Advantage Business Limited, a registered company, was incorporated on 02 Dec 1998. 9429037714338 is the NZ business identifier it was issued. "Business consultant service" (business classification M696205) is how the company is categorised. The company has been run by 18 directors: Murray Robert Fulton - an active director whose contract started on 30 Nov 2015,
Roderick William Way - an active director whose contract started on 19 Jan 2018,
Andrew John Ross - an active director whose contract started on 11 Jan 2019,
Trevor Douglas Clark - an active director whose contract started on 18 Oct 2019,
Dominic Moran - an active director whose contract started on 31 Mar 2022.
Last updated on 16 Jul 2024, our database contains detailed information about 1 address: Level 2, Rsm House, 62 Highbrook Drive, East Tamaki, Auckland, 2013 (type: office, registered).
Advantage Business Limited had been using Level 2, Building 5, 60 Highbrook Drive, East Tamaki, Auckland as their registered address up to 11 Mar 2020.
Former names for the company, as we managed to find at BizDb, included: from 02 Dec 1998 to 13 Feb 2006 they were named Advantage Business Solutions Limited.
A total of 1200 shares are allotted to 6 shareholders (4 groups). The first group consists of 300 shares (25 per cent) held by 1 entity. Next we have the second group which consists of 3 shareholders in control of 300 shares (25 per cent). Finally the next share allocation (300 shares 25 per cent) made up of 1 entity.
Principal place of activity
Level 2, Rsm House, 62 Highbrook Drive, East Tamaki, Auckland, 2013 New Zealand
Previous addresses
Address #1: Level 2, Building 5, 60 Highbrook Drive, East Tamaki, Auckland, 2013 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 25 Feb 2020 to 11 Mar 2020
Address #2: Level 6, 135 Broadway, Newmarket, Auckland, 1023 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 07 Jan 2019 to 25 Feb 2020
Address #3: Level 2, 142 Broadway, Newmarket, Auckland, 1023 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 07 Mar 2011 to 07 Jan 2019
Address #4: C/o-alliott Nz Ltd, Ground Floor, 109 Carlton Gore Road, Newmarket New Zealand
Physical address used from 23 Nov 2007 to 07 Mar 2011
Address #5: C/o-alliott Nz Ltd, Ground Floor, 109 Carton Gore Raod, Newmarket New Zealand
Registered address used from 23 Nov 2007 to 07 Mar 2011
Address #6: C/-alliott Thompson Francis Ltd, Ground, Floor, Merck Sharp Dohme Bldg, 109, Carlton Gore Rd, Newmarket
Physical & registered address used from 04 Apr 2002 to 23 Nov 2007
Address #7: C/- Alliott Thompson Francis Ltd, Level 2, 25 Teed Street, Newmarket, Auckland
Registered & physical address used from 02 Mar 2002 to 04 Apr 2002
Address #8: Thompson Francis, Chartered Accountants, Level 2, 25 Teed Street, Newmarket, Auckland
Registered address used from 05 Mar 2001 to 02 Mar 2002
Address #9: Level 2, 25 Teed Street, Newmarket, Auckland
Physical address used from 05 Mar 2001 to 02 Mar 2002
Address #10: Thompson Francis, Chartered Accountants, Level 2, 25 Teed Street, Newmarket, Auckland
Physical address used from 05 Mar 2001 to 05 Mar 2001
Address #11: Thompson Francis, Chartered Accountants, Level 2, 25 Teed Street, Newmarket, Auckland
Registered address used from 12 Apr 2000 to 05 Mar 2001
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 1200
Annual return filing month: February
Financial report filing month: March
Annual return last filed: 07 Mar 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 300 | |||
Individual | Moran, Dominic |
Highfield Timaru 7910 New Zealand |
23 Jun 2016 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 300 | |||
Individual | Way, Jodi Maree |
Gate Pa Tauranga 3112 New Zealand |
09 Nov 2015 - |
Individual | Way, Roderick William |
Gate Pa Tauranga 3112 New Zealand |
09 Nov 2015 - |
Entity (NZ Limited Company) | Holland Beckett Trustee No.14 Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429041065730 |
Tauranga Tauranga Null 3110 New Zealand |
09 Nov 2015 - |
Shares Allocation #3 Number of Shares: 300 | |||
Entity (NZ Limited Company) | Mr & Sa Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429032798647 |
Level 6, 135 Broadway Newmarket, Auckland 1149 Null New Zealand |
22 Dec 2014 - |
Shares Allocation #4 Number of Shares: 300 | |||
Individual | Clark, Trevor Douglas |
Remuera Auckland 1050 New Zealand |
03 Nov 2015 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Brown, Darren Richard |
Point Chevalier Auckland |
02 Dec 1998 - 16 Nov 2007 |
