Bonz Limited was started on 18 Sep 2001 and issued an NZ business identifier of 9429036793723. The registered LTD company has been run by 3 directors: Roland Paul Louis Leemans - an active director whose contract started on 18 Sep 2001,
Roland Leemans - an active director whose contract started on 18 Sep 2001,
Henrik Arlund - an active director whose contract started on 18 Sep 2001.
According to our data (last updated on 17 Aug 2024), the company uses 1 address: Po Box 13381, Tauranga Central, Tauranga, 3141 (types include: postal, office).
Until 27 Mar 2020, Bonz Limited had been using Cessna House, 1 Cessna Place, 3116 Mount Maunganui as their physical address.
BizDb found other names for the company: from 28 May 2018 to 21 Aug 2019 they were named Tourevolution Limited, from 05 Apr 2018 to 28 May 2018 they were named Blue Ocean Marketing Limited and from 18 Sep 2001 to 05 Apr 2018 they were named Tourevolution Limited.
A total of 1000 shares are allotted to 4 groups (4 shareholders in total). When considering the first group, 499 shares are held by 1 entity, namely:
Avaro Limited (an entity) located at Tauranga, Tauranga postcode 3110.
The 2nd group consists of 1 shareholder, holds 49.9 per cent shares (exactly 499 shares) and includes
Arman Limited - located at Tauranga.
The next share allocation (1 share, 0.1%) belongs to 1 entity, namely:
Arlund, Henrik, located at Tauranga, Tauranga (an individual). Bonz Limited is classified as "Marketing consultancy service" (business classification M696252).
Principal place of activity
1 Cessna Place, Mount Maunganui, Mount Maunganui, 3116 New Zealand
Previous addresses
Address #1: Cessna House, 1 Cessna Place, 3116 Mount Maunganui New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 03 Oct 2007 to 27 Mar 2020
Address #2: Suite 23, 61 Maleme Street, Greerton, Tauranga
Physical & registered address used from 11 Aug 2004 to 03 Oct 2007
Address #3: 19 Cliff Road, St Heliers, Auckland
Registered & physical address used from 05 Sep 2003 to 11 Aug 2004
Address #4: 8 Renown Avenue, Greenlane, Auckland, New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 18 Sep 2001 to 05 Sep 2003
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 1000
Annual return filing month: August
Annual return last filed: 05 Aug 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 499 | |||
Entity (NZ Limited Company) | Avaro Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429041632376 |
Tauranga Tauranga 3110 New Zealand |
19 Mar 2015 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 499 | |||
Entity (NZ Limited Company) | Arman Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429030103047 |
Tauranga 3110 New Zealand |
12 Aug 2013 - |
Shares Allocation #3 Number of Shares: 1 | |||
Individual | Arlund, Henrik |
Tauranga Tauranga 3110 New Zealand |
18 Sep 2001 - |
Shares Allocation #4 Number of Shares: 1 | |||
Individual | Leemans, Roland |
Tauranga Tauranga 3110 New Zealand |
18 Sep 2001 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Henrik Arlund And Jonathan Bloore, Jointly |
Mount Maunganui Mount Maunganui 3116 New Zealand |
12 Aug 2013 - 12 Aug 2013 |
Roland Paul Louis Leemans - Director
Appointment date: 18 Sep 2001
Address: Tauranga, Tauranga, 3110 New Zealand
Address used since 19 Mar 2020
Roland Leemans - Director
Appointment date: 18 Sep 2001
Address: Tauranga, Tauranga, 3110 New Zealand
Address used since 19 Mar 2020
Address: 1 Cessna Place, Mount Maunganui, 3116 New Zealand
Address used since 04 Aug 2015
Henrik Arlund - Director
Appointment date: 18 Sep 2001
Address: Tauranga, Tauranga, 3110 New Zealand
Address used since 19 Mar 2020
Address: Mount Maunganui, Mount Maunganui, 3116 New Zealand
Address used since 05 Aug 2013
Bop Gear Cutters 1996 Limited
33 Aviation Avenue
Tauranga Tooling Services Limited
56b Aviation Ave
Tauriko Business Holdings Limited
Unit 5 -45 Aviation Drive
Ted Cowin Plumbing Limited
45 Aviation Avenue
General Industrial And Commercial Limited
45 Aviation Ave
Mega Pacific Nz Pty Ltd
53 Aviation Avenue
Impact383 Limited
383 Maunganui Road
Lit Marketing Limited
55 Ascot Road
Moods Digital Limited
Suite 6, 22 Hull Road
Optimise Enterprises Limited
Level 1, 120 Eleventh Avenue
Wayfarer Digital Limited
17c Ross Road
Zeal Solutions Limited
160 Valley Road