Valtex Investments Limited was started on 04 Sep 1997 and issued an NZBN of 9429038021893. The registered LTD company has been run by 7 directors: David Allen Stratford - an active director whose contract started on 04 Sep 1997,
David Allen Stratfrod - an active director whose contract started on 04 Sep 1997,
Peter Allan Rutherford - an active director whose contract started on 04 Sep 1997,
Hou Tong - an active director whose contract started on 07 Nov 2017,
Jennifer Lee Rutherford - an active director whose contract started on 01 Nov 2022.
According to the BizDb information (last updated on 07 Sep 2024), this company registered 3 addresses: Level 1, 106 Collingwood Street, Nelson, 7010 (registered address),
Level 1, 106 Collingwood Street, Nelson, 7010 (service address),
106 Collingwood Street, Level 1, Nelson, 7010 (physical address),
Level 1, 106 Collingwood Street, Nelson, 7010 (registered address) among others.
Up to 15 Nov 2022, Valtex Investments Limited had been using 115 Bolt Road54 Montgomery Square,, Nelson as their registered address.
BizDb found former names for this company: from 13 Apr 1999 to 14 Nov 2000 they were called Valtex Horticulture Limited, from 04 Sep 1997 to 13 Apr 1999 they were called Valiant Horticulture Limited.
A total of 150000 shares are allocated to 4 groups (4 shareholders in total). As far as the first group is concerned, 30000 shares are held by 1 entity, namely:
Stratford, David Allen (an individual) located at The Wood, Nelson postcode 7010.
Another group consists of 1 shareholder, holds 33.33 per cent shares (exactly 50000 shares) and includes
Ritex International Limited - located at Nelson.
The next share allocation (40000 shares, 26.67%) belongs to 1 entity, namely:
Qin, Yu Bi, located at Unit 3, Ding Xin Yuan, No.39, Qijiawen, Nanjing (an individual). Valtex Investments Limited was categorised as "Rental of commercial property" (ANZSIC L671250).
Previous addresses
Address #1: 115 Bolt Road54 Montgomery Square,, Nelson, 7010 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 11 Nov 2021 to 15 Nov 2022
Address #2: 115 Bolt Road, Tahunanui, Nelson New Zealand
Registered address used from 12 Apr 2000 to 11 Nov 2021
Address #3: 115 Bolt Road, Tahunanui, Nelson
Registered address used from 11 Apr 2000 to 12 Apr 2000
Address #4: 115 Bolt Road, Tahunanui, Nelson New Zealand
Physical address used from 05 Sep 1997 to 11 Nov 2021
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 150000
Annual return filing month: November
Annual return last filed: 14 Nov 2023
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 30000 | |||
Individual | Stratford, David Allen |
The Wood Nelson 7010 New Zealand |
04 Sep 1997 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 50000 | |||
Entity (NZ Limited Company) | Ritex International Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429039513823 |
Nelson 7010 New Zealand |
04 Sep 1997 - |
Shares Allocation #3 Number of Shares: 40000 | |||
Individual | Qin, Yu Bi |
Unit 3, Ding Xin Yuan, No.39 Qijiawen, Nanjing 210009 China |
04 Sep 1997 - |
Shares Allocation #4 Number of Shares: 30000 | |||
Individual | Rutherford, Peter Allan |
Stoke Nelson 7011 New Zealand |
04 Sep 1997 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Norton, Stephen Howard |
Remuera Auckland New Zealand |
04 Sep 1997 - 05 May 2014 |
David Allen Stratford - Director
Appointment date: 04 Sep 1997
Address: The Wood, Nelson, 7010 New Zealand
Address used since 15 Nov 2023
Address: Tahunanui, Nelson, 7011 New Zealand
Address used since 04 Sep 1997
David Allen Stratfrod - Director
Appointment date: 04 Sep 1997
Address: Tahunanui, Nelson, 7011 New Zealand
Address used since 04 Sep 1997
Peter Allan Rutherford - Director
Appointment date: 04 Sep 1997
Address: Stoke, Nelson, 7011 New Zealand
Address used since 15 Nov 2023
Address: Stoke, Nelson, 7010 New Zealand
Address used since 30 Nov 2015
Hou Tong - Director
Appointment date: 07 Nov 2017
Address: Qijiawan, Nanjing, China
Address used since 07 Nov 2017
Jennifer Lee Rutherford - Director
Appointment date: 01 Nov 2022
Address: Porirua, 5381 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Nov 2022
Blair Allan Rutherford - Director
Appointment date: 01 Nov 2022
Address: Berhampore, Wellington, 6023 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Nov 2022
Stephen Howard Norton - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 04 Sep 1997
Termination date: 08 Jun 2010
Address: Remuera, Auckland, 1072 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Feb 2004
Protectamat Nz Limited
109 Bolt Road
Nelson Collective Union Incorporated
121 Bolt Road
Nzks Custodian Limited
93 Beatty Street
Victory Boxing Charitable Trust
80 Beatty Street
Automotive Vision Limited
85 Beatty Street
Fwd Spares Limited
12 Quarantine Road
Cgen Properties Limited
129 Pascoe Street
Cwl Limited
77 Tahunanui Drive
Oale Limited
42 Arapiki Road
Rockford Property Rentals Limited
8a Merton Place
Seascape Ventures Limited
77 Tahunanui Drive
Sportswise Enterprises Limited
8a Merton Place