Individual | Brown, Darren Richard |
Point Chevalier Auckland |
02 Dec 1998 - 16 Nov 2007 |
Entity | Auckland Trustees & Executors Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429032913538 Company Number: 2092992 |
Epsom Auckland 1023 New Zealand |
27 Feb 2012 - 07 Sep 2018 |
Individual | Millar, Gregory V |
Mission Bay Auckland |
02 Dec 1998 - 16 Nov 2007 |
Individual | Millar, Gregory V |
Mission Bay Auckland |
02 Dec 1998 - 16 Nov 2007 |
Individual | Mitchell, Duncan |
Takapuna Auckland New Zealand |
23 Feb 2005 - 17 Jan 2018 |
Entity | Advantage Business Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037714338 Company Number: 935332 |
07 Sep 2018 - 19 Dec 2018 | |
Entity | Katipo Solutions Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429041629345 Company Number: 5615232 |
Khandallah Wellington 6035 New Zealand |
10 Mar 2016 - 19 Dec 2018 |
Individual | Delany, Gerald |
Birkenhead Auckland |
23 Feb 2005 - 10 Sep 2018 |
Individual | Webb, Maxwell Stuart |
Saint Heliers Auckland 1071 New Zealand |
23 Feb 2005 - 17 Jan 2018 |
Individual | Muller, Andrew Steven |
Stanmore Bay Whangaparaoa 0932 New Zealand |
05 Jul 2016 - 22 Jun 2017 |
Entity | Advantage Nominee Company Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429042444336 Company Number: 6040837 |
Newmarket Auckland 1023 New Zealand |
05 Jul 2016 - 30 Jul 2021 |
Entity | Advantage Nominee Company Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429042444336 Company Number: 6040837 |
Newmarket Auckland 1023 New Zealand |
05 Jul 2016 - 30 Jul 2021 |
Entity | Forthem Property Trustee Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429030524286 Company Number: 3994418 |
Riverlea Hamilton Null 3216 New Zealand |
22 Dec 2014 - 19 Dec 2018 |
Individual | Wilson, Kenneth Donald |
R D 6 Whangarei 0176 New Zealand |
27 Feb 2012 - 23 Jan 2017 |
Entity | Advantage Nominee Company Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429042444336 Company Number: 6040837 |
Newmarket Auckland 1023 New Zealand |
05 Jul 2016 - 30 Jul 2021 |
Entity | Advantage Nominee Company Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429042444336 Company Number: 6040837 |
Newmarket Auckland 1023 New Zealand |
05 Jul 2016 - 30 Jul 2021 |
Entity | Auckland Trustees & Executors Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429032913538 Company Number: 2092992 |
Epsom Auckland 1023 New Zealand |
27 Feb 2012 - 07 Sep 2018 |
Entity | Katipo Solutions Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429041629345 Company Number: 5615232 |
Paekakariki Paekakariki 5034 New Zealand |
10 Mar 2016 - 19 Dec 2018 |
Individual | Brown, Darren Richard |
Avondale Auckland |
02 Dec 1998 - 16 Nov 2007 |
Entity | Advantage Nominee Company Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429042444336 Company Number: 6040837 |
62 Highbrook Drive, East Tamaki Auckland 2013 New Zealand |
05 Jul 2016 - 30 Jul 2021 |
Entity | Advantage Nominee Company Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429042444336 Company Number: 6040837 |
62 Highbrook Drive, East Tamaki Auckland 2013 New Zealand |
05 Jul 2016 - 30 Jul 2021 |
Individual | Hattle, Craig |
Oakura New Plymouth 4374 New Zealand |
16 Dec 2013 - 30 Jul 2021 |
Individual | Muller, Nicholas Thomas |
Stanmore Bay Whangaparaoa 0932 New Zealand |
01 Jul 2016 - 22 Jun 2017 |
Individual | Taylor, Bruce Michael |
Takapuna Auckland New Zealand |
23 Feb 2005 - 17 Jan 2018 |
Entity | South Taranaki Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429039583550 Company Number: 352320 |
05 Jul 2016 - 22 Jun 2017 | |
Individual | Larsen, Greg Jonathan |
Milford Auckland 0620 New Zealand |
22 Jun 2017 - 29 Apr 2021 |
Individual | Murray, Steven |
Cambridge 3434 New Zealand |
27 Feb 2012 - 05 Jul 2016 |
Entity | Advantage Business Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037714338 Company Number: 935332 |
Newmarket Auckland 1023 New Zealand |
07 Sep 2018 - 19 Dec 2018 |
Entity | Auckland Trustees & Executors Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429032913538 Company Number: 2092992 |
Epsom Auckland 1023 New Zealand |
27 Feb 2012 - 07 Sep 2018 |
Entity | Advantage Business Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037714338 Company Number: 935332 |
Newmarket Auckland 1023 New Zealand |
07 Sep 2018 - 19 Dec 2018 |
Entity | South Taranaki Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429039583550 Company Number: 352320 |
05 Jul 2016 - 22 Jun 2017 | |
Individual | Haycock, Bruce |
