Rehab Servicing Limited was started on 29 Jun 2000 and issued an NZ business number of 9429037222611. The in liquidation LTD company has been managed by 2 directors: George Edward Drew - an active director whose contract began on 29 Jun 2000,
George Roger Drew - an inactive director whose contract began on 29 Jun 2000 and was terminated on 01 Oct 2011.
As stated in our database (last updated on 19 Jul 2024), the company registered 1 address: Level 1, 136 Greenlane East, Greenlane, Auckland, 1051 (category: registered, service).
Until 31 Oct 2014, Rehab Servicing Limited had been using Flat 1, 62 Bruce Mclaren Road, Henderson, Auckland as their registered address.
A total of 100 shares are allocated to 2 groups (2 shareholders in total). As far as the first group is concerned, 1 share is held by 1 entity, namely:
Drew, Krissie Phyllis Jean Hornell (an individual) located at West Harbour, Auckland postcode 0618.
The second group consists of 1 shareholder, holds 50 per cent shares (exactly 50 shares) and includes
Drew, Krissie Phyllis Jean Hornell - located at West Harbour, Auckland. Rehab Servicing Limited was categorised as "Equipment repair and maintenance nec" (business classification S942913).
Other active addresses
Address #4: Unit 2, 183 Mcleod Road, Te Atatu South, Auckland, 0610 New Zealand
Registered & service address used from 20 Nov 2023
Address #5: Level 1, 136 Greenlane East, Greenlane, Auckland, 1051 New Zealand
Registered & service address used from 18 Jun 2024
Principal place of activity
Flat 1, 62 Bruce Mclaren Road, Henderson, Auckland, 0612 New Zealand
Previous addresses
Address #1: Flat 1, 62 Bruce Mclaren Road, Henderson, Auckland, 0612 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 19 Oct 2012 to 31 Oct 2014
Address #2: 1 Parklands Ave, Swanson, Auckland New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 05 Nov 2004 to 19 Oct 2012
Address #3: 42 Christian Road, Swanson, Auckland
Physical & registered address used from 29 Jun 2000 to 05 Nov 2004
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: October
Annual return last filed: 10 Nov 2023
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 1 | |||
Individual | Drew, Krissie Phyllis Jean Hornell |
West Harbour Auckland 0618 New Zealand |
28 Mar 2019 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 50 | |||
Individual | Drew, Krissie Phyllis Jean Hornell |
West Harbour Auckland 0618 New Zealand |
28 Mar 2019 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Drew, George Roger |
Swanson, Auckland Auckland New Zealand |
29 Jun 2000 - 10 Nov 2011 |
Individual | Drew, George Edward |
West Harbour Auckland 0618 New Zealand |
29 Jun 2000 - 10 Nov 2011 |
Individual | Drew, George Edward |
West Harbour Auckland 0618 New Zealand |
29 Jun 2000 - 10 Nov 2011 |
Individual | Drew, George Roger |
Swanson, Auckland Auckland New Zealand |
29 Jun 2000 - 10 Nov 2011 |
Individual | Strong, Matthew Darren |
New Windsor Auckland 0600 New Zealand |
29 Jun 2000 - 04 Aug 2017 |
Individual | Drew, Jennifer Anne |
Swanson Auckland New Zealand |
29 Jun 2000 - 10 Nov 2011 |
Individual | Drew, George Edward |
Waitakere, Auckland New Zealand |
29 Jun 2000 - 10 Nov 2011 |
Individual | Drew, George Edward |
Rd 2 Kumeu 0892 New Zealand |
29 Jun 2000 - 10 Nov 2011 |
Individual | Drew, Krissie |
Rd 2 Kumeu 0892 New Zealand |
04 Aug 2017 - 28 Mar 2019 |
Individual | Dempsey, Dennis Grant |
Taupaki Auckland New Zealand |
29 Jun 2000 - 10 Nov 2011 |
Individual | Drew, George Edward |
Waitakere, Auckland New Zealand |
29 Jun 2000 - 10 Nov 2011 |
George Edward Drew - Director
Appointment date: 29 Jun 2000
Address: West Harbour, Auckland, 0618 New Zealand
Address used since 10 Nov 2023
Address: Rd 2, Kumeu, 0892 New Zealand
Address used since 22 Oct 2014
George Roger Drew - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 29 Jun 2000
Termination date: 01 Oct 2011
Address: Swanson, Waitakere, 0614 New Zealand
Address used since 02 Nov 2009
Clarke And Clarke Limited
1/62 Bruce Mclaren Road
B & R Plumbing Limited
Flat 1, 4 Heremai Street
Mphs Community Trust
64d Bruce Mclaren Road
Carz Nz Limited
2/58 Bruce Mclaran Road
The Falls Hotel Preservation Trust
8 Heremai Street
Reddy Investments 2015 Limited
Unit 4, 52 Bruce Mclaren Road
Bowden Industries Limited
34 Lemnos Place
Dunkley Trading 2016 Limited
6 Lydford Place
Maasden Limited
54a Park Rd
Mad Industries Limited
5 Kirby Street
Process Systems Limited
1st Floor
Simon Bridge Limited
13 Vanden Place