company, was launched on 22 Jul 2002. 9429036416936 is the NZ business identifier it was issued. "Dairy cattle farming" (ANZSIC A016010) is how the company is categorised. The company has been managed by 2 directors: Margaret Kempthorne Troughton - an active director whose contract started on 22 Jul 2002,
Terence Victor Troughton - an active director whose contract started on 22 Jul 2002.
Updated on 27 Jul 2024, our database contains detailed information about 1 address: 101 Arawa Street, Matamata, 3400 (type: registered, physical).
Tv & Mk Troughton Limited had been using Harris Prevett & Alexander, 101 Arawa Street,, Matamata as their registered address up until 07 Oct 2013.
A total of 10000 shares are allocated to 8 shareholders (4 groups). The first group consists of 9000 shares (90%) held by 3 entities. There is also a second group which consists of 3 shareholders in control of 998 shares (9.98%). Lastly the third share allocation (1 share 0.01%) made up of 1 entity.
Previous address
Address: Harris Prevett & Alexander, 101 Arawa Street,, Matamata New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 22 Jul 2002 to 07 Oct 2013
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 10000
Annual return filing month: September
Annual return last filed: 24 Sep 2023
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 9000 | |||
Individual | Troughton, Margaret Kempthorne |
Waharoa |
22 Jul 2002 - |
Entity (NZ Limited Company) | Atca Troughton Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429050376933 |
Matamata Matamata 3400 New Zealand |
17 Oct 2022 - |
Individual | Troughton, Terence Victor |
Waharoa |
22 Jul 2002 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 998 | |||
Entity (NZ Limited Company) | Atca Troughton Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429050376933 |
Matamata Matamata 3400 New Zealand |
17 Oct 2022 - |
Individual | Troughton, Terence Victor |
Waharoa |
22 Jul 2002 - |
Individual | Troughton, Margaret Kempthorne |
Waharoa |
22 Jul 2002 - |
Shares Allocation #3 Number of Shares: 1 | |||
Individual | Troughton, Terence Victor |
Waharoa |
22 Jul 2002 - |
Shares Allocation #4 Number of Shares: 1 | |||
Individual | Troughton, Margaret Kempthorne |
Waharoa |
22 Jul 2002 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Troughton, Terrence Victor |
Matamata Matamata 3400 New Zealand |
29 Apr 2011 - 17 Oct 2022 |
Individual | Troughton, Terrence Victor |
Matamata Matamata 3400 New Zealand |
29 Apr 2011 - 17 Oct 2022 |
Individual | Alexander, Russell Ian |
Matamata Matamata 3400 New Zealand |
29 Apr 2011 - 17 Oct 2022 |
Individual | Alexander, Russell Ian |
Matamata Matamata 3400 New Zealand |
29 Apr 2011 - 17 Oct 2022 |
Individual | Troughton, Margaret |
Matamata Matamata 3400 New Zealand |
29 Apr 2011 - 17 Oct 2022 |
Individual | Troughton, Margaret |
Matamata Matamata 3400 New Zealand |
29 Apr 2011 - 17 Oct 2022 |
Margaret Kempthorne Troughton - Director
Appointment date: 22 Jul 2002
Address: Waharoa, 3471 New Zealand
Address used since 17 Jul 2015
Terence Victor Troughton - Director
Appointment date: 22 Jul 2002
Address: Waharoa, 3471 New Zealand
Address used since 17 Jul 2015
Emblem Sphere Limited
101 Arawa Street
Rangiriri Consultants Limited
101 Arawa Street
AgapĒ Osteopathic Healthcare Limited
101 Arawa Street
Semmens Dairying Limited
101 Arawa Street
Melessa Henderson Ca Limited
101 Arawa Street
Muscle Car Fabrications 2012 Limited
101 Arawa Street
Ar & Tk Morris Limited
101 Arawa Street
Chimme Farms Limited
101 Arawa Street
Jfc & Md Armstrong Farms Limited
101 Arawa Street
Semmens Holdings Limited
101 Arawa Street
Wagonwheel Dairy Limited
101 Arawa Street
Waitarere Farms Limited
101 Arawa Street