Fertco Limited was registered on 05 Jul 2001 and issued an NZBN of 9429036861392. This registered LTD company has been managed by 10 directors: Robert Selwyn Phillips - an active director whose contract started on 05 Jul 2001,
Ross Laurence Karl - an active director whose contract started on 05 Jul 2001,
Kane Gordon Titchener - an active director whose contract started on 07 Feb 2019,
Philip Brent Wheeler - an inactive director whose contract started on 01 Sep 2003 and was terminated on 28 Feb 2022,
Ken William Titchener - an inactive director whose contract started on 21 Sep 2001 and was terminated on 08 Feb 2019.
As stated in BizDb's information (updated on 18 Jul 2024), the company registered 1 address: 20A Jean Batten Drive, Mount Maunganui, Mount Maunganui, 3116 (type: postal, delivery).
Up until 27 Jul 2015, Fertco Limited had been using 119 Aviation Avenue, Mount Maunganui, Mount Maunganui as their physical address.
BizDb found other names used by the company: from 05 Jul 2001 to 19 Jul 2001 they were called Fertco (2001) Limited.
A total of 1369244 shares are allocated to 13 groups (22 shareholders in total). In the first group, 16483 shares are held by 1 entity, namely:
Voyce, Carter (an individual) located at Papamoa Beach, Papamoa postcode 3118.
The second group consists of 1 shareholder, holds 6.73 per cent shares (exactly 92116 shares) and includes
Titchener, Kane - located at Rd 3, Te Awamutu.
The next share allotment (5615 shares, 0.41%) belongs to 2 entities, namely:
Watts, Jan Maree, located at Papamoa, Papamoa (an individual),
Nikki Burley Trustees (2004) Limited, located at 41 Monmouth Street, Tauranga (an entity).
Principal place of activity
119 Aviation Avenue, Mount Maunganui, Mount Maunganui, 3116 New Zealand
Previous addresses
Address #1: 119 Aviation Avenue, Mount Maunganui, Mount Maunganui, 3116 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 10 Sep 2010 to 27 Jul 2015
Address #2: Staples Rodway Tauranga Limited, 132 First Avenue, Tauranga New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 26 Sep 2007 to 10 Sep 2010
Address #3: 119c Aviation Avenue, Mount Maunganui, Tauranga
Registered & physical address used from 05 Jul 2001 to 26 Sep 2007
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 1369244
Annual return filing month: October
Annual return last filed: 10 Oct 2023
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 16483 | |||
Individual | Voyce, Carter |
Papamoa Beach Papamoa 3118 New Zealand |
26 Sep 2014 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 92116 | |||
Individual | Titchener, Kane |
Rd 3 Te Awamutu 3873 New Zealand |
26 Sep 2014 - |
Shares Allocation #3 Number of Shares: 5615 | |||
Individual | Watts, Jan Maree |
Papamoa Papamoa 3118 New Zealand |
01 Nov 2010 - |
Entity (NZ Limited Company) | Nikki Burley Trustees (2004) Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429035401483 |
41 Monmouth Street Tauranga 3141 New Zealand |
01 Nov 2010 - |
Shares Allocation #4 Number of Shares: 11283 | |||
Individual | Marles, Andrew |
Rd6 Tauranga 3176 New Zealand |
01 Nov 2010 - |
Individual | Collins-marles, Audrey |
Rd6 Tauranga 3176 New Zealand |
01 Nov 2010 - |
Shares Allocation #5 Number of Shares: 5789 | |||
Individual | Storer, Beverly Kay |
Rd1 Tauranga 3171 New Zealand |
01 Nov 2010 - |
Individual | Storer, Leslie Ronald |
Rd1 Tauranga 3171 New Zealand |
01 Nov 2010 - |
Shares Allocation #6 Number of Shares: 63725 | |||
Individual | Phillips, Carol Frances |
Rd7 Otorohanga New Zealand |
10 Oct 2007 - |
Shares Allocation #7 Number of Shares: 40293 | |||
Individual | Phillips, Lance |
Rd 2 Otorohanga 3972 New Zealand |
05 Jul 2001 - |
Shares Allocation #8 Number of Shares: 267773 | |||
Individual | Titchener, Lois Sylvia |
Rd5 Te Awamutu 3875 New Zealand |
05 Jul 2001 - |
Individual | Titchener, Ken William |
Rd5 Te Awamutu 3875 New Zealand |
05 Jul 2001 - |
Shares Allocation #9 Number of Shares: 103321 | |||
Individual | Phillips, Robert Selwyn |
Rd2 Otorohanga 3972 New Zealand |
05 Jul 2001 - |
Entity (NZ Limited Company) | Bailey Ingham Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429038320804 |
