New Zealand Bands Limited, a registered company, was incorporated on 09 Oct 1997. 9429037995379 is the number it was issued. "Musician" (business classification R900237) is how the company is categorised. This company has been supervised by 7 directors: John Alan Sullivan - an active director whose contract began on 20 May 2018,
Emily Joanne Richards - an active director whose contract began on 10 Nov 2019,
Evan Thomas Sayer - an inactive director whose contract began on 04 Nov 2012 and was terminated on 10 Nov 2018,
Robert Wilson - an inactive director whose contract began on 23 Jul 2009 and was terminated on 23 Aug 2017,
Dianne Judith Smeehuyzen - an inactive director whose contract began on 10 Mar 2003 and was terminated on 04 Nov 2012.
Last updated on 31 Jul 2024, our database contains detailed information about 1 address: 159 Gayhurst Road, Dallington, Christchurch, 8061 (types include: postal, office).
New Zealand Bands Limited had been using 124 Willis Street, Te Aro, Wellington as their registered address until 17 Aug 2016.
One entity owns all company shares (exactly 100 shares) - Brass Band Association Of New Zealand Incorporated - located at 8061, Dallington, Christchurch.
Principal place of activity
159 Gayhurst Road, Dallington, Christchurch, 8061 New Zealand
Previous addresses
Address #1: 124 Willis Street, Te Aro, Wellington, 6011 New Zealand
Registered address used from 03 Sep 2014 to 17 Aug 2016
Address #2: 124 Willis Street, Te Aro, Wellington, 6011 New Zealand
Physical address used from 02 Sep 2014 to 17 Aug 2016
Address #3: C/- Bbanz, 124 Willis Street, Wellingtron, 6011 New Zealand
Registered address used from 02 Sep 2014 to 03 Sep 2014
Address #4: C/- Bbanz, Level 3, 69 Boulcott Street, Wellington, 6011 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 06 Sep 2011 to 02 Sep 2014
Address #5: C/-b B A N Z, Level 3, 69 Boulcott Street, Wellington, 6011 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 26 Aug 2010 to 06 Sep 2011
Address #6: C/-b B A N Z, Level 3, 69 Boulcott Street, Wellington New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 27 Nov 2007 to 26 Aug 2010
Address #7: Mcintyre Dick & Partners, 160 Spey Street, Invercargill
Physical & registered address used from 08 Oct 2004 to 27 Nov 2007
Address #8: Suit B, Betty Campbell Complex, Level 2, Harbour City Centre, 40 Panama Street, Wellington
Physical & registered address used from 08 Jul 2003 to 08 Oct 2004
Address #9: Suit B, Betty Campbell Complex,, Level 2, Harbour City Centre,, 40 Panama Street, Wellington
Registered address used from 08 Jul 2003 to 08 Jul 2003
Address #10: 70 St. Asaph Street, Christchurch
Registered address used from 11 Apr 2000 to 08 Jul 2003
Address #11: 70 St. Asaph Street, Christchurch
Physical address used from 10 Oct 1997 to 08 Jul 2003
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: August
Annual return last filed: 02 Aug 2023
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation Number of Shares: 100 | |||
Other (Other) | Brass Band Association Of New Zealand Incorporated |
Dallington Christchurch 8061 New Zealand |
14 Aug 2018 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Entity | Brass Band Association Of New Zealand Incorporated Company Number: 219861 |
Wellington |
09 Oct 1997 - 14 Aug 2018 |
Entity | Brass Band Association Of New Zealand Incorporated Company Number: 219861 |
Wellington |
09 Oct 1997 - 14 Aug 2018 |
John Alan Sullivan - Director
Appointment date: 20 May 2018
Address: Birkenhead, Auckland, 0626 New Zealand
Address used since 20 May 2018
Emily Joanne Richards - Director
Appointment date: 10 Nov 2019
Address: Wadestown, Wellington, 6012 New Zealand
Address used since 10 Nov 2019
Evan Thomas Sayer - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 04 Nov 2012
Termination date: 10 Nov 2018
Address: Ebdentown, Upper Hutt, 5018 New Zealand
Address used since 08 Sep 2017
Robert Wilson - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 23 Jul 2009
Termination date: 23 Aug 2017
Address: Papamoa Beach, Papamoa, 3118 New Zealand
Address used since 09 Aug 2016
Dianne Judith Smeehuyzen - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 10 Mar 2003
Termination date: 04 Nov 2012
Address: Ravensbourne, Dunedin, 9022 New Zealand
Address used since 10 Mar 2003
Kevin Edward Dell - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 09 Oct 1997
Termination date: 25 Jun 2009
Address: Invercargill,
Address used since 09 Oct 1997
William Rowan Platt - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 09 Oct 1997
Termination date: 10 Mar 2003
Address: Khandallah, Wellington,
Address used since 09 Oct 1997
Brass Band Association Of New Zealand Incorporated
159 Gayhurst Road
Flyrite Dart Club Incorporated
24 Bramwell Street
Dallington Community Cottage Trust
46a Mcbratneys Road
Jkb Installs Limited
11 Strathfield Avenue
Shea Scaffolding Limited
28 Mcbratneys Road
Trade Aid Importers Limited
174 Gayhurst Road
Edna Street Limited
13 Edna Street
Flying Lemmings Limited
1/370 Hereford Street
Foolsday Limited
Unit 6
Lois May Music Limited
19 Arran Crescent
Look At Me Promotions Limited
100 Linwood Ave
Loretta Recordings Limited
151 Fitzherald Avenue