Dch Holdings Limited, a registered company, was registered on 30 Jun 2000. 9429037213282 is the business number it was issued. The company has been run by 3 directors: Dennis Alan Chapman - an active director whose contract began on 30 Jun 2000,
William Woodhouse Lee - an active director whose contract began on 16 Apr 2019,
Deborah Beatrice Chapman - an active director whose contract began on 01 May 2021.
Updated on 22 Jul 2024, BizDb's database contains detailed information about 1 address: 287-293 Durham Street North, Christchurch, 8013 (category: physical, registered).
Dch Holdings Limited had been using 30 Sir William Pickering Drive, Burnside, Christchurch as their physical address up to 14 Jul 2017.
More names used by the company, as we found at BizDb, included: from 30 Jun 2000 to 10 Mar 2004 they were named Dch Motorsport Limited.
A total of 1200 shares are allotted to 2 shareholders (2 groups). The first group includes 600 shares (50 per cent) held by 1 entity. Next there is the second group which includes 1 shareholder in control of 600 shares (50 per cent).
Previous addresses
Address: 30 Sir William Pickering Drive, Burnside, Christchurch, 8053 New Zealand
Physical address used from 31 Mar 2014 to 14 Jul 2017
Address: 30 Sir William Pickering Drive, Burnside, Christchurch, 8053 New Zealand
Registered address used from 27 Jun 2011 to 14 Jul 2017
Address: 30 Sir William Pickering Drive, Burnside, Christchurch, 8053 New Zealand
Physical address used from 27 Jun 2011 to 31 Mar 2014
Address: Level 6, 148 Victoria Street, Christchurch New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 10 May 2002 to 27 Jun 2011
Address: 5 Durham Street, Christchurch
Physical & registered address used from 30 Jun 2000 to 10 May 2002
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 1200
Annual return filing month: April
Annual return last filed: 03 Apr 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 600 | |||
Individual | Chapman, Deborah Beatrice |
Rd 2 Tai Tapu 7672 New Zealand |
17 Jun 2021 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 600 | |||
Individual | Chapman, Dennis Alan |
Rd 2 Christchurch 7672 New Zealand |
30 Jun 2000 - |
Dennis Alan Chapman - Director
Appointment date: 30 Jun 2000
Address: Rd 2, Christchurch, 7672 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Mar 2014
William Woodhouse Lee - Director
Appointment date: 16 Apr 2019
Address: Rd 2, Tai Tapu, 7672 New Zealand
Address used since 16 Apr 2019
Deborah Beatrice Chapman - Director
Appointment date: 01 May 2021
Address: Rd 2, Tai Tapu, 7672 New Zealand
Address used since 01 May 2021
Kitz Investments Limited
287-293 Durham Street North
Roading And Building Cartage Limited
287-293 Durham Street North
Weir Nominees Limited
287-293 Durham Street North
Mackay Trustees 2013 Limited
287 - 293 Durham Street
L & P Build Limited
287-293 Durham Street North, Christchurch Central
Tai Tapu Milk Company Limited
287-293 Durham Street North