Carley Services Limited, a registered company, was started on 12 May 2000. 9429037267551 is the NZBN it was issued. "Rental of commercial property" (business classification L671250) is how the company has been categorised. This company has been supervised by 4 directors: Mark Ross Carley - an active director whose contract started on 25 Feb 2013,
Paul Charles Robertson - an inactive director whose contract started on 12 Nov 2002 and was terminated on 04 Dec 2013,
Ross Vincent Carley - an inactive director whose contract started on 12 May 2000 and was terminated on 20 May 2011,
Ivan George Rainey - an inactive director whose contract started on 12 May 2000 and was terminated on 04 Nov 2002.
Last updated on 01 Aug 2024, the BizDb database contains detailed information about 1 address: Po Box 15566, New Lynn, Auckland, 0640 (types include: postal, office).
Carley Services Limited had been using 300 Richmond Road, Grey Lynn, Auckland as their registered address until 25 May 2015.
Former names used by this company, as we identified at BizDb, included: from 12 May 2000 to 22 Jan 2009 they were called Carney Properties Limited.
All company shares (100 shares exactly) are in the hands of a single group consisting of 2 entities, namely:
Cotterill, Jacqueline Margaret (an individual) located at Rd 1, Warkworth postcode 0981,
Carley, Mark Ross (an individual) located at St Heliers, Auckland postcode 1071.
Principal place of activity
92 Eastdale Rd, Avondale, Auckland, 1026 New Zealand
Previous addresses
Address #1: 300 Richmond Road, Grey Lynn, Auckland, 1021 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 29 Apr 2015 to 25 May 2015
Address #2: 92 Eastdale Road, Avondale, Auckland New Zealand
Physical address used from 16 May 2000 to 29 Apr 2015
Address #3: 92 Eastdale Road, Avondale, Auckland New Zealand
Registered address used from 12 May 2000 to 29 Apr 2015
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: May
Annual return last filed: 02 May 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation Number of Shares: 100 | |||
Individual | Cotterill, Jacqueline Margaret |
Rd 1 Warkworth 0981 New Zealand |
30 Apr 2012 - |
Individual | Carley, Mark Ross |
St Heliers Auckland 1071 New Zealand |
30 Apr 2012 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Robertson, Paul Charles |
Remuera Auckland |
12 May 2000 - 28 Jan 2015 |
Individual | Carley, Ross Vincent |
Red Beach Whangaparaoa |
12 May 2000 - 30 Apr 2012 |
Mark Ross Carley - Director
Appointment date: 25 Feb 2013
Address: St Heliers, Auckland, 1071 New Zealand
Address used since 25 Feb 2013
Paul Charles Robertson - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 12 Nov 2002
Termination date: 04 Dec 2013
Address: Meadowbank, Auckland, 1072 New Zealand
Address used since 28 May 2010
Ross Vincent Carley - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 12 May 2000
Termination date: 20 May 2011
Address: Red Beach, Whangaparaoa, 0932 New Zealand
Address used since 12 May 2000
Ivan George Rainey - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 12 May 2000
Termination date: 04 Nov 2002
Address: Henderson, Waitakere City, Auckland,
Address used since 12 May 2000
Hire Plants Limited
92 Eastdale Road
Us Homes Limited
50a Eastdale Road
Statewide Bearings Limited
1/48 Eastdale Road
Morini & Co Limited
109 Holly Street
Fa'ataualofa Aiga Manuia Trust
130 Holly Street
Balsan International Limited
128 Holly Street
A & E Zhou Limited
21a Fir Street
Jandlmac Properties Limited
3049 Great North Road
Lawton Jones Limited
80a Alverston Street
N2d3 Properties Limited
1 Jomac Place
Peninsula Property Investments Limited
Level 2, 703 Rosebank Road
Urban Farms Limited
20 A Fairlands Avenue