Otorohanga 3900 New Zealand |
05 Jul 2001 - |
Shares Allocation #10 Number of Shares: 201690 | |||
Individual | Karl, Ross Laurence |
397 Swarbrick Drive Te Awamutu 3800 New Zealand |
05 Jul 2001 - |
Individual | Karl, Mary Florence |
397 Swarbrick Drive Te Awamutu 3800 New Zealand |
05 Jul 2001 - |
Shares Allocation #11 Number of Shares: 255918 | |||
Individual | Empson, Philip James |
Rd5 Te Awamutu |
05 Jul 2001 - |
Entity (NZ Limited Company) | Redoubt Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429038231841 |
Te Awamutu Te Awamutu 3800 New Zealand |
05 Jul 2001 - |
Shares Allocation #12 Number of Shares: 25258 | |||
Entity (NZ Limited Company) | Brent Wheeler Group Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429030330115 |
Mosgiel Mosgiel 9024 New Zealand |
29 Sep 2014 - |
Shares Allocation #13 Number of Shares: 279980 | |||
Individual | Voyce, Margaret Cecilia Galafres |
Mount Maunganui Mount Maunganui 3116 New Zealand |
28 Apr 2023 - |
Individual | Voyce, Warwick George |
Mt Maunganui Tauranga 3116 New Zealand |
02 Nov 2009 - |
Entity (NZ Limited Company) | Pingao Trustee 105 Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429047963320 |
525 Cameron Road Tauranga 3110 New Zealand |
28 Apr 2023 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Williams, Robert John |
Rangatira Park Taupo 3330 New Zealand |
02 Nov 2009 - 28 Apr 2023 |
Entity | Fertco Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429036861392 Company Number: 1145889 |
Mount Maunganui Mount Maunganui 3116 New Zealand |
30 Aug 2012 - 21 Sep 2021 |
Individual | Karl, Michael John |
Te Awamutu Te Awamutu 3800 New Zealand |
05 Jul 2001 - 27 Feb 2018 |
Individual | Bason, Bruce William |
Rd7 Hamilton 3287 New Zealand |
01 Nov 2010 - 30 Aug 2012 |
Individual | Williams, Robert John |
Rangatira Park Taupo 3330 New Zealand |
02 Nov 2009 - 28 Apr 2023 |
Individual | Bason, Julie Heather |
Rd7 Hamilton 3287 New Zealand |
01 Nov 2010 - 30 Aug 2012 |
Entity | Holland Beckett Trustee No.14 Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429041065730 Company Number: 4911799 |
Tauranga Tauranga 3110 New Zealand |
06 Nov 2014 - 28 Apr 2023 |
Entity | Holland Beckett Trustee No.14 Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429041065730 Company Number: 4911799 |
Tauranga Tauranga 3110 New Zealand |
06 Nov 2014 - 28 Apr 2023 |
Entity | Fertco Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429036861392 Company Number: 1145889 |
28 Apr 2023 - 28 Apr 2023 | |
Individual | Williams, Diane Joan |
Maungatapu Tauranga New Zealand |
02 Nov 2009 - 28 Apr 2023 |
Individual | Williams, Diane Joan |
Maungatapu Tauranga New Zealand |
02 Nov 2009 - 28 Apr 2023 |
Entity | Alice Consulting Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429032440621 Company Number: 2198395 |
Tauranga Tauranga 3110 New Zealand |
01 Jul 2016 - 18 Mar 2019 |
Entity | Waitioka Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429030207004 Company Number: 4459645 |
18 Mar 2019 - 05 Oct 2020 | |
Individual | King, Francis William |
Matua Tauranga 3110 New Zealand |
05 Jul 2001 - 25 May 2016 |
Individual | Kapene, Raymond Puhitai |
Rd3 Te Puke 3183 New Zealand |
01 Nov 2010 - 11 May 2016 |
Entity | Alice Consulting Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429032440621 Company Number: 2198395 |
Tauranga Tauranga 3110 New Zealand |
01 Jul 2016 - 18 Mar 2019 |
Individual | Nabbs, Brian Stewart |
Hamilton 3283 New Zealand |
01 Nov 2010 - 30 Aug 2012 |
Individual | Baron, Mark |
700 -401 West Georgia St, Vancouver V6b 5a1, Canada |
05 Jul 2001 - 01 Nov 2010 |
Individual | Wheeler, Philip Brent |
Roslyn Dunedin 9010 New Zealand |
26 Sep 2014 - 29 Sep 2014 |
Individual | Watson, Joanna Margaret |
7 Tuhoro Street Otorohanga |
10 Oct 2007 - 25 Nov 2009 |
Entity | Fertco Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429036861392 Company Number: 1145889 |
Mount Maunganui Mount Maunganui 3116 New Zealand |
30 Aug 2012 - 21 Sep 2021 |
Entity | Fertco Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429036861392 Company Number: 1145889 |
Mount Maunganui Mount Maunganui 3116 New Zealand |
