Global Switch Limited, a registered company, was started on 13 Dec 1999. 9429037407216 is the NZ business identifier it was issued. "Telephone-based recorded information service" (business classification J602040) is how the company is categorised. The company has been supervised by 3 directors: Dafyd Rhys Morgan - an active director whose contract started on 13 Jul 2000,
Caiti Marie Morgan - an inactive director whose contract started on 12 Dec 2004 and was terminated on 28 Feb 2005,
Adela Marie Morgan - an inactive director whose contract started on 13 Dec 1999 and was terminated on 13 Jul 2000.
Last updated on 31 Aug 2024, our database contains detailed information about 1 address: 7 Coolspring Way, Redwood, Christchurch, 8051 (types include: registered, physical).
Global Switch Limited had been using 20 Hawthorne Street, Christchurch 8005 as their physical address until 18 Apr 2005.
A total of 100 shares are allotted to 2 shareholders (2 groups). The first group is comprised of 50 shares (50 per cent) held by 1 entity. There is also a second group which consists of 1 shareholder in control of 50 shares (50 per cent).
Previous addresses
Address: 20 Hawthorne Street, Christchurch 8005
Physical & registered address used from 09 May 2003 to 18 Apr 2005
Address: 20 Hawtorne Street, Christchurch
Registered address used from 12 Apr 2000 to 09 May 2003
Address: 20 Hawtorne Street, Christchurch
Physical address used from 13 Dec 1999 to 09 May 2003
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: August
Annual return last filed: 08 Aug 2023
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 50 | |||
Individual | Morgan, Dafyd Rhys |
Redwood Christchurch 8051 New Zealand |
13 Dec 1999 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 50 | |||
Individual | Morgan, Adela Marie |
Redwood Christchurch 8051 New Zealand |
09 Feb 2016 - |
Dafyd Rhys Morgan - Director
Appointment date: 13 Jul 2000
Address: Redwood Springs, Christchurch, 8051 New Zealand
Address used since 02 Aug 2011
Caiti Marie Morgan - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 12 Dec 2004
Termination date: 28 Feb 2005
Address: 639 Little Bourke Street, Melbourne, Victoria Australia,
Address used since 12 Dec 2004
Adela Marie Morgan - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 13 Dec 1999
Termination date: 13 Jul 2000
Address: Christchurch,
Address used since 13 Dec 1999
Master International Products Limited
50 Willowview Drive
Geraldine Property Holdings Limited
56 Willowview Drive
Geraldine Retirement Village (2009) Limited
56 Willowview Drive
Cunliffe House Retirement Home 2006 Limited
56 Willow View Drive
Cunliffe Property Holdings Limited
56 Willow View Drive
Silver Key Properties Limited
18 Riverwood Boulevard