Uniformnz Limited, a registered company, was registered on 09 May 2000. 9429037318598 is the number it was issued. "Clothing wholesaling" (business classification F371210) is how the company was classified. This company has been managed by 5 directors: Patrick Benedict Macnamara - an active director whose contract began on 17 Aug 2023,
Amy Marie Macnamara - an active director whose contract began on 17 Jun 2024,
Terence James Macnamara - an inactive director whose contract began on 09 May 2000 and was terminated on 01 Jun 2024,
Kourosh Koshkoo - an inactive director whose contract began on 09 May 2000 and was terminated on 01 Jan 2005,
Gayle Sheree Macnamara - an inactive director whose contract began on 09 May 2000 and was terminated on 30 Sep 2000.
Last updated on 07 Sep 2024, BizDb's data contains detailed information about 1 address: 142 Otepuni Avenue, Newfield, Invercargill, 9812 (category: office, delivery).
Uniformnz Limited had been using 57 Meldrum Street, Winton as their physical address up until 29 Jun 2017.
A single entity owns all company shares (exactly 100 shares) - Macnamara, Patrick Benedict - located at 9812, Georgetown, Invercargill.
Principal place of activity
142 Otepuni Avenue, Newfield, Invercargill, 9812 New Zealand
Previous addresses
Address #1: 57 Meldrum Street, Winton, 9720 New Zealand
Physical address used from 29 Jun 2015 to 29 Jun 2017
Address #2: 57 Meldrum Street, Winton, 9720 New Zealand
Registered address used from 07 Jul 2014 to 29 Jun 2017
Address #3: 1785 Dipton-winton Highway, Centre Bush, Winton, 9782 New Zealand
Physical address used from 01 Jul 2013 to 29 Jun 2015
Address #4: 1785 Dipton-winton Highway, Centre Bush, Winton, 9782 New Zealand
Registered address used from 01 Jul 2013 to 07 Jul 2014
Address #5: 169 Doon Street, Dunedin New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 03 Jul 2009 to 01 Jul 2013
Address #6: Flintoffs Chartered Accountants, 85 Gala Street, Invercargill
Registered & physical address used from 09 May 2000 to 03 Jul 2009
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: June
Annual return last filed: 16 Jun 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation Number of Shares: 100 | |||
Individual | Macnamara, Patrick Benedict |
Georgetown Invercargill 9812 New Zealand |
12 May 2017 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Macnamara, Sean Patrick |
Otatara Invercargill 9810 New Zealand |
14 Jun 2006 - 17 Jun 2024 |
Individual | Macnamara, Sean Patrick |
Otatara Invercargill 9810 New Zealand |
14 Jun 2006 - 17 Jun 2024 |
Individual | Macnamara, Sean Patrick |
Otatara Invercargill 9810 New Zealand |
14 Jun 2006 - 17 Jun 2024 |
Individual | Macnamara, Terence James |
R D 4 Invercargill |
30 Jun 2004 - 17 Jun 2024 |
Individual | Macnamara, Terence James |
Otatara Invercargill 9810 New Zealand |
30 Jun 2004 - 17 Jun 2024 |
Individual | Macnamara, Terence James |
R D 4 Invercargill |
30 Jun 2004 - 17 Jun 2024 |
Individual | Koshkoo, Kourosh |
Castor Bay Auckland |
09 May 2000 - 16 Jun 2005 |
Individual | Macnamara, Terence James |
R D 4 Invercargill |
30 Jun 2004 - 17 Jun 2024 |
Individual | Macnamara, Terence James |
Otatara Invercargill 9810 New Zealand |
30 Jun 2004 - 17 Jun 2024 |
Patrick Benedict Macnamara - Director
Appointment date: 17 Aug 2023
Address: Georgetown, Invercargill, 9812 New Zealand
Address used since 17 Aug 2023
Amy Marie Macnamara - Director
Appointment date: 17 Jun 2024
Address: Georgetown, Invercargill, 9812 New Zealand
Address used since 17 Jun 2024
Terence James Macnamara - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 09 May 2000
Termination date: 01 Jun 2024
Address: Otatara, Invercargill, 9810 New Zealand
Address used since 23 Jun 2013
Kourosh Koshkoo - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 09 May 2000
Termination date: 01 Jan 2005
Address: Castor Bay, Auckland,
Address used since 09 May 2000
Gayle Sheree Macnamara - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 09 May 2000
Termination date: 30 Sep 2000
Address: R D 4, Invercargill,
Address used since 09 May 2000
Clare Felling Limited
53 Meldrum Street
Graeme Lowen - Plumber & Drainlayer Limited
48 Queen Street
Winton Christian Fellowship Trust
67 Albert Street
Lions Club Of Winton Incorporated
C/o The Secretary
Central Southland Toy Library Incorporated
206 Park Street
Pokatu Whanau Trust
206 Park Street
Aardvark Enterprises Limited
24 Miller Place
Cloke Clothing Limited
245 Mersey Street
Jane Sutherland 2016 Limited
385 Queens Drive
Magnetic.socks Limited
8 Cypress Court
Nzuniforms.com Limited
57 Meldrum Street
Uniformnz.com Limited
57 Meldrum Street