Hallmark Products Limited, a registered company, was started on 10 Jun 1998. 9429037838416 is the NZ business identifier it was issued. This company has been managed by 2 directors: Jason Derek Hall - an active director whose contract began on 10 Jun 1998,
Derek George Hall - an inactive director whose contract began on 07 Mar 2002 and was terminated on 01 Apr 2013.
Updated on 23 Jul 2024, the BizDb database contains detailed information about 3 addresses the company registered, namely: 88 Middlefield Drive, Flat Bush, Auckland, 2016 (service address),
16 Queen Street, Papakura, Papakura, 2110 (registered address),
15A Regis Lane, Flat Bush, Auckland, 2019 (physical address).
Hallmark Products Limited had been using 16 Queen Street, Papakura as their registered address up to 08 Jul 2021.
Past names used by the company, as we identified at BizDb, included: from 10 Jun 1998 to 13 May 2003 they were called Auto Investments Limited.
A total of 1000 shares are allotted to 4 shareholders (2 groups). The first group includes 20 shares (2%) held by 1 entity. There is also a second group which includes 3 shareholders in control of 980 shares (98%).
Previous addresses
Address #1: 16 Queen Street, Papakura, 2110 New Zealand
Registered address used from 07 Jul 2021 to 08 Jul 2021
Address #2: 15a Regis Lane, Flat Bush, Auckland, 2019 New Zealand
Service address used from 23 Jun 2016 to 18 Jun 2024
Address #3: 15a Regis Lane, Flat Bush, Manukau, 2016 New Zealand
Physical address used from 22 Dec 2010 to 23 Jun 2016
Address #4: 55 Middlefield Drive, Dannemora, East Tamaki New Zealand
Physical address used from 06 Jun 2007 to 22 Dec 2010
Address #5: 24 Shepherds Lane, Flat Bush, Manukau City
Physical address used from 08 Mar 2006 to 06 Jun 2007
Address #6: Hallmark Cars Lmvt, 211 Roscommon Road, Wiri, Auckland
Physical address used from 01 Jun 2005 to 08 Mar 2006
Address #7: 16 Queen Street, Papakura, 2110 New Zealand
Registered address used from 14 Apr 2002 to 07 Jul 2021
Address #8: 1 Millhouse Drive, Howick, Auckland
Registered address used from 10 Oct 2001 to 14 Apr 2002
Address #9: 1 Millhouse Drive, Howick, Auckland
Physical address used from 10 Oct 2001 to 10 Oct 2001
Address #10: Hallmark Cars Ltd, 676b Gt South Rd, Manukau, Auckland
Physical address used from 10 Oct 2001 to 01 Jun 2005
Address #11: 80 Reelick Avenue, Pakuranga
Registered & physical address used from 15 Nov 2000 to 10 Oct 2001
Address #12: 80 Reelick Avenue, Pakuranga
Registered address used from 12 Apr 2000 to 15 Nov 2000
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 1000
Annual return filing month: June
Annual return last filed: 09 Jun 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 20 | |||
Individual | Hall, Jason Derek |
Flat Bush Manukau 2019 New Zealand |
10 Jun 1998 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 980 | |||
Individual | Hall, Jason Derek |
Flat Bush Auckland 2019 New Zealand |
01 Aug 2013 - |
Individual | Hall, Derek George |
Flat Bush Auckland 2019 New Zealand |
01 Aug 2013 - |
Individual | Hall, Patricia |
Flat Bush Auckland 2019 New Zealand |
01 Aug 2013 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Hall, Derek George |
Flat Bush Manukau 2016 New Zealand |
30 Jun 2004 - 09 Apr 2013 |
Individual | Hall, Patricia |
Flat Bush Manukau 2016 New Zealand |
30 Jun 2004 - 09 Apr 2013 |
Jason Derek Hall - Director
Appointment date: 10 Jun 1998
Address: Flat Bush, Auckland, 2019 New Zealand
Address used since 10 Jun 2024
Address: Flat Bush, Auckland, 2019 New Zealand
Address used since 15 Jun 2016
Derek George Hall - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 07 Mar 2002
Termination date: 01 Apr 2013
Address: Flat Bush, Manukau, 2016 New Zealand
Address used since 14 Dec 2010
Kaurilands Trustee Limited
16 Queen Street
Ajs Consulting Limited
16 Queen Street
G.w. Butcher Limited
16 Queen Street
Teaching And Training Trust
16 Queen Street
The Tri-synergy Trust
3/16 Queen Street
Cdp Construction Limited
9 Queen Street