Agenda Clothing Limited was incorporated on 18 Sep 2001 and issued a business number of 9429036768677. The registered LTD company has been supervised by 2 directors: Robert Paul Thorne - an active director whose contract started on 18 Sep 2001,
Frances Thorne - an inactive director whose contract started on 18 Sep 2001 and was terminated on 01 Mar 2015.
According to our information (last updated on 20 Jul 2024), the company uses 1 address: 7/45 William Souter Street, Forrest Hill, Auckland, 0620 (category: registered, physical).
Until 19 May 2014, Agenda Clothing Limited had been using Unit D 50 Lake Rd, Northcote, Auckland as their physical address.
BizDb identified previous names for the company: from 29 Jul 2006 to 12 Mar 2008 they were named Rafini Limited, from 18 Sep 2001 to 29 Jul 2006 they were named Yendells Limited.
A total of 100 shares are allotted to 2 groups (2 shareholders in total). As far as the first group is concerned, 50 shares are held by 1 entity, namely:
Thorne, Frances (an individual) located at Castor Bay, Auckland.
Another group consists of 1 shareholder, holds 50% shares (exactly 50 shares) and includes
Thorne, Robert Paul - located at Castor Bay, Auckland. Agenda Clothing Limited has been classified as "Interior painting and decorating" (business classification E324415).
Principal place of activity
7/45 William Souter Street,, Forrest Hill, Auckland, 0620 New Zealand
Previous addresses
Address: Unit D 50 Lake Rd, Northcote, Auckland, 0741 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 12 Jun 2013 to 19 May 2014
Address: 107 Braemar Road, Castor Bay, Auckland, 0620 New Zealand
Physical address used from 20 Jul 2012 to 12 Jun 2013
Address: 112 Kitchener Road, Milford, Auckland, 0620 New Zealand
Physical address used from 14 Jun 2011 to 20 Jul 2012
Address: 112 Kitchener Road, Milford, Auckland, 0620 New Zealand
Registered address used from 14 Jun 2011 to 12 Jun 2013
Address: Kanu Jeram, 166 Kitchener Road, Milford, Auckland New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 18 Sep 2001 to 14 Jun 2011
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: June
Annual return last filed: 05 Jun 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 50 | |||
Individual | Thorne, Frances |
Castor Bay Auckland |
18 Sep 2001 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 50 | |||
Individual | Thorne, Robert Paul |
Castor Bay Auckland |
18 Sep 2001 - |
Robert Paul Thorne - Director
Appointment date: 18 Sep 2001
Address: Castor Bay, Auckland, 0620 New Zealand
Address used since 18 Sep 2001
Frances Thorne - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 18 Sep 2001
Termination date: 01 Mar 2015
Address: Castor Bay, Auckland, 0620 New Zealand
Address used since 18 Sep 2001
Ma Plumbing Limited
1/20 Morton Ave
Top Notch Investments Limited
268 East Coast Road
Bolstad Holdings Limited
Flat 3, 38 William Souter Street
Cazy Limited
14c Morton Avenue
Mcphee Holdings Limited
268 East Coast Road
Xperienz Limited
21a Morton Avenue
Asap Decorative Specialists Limited
44k Constellation Drive
Designer Decorating Limited
C/- Middleton Holland & Associates Ltd
Dr Painter & Decorator Company Limited
61b Newhaven Terrace
Mckenzie Decorators Limited
3a Castor Bay Road
Paku Ventures Limited
Unit F, Block 2
Sweet Actions Limited
165 Target Road