30 Aug 2012 - 21 Sep 2021 |
Entity | Fertco Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429036861392 Company Number: 1145889 |
Mount Maunganui Mount Maunganui 3116 New Zealand |
30 Aug 2012 - 21 Sep 2021 |
Individual | Henderson, Joan Elizabeth |
Tauranga |
05 Jul 2001 - 02 Oct 2008 |
Entity | Sharp Tudhope Trustee Services No 3 Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429036666416 Company Number: 1181261 |
05 Jul 2001 - 02 Oct 2008 | |
Individual | Mcmillin, David |
Papamoa Beach Papamoa 3118 New Zealand |
26 Sep 2014 - 03 Sep 2018 |
Individual | Voyce, Lauren Marie |
Papamoa New Zealand |
02 Nov 2009 - 15 Aug 2014 |
Individual | King, Peggy Charene |
Matua Tauranga 3110 New Zealand |
05 Jul 2001 - 06 Nov 2014 |
Entity | Waitioka Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429030207004 Company Number: 4459645 |
Tauranga Tauranga 3110 New Zealand |
18 Mar 2019 - 05 Oct 2020 |
Individual | Crouch, Poppy Louise |
Papamoa New Zealand |
02 Nov 2009 - 02 Mar 2018 |
Entity | Enterprise Trustee Company Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037928070 Company Number: 891221 |
05 Jul 2001 - 23 Jul 2015 | |
Director | Philip Brent Wheeler |
Roslyn Dunedin 9010 New Zealand |
26 Sep 2014 - 29 Sep 2014 |
Individual | Kapene, Malise Whakauru |
Rd3 Te Puke 3183 New Zealand |
01 Nov 2010 - 11 May 2016 |
Individual | Henderson, Donald Edgar |
Tauranga |
05 Jul 2001 - 02 Oct 2008 |
Individual | Phillips, Carol Frances |
Rd2 Otorohanga 3972 |
05 Jul 2001 - 02 Oct 2008 |
Entity | Sharp Tudhope Trustee Services No 3 Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429036666416 Company Number: 1181261 |
05 Jul 2001 - 02 Oct 2008 | |
Entity | Enterprise Trustee Company Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037928070 Company Number: 891221 |
05 Jul 2001 - 23 Jul 2015 |
Robert Selwyn Phillips - Director
Appointment date: 05 Jul 2001
Address: Rd 2, Otorohanga, 3972 New Zealand
Address used since 21 Sep 2009
Ross Laurence Karl - Director
Appointment date: 05 Jul 2001
Address: 387 Swarbrick Drive - 69 Pohutukawa Dr, Te Awamutu, 3800 New Zealand
Address used since 02 May 2023
Address: Rd3, Ohaupo, Te Awamutu 3883, 3883 New Zealand
Address used since 11 May 2016
Kane Gordon Titchener - Director
Appointment date: 07 Feb 2019
Address: Rd 3, Te Awamutu, 3873 New Zealand
Address used since 15 Oct 2021
Address: Te Awamutu, Te Awamutu, 3800 New Zealand
Address used since 07 Feb 2019
Philip Brent Wheeler - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 01 Sep 2003
Termination date: 28 Feb 2022
Address: Mosgiel, Mosgiel, 9024 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Dec 2017
Address: Tainui, Dunedin, 9013 New Zealand
Address used since 11 May 2016
Ken William Titchener - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 21 Sep 2001
Termination date: 08 Feb 2019
Address: Rd 5, Te Awamutu, 3875 New Zealand
Address used since 21 Sep 2009
John Maxwell - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 13 Aug 2010
Termination date: 14 Apr 2014
Address: Mount Maunganui, Mount Maunganui, 3116 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Dec 2013
Francis William King - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 20 Mar 2003
Termination date: 15 Nov 2013
Address: Matua, Tauranga 3110,
Address used since 02 Oct 2008
Peter Joseph Mourits - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 11 Feb 2005
Termination date: 26 Jun 2010
Address: Mount Maunganui, 3116 New Zealand
Address used since 21 Sep 2009
Philip James Empson - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 05 Jul 2001
Termination date: 18 Apr 2007
Address: Rd5, Te Awamutu,
Address used since 05 Jul 2001
Donald Edgar Henderson - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 20 Mar 2003
Termination date: 03 Nov 2003
Address: Tauranga,
Address used since 20 Mar 2003
Oliver Group Limited
21 Jean Batten Drive
Yak 52 Limited
Classic Flyers, 9 Jean Batten Drive
Bop Aircraft Holdings Limited
9 Jean Batten Drive
Contract Mechanical Services Limited
11 Harvard Way
Mount Restoration Limited
6 Dakota Way
Csi Holdings Limited
12 Jean Batten Drive