Jkj Limited was started on 03 Feb 1999 and issued an NZ business number of 9429037679101. This registered LTD company has been run by 3 directors: Jan Lynette Marment - an active director whose contract started on 03 Feb 1999,
John Maurice Marment - an active director whose contract started on 03 Feb 1999,
Kenneth Brent Marment - an inactive director whose contract started on 03 Feb 1999 and was terminated on 19 Mar 2021.
As stated in our database (updated on 04 Aug 2024), this company registered 1 address: 12 Mccarthy Grove, Clouston Park, Upper Hutt, 5018 (category: physical, registered).
Up until 04 May 2011, Jkj Limited had been using 130A Evans Bay Parade, Wellington as their physical address.
A total of 3 shares are allocated to 3 groups (4 shareholders in total). As far as the first group is concerned, 1 share is held by 2 entities, namely:
Marment, Jan Lynette (an individual) located at Clouston Park, Upper Hutt postcode 5018,
Marment, John Maurice (an individual) located at Martinborough, Martinborough postcode 5711.
The 2nd group consists of 1 shareholder, holds 33.33 per cent shares (exactly 1 share) and includes
Marment, Jan Lynette - located at Clouston Park, Upper Hutt.
The third share allotment (1 share, 33.33%) belongs to 1 entity, namely:
Marment, John Maurice, located at Martinborough, Martinborough (an individual). Jkj Limited has been categorised as "Rental of residential property" (ANZSIC L671160).
Previous addresses
Address: 130a Evans Bay Parade, Wellington New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 11 Apr 2008 to 04 May 2011
Address: 12 Mccarthy Grove, Upper Hutt
Registered & physical address used from 14 Feb 2003 to 11 Apr 2008
Address: 43 Fraser Crescent, Upper Hutt
Registered address used from 12 Apr 2000 to 14 Feb 2003
Address: 43 Fraser Crescent, Upper Hutt
Physical address used from 03 Feb 1999 to 14 Feb 2003
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 3
Annual return filing month: February
Annual return last filed: 01 Feb 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 1 | |||
Individual | Marment, Jan Lynette |
Clouston Park Upper Hutt 5018 New Zealand |
03 Feb 1999 - |
Individual | Marment, John Maurice |
Martinborough Martinborough 5711 New Zealand |
03 Feb 1999 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 1 | |||
Individual | Marment, Jan Lynette |
Clouston Park Upper Hutt 5018 New Zealand |
03 Feb 1999 - |
Shares Allocation #3 Number of Shares: 1 | |||
Individual | Marment, John Maurice |
Martinborough Martinborough 5711 New Zealand |
03 Feb 1999 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Marment, Kenneth Brent |
Rd 2 Kaiwaka 0573 New Zealand |
03 Feb 1999 - 29 Mar 2021 |
Jan Lynette Marment - Director
Appointment date: 03 Feb 1999
Address: Clouston Park, Upper Hutt, 5018 New Zealand
Address used since 20 Dec 2011
John Maurice Marment - Director
Appointment date: 03 Feb 1999
Address: Martinborough, 5711 New Zealand
Address used since 06 Feb 2016
Kenneth Brent Marment - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 03 Feb 1999
Termination date: 19 Mar 2021
Address: Rd 2, Kaiwaka, 0573 New Zealand
Address used since 02 Feb 2015
Shelalee Investments Limited
14 Mccarthy Grove
Pad Mac Construction Limited
14 Mccarthy Grove
Mccall Holdings Limited
10 Mccarthy Grove
Heaven Scent
15 Mccarthy Grove
Lay Consulting Limited
19a Mccarthy Grove
Salisbury Charitable Trust Board
19 Mccarthy Grove
Akatahi Limited
1159 Fergusson Drive
Gnawt Inc Limited
9 Monarch Grove
Holdsworth Flats Limited
29 Mccarthy
Orrsbiz Limited
29 Mccarthy Grove
Pexcel Solutions Limited
33 Mountbatten Grove
Pierce Properties Limited
1127 Fergussen Drive