Mohakatino Station Limited, a registered company, was registered on 04 Apr 1997. 9429038117350 is the number it was issued. The company has been supervised by 3 directors: Myriam Gwendoline Radich - an active director whose contract started on 07 Apr 2011,
Maeve Joy Mclellan - an inactive director whose contract started on 30 May 2008 and was terminated on 07 Apr 2011,
Gavin George Hutchinson - an inactive director whose contract started on 04 Apr 1997 and was terminated on 30 May 2008.
Last updated on 23 Aug 2024, our data contains detailed information about 1 address: 87 Regan Street, Stratford (type: registered, physical).
Mohakatino Station Limited had been using Capper Macdonald & King, Chartered Accountant, Cnr Regan & Miranda Streets, Stratford as their registered address until 11 Apr 2001.
A total of 10000 shares are issued to 11 shareholders (4 groups). The first group consists of 500 shares (5 per cent) held by 3 entities. There is also a second group which includes 2 shareholders in control of 5000 shares (50 per cent). Lastly we have the third share allocation (2500 shares 25 per cent) made up of 3 entities.
Previous addresses
Address #1: Capper Macdonald & King, Chartered Accountant, Cnr Regan & Miranda Streets, Stratford
Registered address used from 11 Apr 2001 to 11 Apr 2001
Address #2: Capper Macdonald & King, Chartered Accountant, Cnr Regan & Miranda Streets, Stratford
Registered address used from 18 Apr 2000 to 11 Apr 2001
Address #3: Capper Macdonald & King, Chartered Accountant, Cnr Broadway & Regan Street, Stratford
Registered address used from 11 Apr 2000 to 18 Apr 2000
Address #4: Capper Macdonald & King, Chartered Accountant, Cnr Broadway & Regan Street, Stratford
Registered address used from 10 May 1999 to 11 Apr 2000
Address #5: Capper Macdonald & King, Chartered Accountant, Cnr Broadway & Regan Street, Stratford
Physical address used from 10 May 1999 to 10 May 1999
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 10000
Annual return filing month: April
Annual return last filed: 15 Apr 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 500 | |||
Individual | Hutchinson, Billy Paul |
Mokau 4376 New Zealand |
15 Apr 2011 - |
Individual | Hutchinson, Emma-gene |
Main Road, Rd 1 Mokau 4376 New Zealand |
16 Sep 2013 - |
Entity (NZ Limited Company) | Th Trustees 2012 Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429030743359 |
New Plymouth New Plymouth 4310 New Zealand |
12 Sep 2014 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 5000 | |||
Director | Radich, Myriam Gwendoline |
Rd 1 Mokau 4376 New Zealand |
15 Apr 2011 - |
Entity (NZ Limited Company) | Mgr Hutchinson Trustee Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429034068588 |
Stratford 4332 New Zealand |
15 Apr 2011 - |
Shares Allocation #3 Number of Shares: 2500 | |||
Individual | Hutchinson, Wyatt Samuel |
Mokau 4376 New Zealand |
15 Apr 2011 - |
Director | Radich, Myriam Gwendoline |
Rd 1 Mokau 4376 New Zealand |
15 Apr 2011 - |
Entity (NZ Limited Company) | Mgr Hutchinson Trustee Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429034068588 |
Stratford 4332 New Zealand |
15 Apr 2011 - |
Shares Allocation #4 Number of Shares: 2000 | |||
Entity (NZ Limited Company) | Mgr Hutchinson Trustee Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429034068588 |
Stratford 4332 New Zealand |
15 Apr 2011 - |
Individual | Hutchinson, Billy Paul |
Mokau 4376 New Zealand |
15 Apr 2011 - |
Individual | Hutchinson, Emma-gene |
Main Road, Rd 1 Mokau 4376 New Zealand |
16 Sep 2013 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Mclellan, Maeve Joy |
Stratford 4396 New Zealand |
08 Jan 2009 - 15 Apr 2011 |
Individual | Hutchinson, Clint Denis |
Stratford 4396 New Zealand |
15 Apr 2011 - 02 Sep 2014 |
Individual | Hutchinson, Gavin George |
Mokau |
04 Apr 1997 - 27 Jun 2010 |
Myriam Gwendoline Radich - Director
Appointment date: 07 Apr 2011
Address: Rd 1, Mokau, 4376 New Zealand
Address used since 28 Apr 2015
Maeve Joy Mclellan - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 30 May 2008
Termination date: 07 Apr 2011
Address: Rd 26, Stratford 4396,
Address used since 30 May 2008
Gavin George Hutchinson - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 04 Apr 1997
Termination date: 30 May 2008
Address: Mokau, Stratford,
Address used since 04 Apr 1997
Darke Trustee Limited
87 Regan Street
Penulto Dairies Limited
87 Regan Street
You Needham Electrical Limited
87 Regan Street
York Farm 2013 Limited
87 Regan Street
Bergton Farm Limited
87 Regan Street
Wmj & Caj Trustees Limited
87 Regan Street