Everest Property Holdings Limited, a registered company, was registered on 13 Sep 2000. 9429037161859 is the NZ business number it was issued. "Investment - commercial property" (business classification L671230) is how the company has been classified. The company has been managed by 1 director, named Paul Thomas Phillip Armstrong - an active director whose contract began on 13 Sep 2000.
Last updated on 18 Aug 2024, the BizDb data contains detailed information about 2 addresses this company uses, namely: 14 Knox Street, Hamilton (physical address),
14 Knox Street, Hamilton (service address),
Level 1, 25 Ward Street, Hamilton (registered address).
Everest Property Holdings Limited had been using Map & Associates, 5 King Street, Hamilton as their physical address until 20 Oct 2008.
A total of 1000 shares are allotted to 4 shareholders (4 groups). The first group is comprised of 250 shares (25%) held by 1 entity. Next we have the second group which consists of 1 shareholder in control of 250 shares (25%). Lastly the 3rd share allocation (250 shares 25%) made up of 1 entity.
Previous addresses
Address #1: Map & Associates, 5 King Street, Hamilton
Physical address used from 03 Apr 2007 to 20 Oct 2008
Address #2: Level 1, 25 Ward Street, Hamilton
Registered address used from 02 Apr 2007 to 03 Apr 2007
Address #3: Map & Associates, 5 King Street, Hamilton
Physical address used from 02 Apr 2007 to 03 Apr 2007
Address #4: Level 1, State Insurance, 431 Victoria Street, Hamilton
Physical & registered address used from 21 Dec 2004 to 02 Apr 2007
Address #5: Bdo Waikato, Cnr Anglesea & Rostrevor Streets, Hamilton
Physical address used from 11 Apr 2001 to 11 Apr 2001
Address #6: Drew Bullen House, Level 1, 5 King Street, Hamilton
Physical address used from 11 Apr 2001 to 21 Dec 2004
Address #7: Bdo Waikato, Cnr Anglesea & Rostrevor Streets, Hamilton
Registered address used from 11 Apr 2001 to 21 Dec 2004
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 1000
Annual return filing month: February
Annual return last filed: 25 Feb 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 250 | |||
Individual | Armstrong, Marian Elizabeth |
Mount Maunganui New Zealand |
13 Sep 2000 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 250 | |||
Individual | Armstrong, Paul Thomas Phillip |
Mount Maunganui New Zealand |
13 Sep 2000 - |
Shares Allocation #3 Number of Shares: 250 | |||
Entity (NZ Limited Company) | Map And Associates Trustee Company Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429035672470 |
14 Knox Street Hamilton |
27 Mar 2007 - |
Shares Allocation #4 Number of Shares: 250 | |||
Entity (NZ Limited Company) | Mccaw Lewis Chapman Trustees (no.1) Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429035637158 |
Hamilton Central Hamilton 3204 New Zealand |
27 Mar 2007 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Slavich, John Kenneth |
Hamilton |
13 Sep 2000 - 27 Jun 2010 |
Individual | Pocock, Michael Graeme |
Hamilton |
13 Sep 2000 - 14 Dec 2004 |
Paul Thomas Phillip Armstrong - Director
Appointment date: 13 Sep 2000
Address: Mount Maunganui, Tauranga, 3116 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Feb 2016
Roachs Nurseries Limited
14 Knox Street
Kaitiaki Trust Limited
14 Knox Street
Executive House Rentals (auckland) Limited
14 Knox Street
Core Mma Limited
14 Knox Street
N Atutahi Limited
14 Knox Street
Ignite Waikato Limited
14 Knox Street
Anglesea Properties Limited
204/208 Anglesea Street
Everest Property Investments (christchurch) Limited
14 Knox Street
Everest Property Investments (waikato) Limited
14 Knox Street
Grey St Property Investments Limited
14 Knox Street
Markaz Holdings Limited
14 Knox Street
Mutuary Limited
Chartered Accountants