Northcote Auckland |
23 Feb 2005 - 27 Feb 2008 |
Individual | Delany, Gerald |
Birkenhead Auckland |
23 Feb 2005 - 10 Sep 2018 |
Entity | Auckland Trustees & Executors Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429032913538 Company Number: 2092992 |
09 May 2011 - 27 Feb 2012 | |
Entity | Auckland Trustees & Executors Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429032913538 Company Number: 2092992 |
09 May 2011 - 27 Feb 2012 | |
Entity | Forthem Property Trustee Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429030524286 Company Number: 3994418 |
Riverlea Hamilton Null 3216 New Zealand |
22 Dec 2014 - 19 Dec 2018 |
Murray Robert Fulton - Director
Appointment date: 30 Nov 2015
Address: Hauraki, Auckland, 0622 New Zealand
Address used since 30 Nov 2015
Roderick William Way - Director
Appointment date: 19 Jan 2018
Address: Gate Pa, Tauranga, 3112 New Zealand
Address used since 19 Jan 2018
Andrew John Ross - Director
Appointment date: 11 Jan 2019
Address: Rd 2, Palmerston North, 4472 New Zealand
Address used since 11 Jan 2019
Trevor Douglas Clark - Director
Appointment date: 18 Oct 2019
Address: Remuera, Auckland, 1050 New Zealand
Address used since 18 Oct 2019
Dominic Moran - Director
Appointment date: 31 Mar 2022
Address: Rd 2, Hokitika, 7882 New Zealand
Address used since 31 Mar 2022
Dominic Moran - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 15 Jun 2018
Termination date: 17 Aug 2019
Address: Highfield, Timaru, 7910 New Zealand
Address used since 15 Jun 2018
Greg Jonathan Larsen - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 23 Jun 2017
Termination date: 02 Jan 2019
Address: Castor Bay, Auckland, 0620 New Zealand
Address used since 23 Jun 2017
Craig Hattle - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 01 Apr 2013
Termination date: 15 Jun 2018
Address: Oakura, New Plymouth, 4374 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Apr 2013
Address: Rd 4, New Plymouth, 4374 New Zealand
Address used since 05 Jan 2016
Roderick William Way - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 30 Nov 2015
Termination date: 12 Jul 2017
Address: Gate Pa, Tauranga, 3112 New Zealand
Address used since 30 Nov 2015
Katherine Anne Taylor - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 29 Jul 2016
Termination date: 23 Jun 2017
Address: Khandallah, Wellington, 6035 New Zealand
Address used since 29 Jul 2016
Maxwell Stuart Webb - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 02 Aug 2004
Termination date: 29 Jul 2016
Address: St Heliers, Auckland, 1071 New Zealand
Address used since 28 Feb 2014
Gerald Delany - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 02 Aug 2004
Termination date: 29 Jul 2016
Address: Birkdale, North Shore, 0626 New Zealand
Address used since 10 Feb 2016
Bruce Taylor - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 19 Apr 2007
Termination date: 29 Jul 2016
Address: Belmont, Auckland, 0622 New Zealand
Address used since 22 Mar 2016
Kenneth Donald Wilson - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 01 Apr 2011
Termination date: 30 Nov 2015
Address: R D 6, Whangarei, 0176 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Apr 2011
Steven Murray - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 01 Apr 2011
Termination date: 30 Nov 2015
Address: Frankton, Hamilton, 3204 New Zealand
Address used since 28 Feb 2014
Bruce Haycock - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 02 Aug 2004
Termination date: 19 Apr 2007
Address: Northcote, Auckland,
Address used since 02 Aug 2004
Bruce Michael Taylor - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 02 Aug 2004
Termination date: 31 May 2006
Address: Takapuna, Auckland,
Address used since 13 Feb 2006
Darren Richard Brown - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 02 Dec 1998
Termination date: 02 Aug 2004
Address: Avondale, Auckland,
Address used since 02 Dec 1998
Arnott's New Zealand Limited
Level 1, 61-73 Davis Crescent
Cornwall Trustees 73 Limited
Level 6, 135 Broadway
Cornwall Trustees 72 Limited
Level 6, 135 Broadway
Auckland Plumbers Group Limited
Level 4, 19 Morgan Street
Your Property Services Limited
Level 4, 19 Morgan Street
Grovers Investments Limited
Level 6, 135 Broadway
Hideaway Inc Limited
Level 6, 135 Broadway
Kewa Holdings Limited
Level 2, 5-7 Kingdon Street
Lumineer Limited
Level 3 139 Carlton Gore Road
Maa Pharma Consulting Limited
Level 6, 135 Broadway
Nutra Key Limited
Level 3, 12 Kent Street
Seveeno Trustees Limited
Level 6, 135 Broadway