Lesvos Abalone Limited, a registered company, was launched on 24 Jan 2001. 9429037023218 is the NZBN it was issued. "Fishing - marine nec" (business classification A041940) is how the company is classified. This company has been managed by 4 directors: Craig Raniera Ellison - an active director whose contract began on 01 May 2005,
Antonios Focas - an active director whose contract began on 09 Feb 2011,
Catherine Mary Brayshaw - an inactive director whose contract began on 11 May 2001 and was terminated on 01 May 2005,
Mark Janis - an inactive director whose contract began on 24 Jan 2001 and was terminated on 11 May 2001.
Last updated on 20 Jul 2024, our data contains detailed information about 1 address: Level 1, Crowe Horwath House, 57 Willis Street, Wellington, 6011 (types include: office, postal).
Lesvos Abalone Limited had been using Level 6, 45 Knights Road, Lower Hutt, Wellington as their registered address up until 24 May 2017.
A total of 100 shares are allocated to 4 shareholders (2 groups). The first group is comprised of 50 shares (50 per cent) held by 3 entities. Next there is the second group which consists of 1 shareholder in control of 50 shares (50 per cent).
Principal place of activity
Level 1, Crowe Horwath House, 57 Willis Street, Wellington, 6011 New Zealand
Previous address
Address #1: Level 6, 45 Knights Road, Lower Hutt, Wellington New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 24 Jan 2001 to 24 May 2017
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: November
Annual return last filed: 04 Nov 2023
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 50 | |||
Entity (NZ Limited Company) | Polson Higgs Nominees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429039487582 |
Dunedin Central Dunedin 9016 New Zealand |
15 Jun 2006 - |
Individual | Ellison, Craig Raniera |
Khandallah Wellington |
15 Jun 2006 - |
Individual | Ellison, Robyn Lesley |
Khandallah Wellington New Zealand |
15 Jun 2006 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 50 | |||
Individual | Focas, Antonios |
Te Aro Wellington 6011 New Zealand |
09 Feb 2011 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Focas, Andreas |
Mermaid Beach 4218 Queensland, Australia |
18 Nov 2003 - 09 Feb 2011 |
Individual | Janis, Mark |
R D 1 Pautahanui |
18 Nov 2003 - 18 Nov 2003 |
Other | Dragon World Pty Ltd | 18 Nov 2003 - 27 Jun 2010 | |
Individual | Brayshaw, Catherine Mary |
Newtown Wellington |
27 Oct 2005 - 27 Oct 2005 |
Individual | Brayshaw, Peter John |
Mermaid Beach 4218 Queensland, Australia |
18 Nov 2003 - 27 Oct 2005 |
Entity | Scw Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429038193149 Company Number: 835890 |
27 Oct 2005 - 27 Oct 2005 | |
Other | Null - Dragon World Pty Ltd | 18 Nov 2003 - 27 Jun 2010 | |
Entity | Scw Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429038193149 Company Number: 835890 |
27 Oct 2005 - 27 Oct 2005 |
Craig Raniera Ellison - Director
Appointment date: 01 May 2005
Address: Khandallah, Wellington, 6035 New Zealand
Address used since 01 May 2005
Antonios Focas - Director
Appointment date: 09 Feb 2011
Address: Te Aro, Wellington, 6011 New Zealand
Address used since 09 Feb 2011
Catherine Mary Brayshaw - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 11 May 2001
Termination date: 01 May 2005
Address: Newtown, Wellington,
Address used since 13 Oct 2004
Mark Janis - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 24 Jan 2001
Termination date: 11 May 2001
Address: R D 1, Pautahanui,
Address used since 24 Jan 2001
Pooja Foods Limited
Level 1, 50 Customhouse Quay
M G Bale Trustees (hill 16) Limited
Level 7, 234 Wakefield Street
Sounds Lifestyle Investments Limited
Level 7, 234 Wakefield Street
Customs Agents Wellington Limited
Level 1, 50 Customhouse Quay
Ppem Nominees Limited
Level 14, 1-3 Willeston Street
Glading Family Trustees Limited
Level 10, Greenock House, 39 The Terrace
80 Mile Limited
6 Plateau Road
D And N Fishing Limited
2460 State Highway1
Endeavour Fisheries Limited
82 Martin Street
Gisborne Fisheries Holdings Limited
-
Maris Fishing Limited
45 Queen Street