Zwerink Auckland Limited, a registered company, was started on 26 Mar 1998. 9429037883447 is the NZBN it was issued. This company has been run by 2 directors: Michel Carolus Bernardus Zwerink - an active director whose contract started on 26 Mar 1998,
Roelofje Harmina Zwerink - an active director whose contract started on 26 Mar 1998.
Updated on 19 Aug 2024, BizDb's data contains detailed information about 1 address: 14 Long Road, Rd 1, Henderson, 0781 (type: registered, physical).
Zwerink Auckland Limited had been using C/-Collins & Associates Ltd, 154 Great South Road, Takanini, Auckland as their physical address up to 27 Jul 2012.
A total of 1000 shares are allocated to 2 shareholders (2 groups). The first group consists of 500 shares (50%) held by 1 entity. Next we have the second group which includes 1 shareholder in control of 500 shares (50%).
Previous addresses
Address: C/-collins & Associates Ltd, 154 Great South Road, Takanini, Auckland New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 17 May 2010 to 27 Jul 2012
Address: 1 Coles Crescent, Papakura, Auckland
Physical address used from 03 Nov 2004 to 17 May 2010
Address: 1 Coles Crescent, Papakura, Auckland
Registered address used from 01 Sep 2004 to 17 May 2010
Address: Jolly Duncan & Wells, 127 Main Highway, Ellerslie, Auckland
Registered address used from 12 Apr 2000 to 01 Sep 2004
Address: Jolly Duncan & Wells, 127 Main Highway, Ellerslie, Auckland
Physical address used from 26 Mar 1998 to 03 Nov 2004
Address: Jolly Duncan & Wells, 127 Main Highway, Ellerslie, Auckland
Registered address used from 26 Mar 1998 to 12 Apr 2000
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 1000
Annual return filing month: November
Annual return last filed: 06 Nov 2023
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 500 | |||
Individual | Zwerink, Roelofje Harmina |
Rd 1 Henderson 0781 New Zealand |
26 Mar 1998 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 500 | |||
Individual | Zwerink, Michel Carolus Bernardus |
Rd 1 Henderson 0781 New Zealand |
26 Mar 1998 - |
Michel Carolus Bernardus Zwerink - Director
Appointment date: 26 Mar 1998
Address: Rd 1, Henderson, 0781 New Zealand
Address used since 02 Jul 2012
Roelofje Harmina Zwerink - Director
Appointment date: 26 Mar 1998
Address: Rd 1, Henderson, 0781 New Zealand
Address used since 02 Jul 2012
Satmin Investments Limited
86 Bethells Road
Bethells Farmstay For Dogs Limited
112 Te Henga Road
Extractive Management Services Limited
94 Bethells Road
Aristos Consultants Limited
96 Bethells Road
Aio Wira Centre
8 Aiowira Road
Striegor Limited
98 Bethells Road