Counties Plastics Limited, a registered company, was registered on 17 Aug 2000. 9429037169657 is the NZBN it was issued. The company has been run by 2 directors: Peter Douglas Bullock - an active director whose contract started on 17 Aug 2000,
Dianne Jean Capstick - an inactive director whose contract started on 17 Aug 2000 and was terminated on 26 Sep 2014.
Updated on 02 Sep 2024, our database contains detailed information about 2 addresses this company uses, specifically: 40B Cameron Town Road, Rd 3, Pukekohe, 2678 (registered address),
40B Cameron Town Road, Rd 3, Pukekohe, 2678 (service address),
Offices Of Gnr Accountants Ltd, Level 2,3055 Gt North Road, New Lynn, Auckland, 0600 (physical address).
Counties Plastics Limited had been using Offices Of Gnr Accountants Ltd, Level 2,3055 Gt North Road, New Lynn, Auckland as their registered address until 10 May 2023.
A total of 10000 shares are allocated to 2 shareholders (2 groups). The first group consists of 5000 shares (50 per cent) held by 1 entity. Next there is the second group which consists of 1 shareholder in control of 5000 shares (50 per cent).
Previous addresses
Address #1: Offices Of Gnr Accountants Ltd, Level 2,3055 Gt North Road, New Lynn, Auckland, 0600 New Zealand
Registered & service address used from 30 Sep 2015 to 10 May 2023
Address #2: Offices Of Crosbie & Associates Ltd, Level 2,3055 Gt North Road, New Lynn, Auckland, 0600 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 12 Dec 2013 to 30 Sep 2015
Address #3: Offices Of Crosbie & Associates Ltd, Level 2, Ail House,3055 Gt North Road, New Lynn, Auckland New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 22 Dec 2008 to 12 Dec 2013
Address #4: At The Offices Of Rpl Accountants Ltd, 1st Floor, Vtr House, 24 Manukau Road, Epsom, Auckland
Physical & registered address used from 17 Aug 2000 to 22 Dec 2008
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 10000
Annual return filing month: September
Annual return last filed: 01 May 2023
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 5000 | |||
Director | Bullock, Peter Douglas |
Rd 3 Pukekohe 2678 New Zealand |
17 Jan 2017 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 5000 | |||
Individual | Capstick, Dianne Jean |
Rd 3 Pukekohe 2678 New Zealand |
17 Aug 2000 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Entity | Bullock Investments Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429039433558 Company Number: 398715 |
17 Aug 2000 - 17 Jan 2017 | |
Entity | Bullock Investments Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429039433558 Company Number: 398715 |
17 Aug 2000 - 17 Jan 2017 |
Peter Douglas Bullock - Director
Appointment date: 17 Aug 2000
Address: Rd 4, Papakura, 2584 New Zealand
Address used since 16 Sep 2009
Dianne Jean Capstick - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 17 Aug 2000
Termination date: 26 Sep 2014
Address: Rd 4, Papakura, 2584 New Zealand
Address used since 16 Sep 2009
The Davy Group Limited
3049 Great North Road
J S Builders Limited
3049 Great North Road
Works Holding Company Limited
3049 Great North Road
Black Powder Limited
First Floor, 3061 Great North Road
De,bree Hairdressing Limited
First Floor, 3061 Great North Road
Rosebank Road Storage Limited
First Floor, 3061 Great North Road