Independent Roadfreight Limited was incorporated on 18 May 1998 and issued a business number of 9429037842765. This registered LTD company has been supervised by 1 director, named Peter William Scott - an active director whose contract began on 18 May 1998.
According to our information (updated on 07 Aug 2024), this company uses 1 address: 7 Pah Road, Cockle Bay, Auckland, 2014 (type: physical, registered).
Up to 02 Nov 2016, Independent Roadfreight Limited had been using Second Floor, 60 Durham Street, Tauranga as their physical address.
BizDb identified more names for this company: from 18 May 1998 to 03 Oct 2007 they were named Peter Scott Distributors Limited.
A total of 100 shares are allotted to 3 groups (5 shareholders in total). In the first group, 1 share is held by 1 entity, namely:
Scott, Peter William (an individual) located at Cockle Bay, Howick, Auckland 2014.
Another group consists of 1 shareholder, holds 1% shares (exactly 1 share) and includes
Scott, Barbara Anne - located at Cockle Bay, Howick, Auckland 2014.
The 3rd share allocation (98 shares, 98%) belongs to 3 entities, namely:
Scott, Peter William, located at Cockle Bay, Howick, Auckland 2014 (an individual),
Scott, Barbara Anne, located at Cockle Bay, Howick, Auckland 2014 (an individual),
Craig, Ronald Macmillan, located at Ponsonby, Auckland (an individual).
Previous addresses
Address: Second Floor, 60 Durham Street, Tauranga, 3110 New Zealand
Physical address used from 01 Oct 2013 to 02 Nov 2016
Address: Ingham Mora Limited, 2nd Floor, Realty House, 60 Durham Street, Tauranga, 3110 New Zealand
Physical address used from 10 Jan 2011 to 01 Oct 2013
Address: Ingham Mora Limited, 80 Main Road, Katikati New Zealand
Physical address used from 28 Sep 2007 to 10 Jan 2011
Address: Young Oswald Accountants Limited, 80 Main Road, Katikati
Physical address used from 27 Sep 2005 to 28 Sep 2007
Address: 7 Pah Road, Cockle Bay, Howick, Auckland New Zealand
Registered address used from 13 Apr 2000 to 02 Nov 2016
Address: 7 Pah Road, Cockle Bay, Howick, Auckland
Registered address used from 12 Apr 2000 to 13 Apr 2000
Address: Young Oswald Associates, 80 Main Road, Katikati
Physical address used from 18 May 1998 to 27 Sep 2005
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: September
Annual return last filed: 17 Nov 2021
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 1 | |||
Individual | Scott, Peter William |
Cockle Bay Howick, Auckland 2014 New Zealand |
18 May 1998 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 1 | |||
Individual | Scott, Barbara Anne |
Cockle Bay Howick, Auckland 2014 New Zealand |
18 May 1998 - |
Shares Allocation #3 Number of Shares: 98 | |||
Individual | Scott, Peter William |
Cockle Bay Howick, Auckland 2014 New Zealand |
18 May 1998 - |
Individual | Scott, Barbara Anne |
Cockle Bay Howick, Auckland 2014 New Zealand |
18 May 1998 - |
Individual | Craig, Ronald Macmillan |
Ponsonby Auckland New Zealand |
26 Nov 2009 - |
Peter William Scott - Director
Appointment date: 18 May 1998
Address: Cockle Bay, Auckland, 2014 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Jul 2015
O B Enterprises Limited
5 Pah Road
Jag Management Limited
75 Churchill Road
Pandora Trustee Services Limited
65 Churchill Road
The Cockle Bay Playcentre Incorporated
17 Pah Road
Nevax Limited
16a Pah Road
Suzyq Limited
16 Pah Road