Bph Limited, a registered company, was incorporated on 28 May 2001. 9429036900220 is the NZBN it was issued. "Bed retailing" (business classification G421130) is how the company is classified. The company has been supervised by 3 directors: Zhentao Lin - an active director whose contract started on 20 Jun 2017,
Francis Chai - an inactive director whose contract started on 28 May 2001 and was terminated on 01 Sep 2021,
Julia Doak - an inactive director whose contract started on 28 May 2001 and was terminated on 05 Feb 2003.
Last updated on 17 Jul 2024, our data contains detailed information about 4 addresses this company uses, specifically: Shop B, 451 Ti Rakau Drive, Golflands, Auckland, 2013 (office address),
451B Ti Rakau Drive, Golflands, Auckland, 2013 (registered address),
451B Ti Rakau Drive, Golflands, Auckland, 2013 (service address),
Shop B, 451 Ti Rakau Drive, Golflands, Auckland, 2013 (postal address) among others.
Bph Limited had been using Suite 2, 451 Ti Rakau Drive, Golflands, Auckland as their registered address until 01 May 2024.
A total of 100 shares are issued to 2 shareholders (2 groups). The first group consists of 50 shares (50%) held by 1 entity. Moving on the second group includes 1 shareholder in control of 50 shares (50%).
Other active addresses
Principal place of activity
Shop B, 451 Ti Rakau Drive, Golflands, Auckland, 2013 New Zealand
Previous addresses
Address #1: Suite 2, 451 Ti Rakau Drive, Golflands, Auckland, 2013 New Zealand
Registered & service address used from 26 Sep 2011 to 01 May 2024
Address #2: 2 Kimberhall Avenue, Mt Roskill, Auckland New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 08 May 2003 to 26 Sep 2011
Address #3: G C Foster & Co Ltd, Chartered Accountants, 187 Pakuranga Road, Pakuranga, Auckland
Physical & registered address used from 28 May 2001 to 08 May 2003
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: May
Annual return last filed: 27 May 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 50 | |||
Entity (NZ Limited Company) | Lzt Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429046333520 |
Manukau Auckland 2104 New Zealand |
02 Aug 2018 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 50 | |||
Individual | Lin, Zhentao |
Flat Bush Auckland 2019 New Zealand |
07 Jun 2022 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Entity | Farri New Zealand Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429038743061 Company Number: 616805 |
Toplands Auckland 2016 New Zealand |
28 May 2001 - 06 Sep 2021 |
Entity | Farri New Zealand Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429038743061 Company Number: 616805 |
Toplands Auckland 2016 New Zealand |
28 May 2001 - 06 Sep 2021 |
Entity | Farri New Zealand Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429038743061 Company Number: 616805 |
Toplands Auckland 2016 New Zealand |
28 May 2001 - 06 Sep 2021 |
Ultimate Holding Company
Zhentao Lin - Director
Appointment date: 20 Jun 2017
Address: Flat Bush, Auckland, 2019 New Zealand
Address used since 07 May 2021
Address: Huntington, Hamilton, 3210 New Zealand
Address used since 06 May 2020
Address: Nawton, Hamilton, 3200 New Zealand
Address used since 01 May 2019
Address: Flagstaff, Hamilton, 3210 New Zealand
Address used since 20 Jun 2017
Francis Chai - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 28 May 2001
Termination date: 01 Sep 2021
Address: Flat Bush, Manukau, 2016 New Zealand
Address used since 09 Jun 2010
Julia Doak - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 28 May 2001
Termination date: 05 Feb 2003
Address: Howick, Auckland,
Address used since 28 May 2001
Matakana Developments Limited
The Hub
Virtucon Limited
"the Hub"
Oceanz Seafood Licensing Limited
451 Ti Rakau Dr
Os Superstores Botany Limited
451 Ti Rakau Drive
Online Carpet 2014 Limited
Unit D 451 Ti Rakau Drive East Tamaki
Os Holdings Limited
451 Ti Rakau Dr
Bedpost New Zealand Limited
Unit 11, 135 Cryers Road
Bedsale Nz Limited
Shop A3, 500 Ti Rakau Drive
Dream Beds Nz Limited
500 Ti Rakau Drive
Ibed Limited
Suite 2, 451 Ti Rakau Drive
Nz Jiaxing Trading Limited
35 Chateau Rise
Slumber Beds Limited
Suite 2, 451 Ti Rakau Drive