Gp Motors Limited, a registered company, was launched on 11 Oct 1996. 9429038221767 is the NZ business identifier it was issued. This company has been supervised by 2 directors: Graham Frederick Porter - an active director whose contract started on 16 Oct 1998,
Robert Geoffrey Paul Leane - an inactive director whose contract started on 11 Oct 1996 and was terminated on 16 Oct 1998.
Updated on 21 Aug 2024, BizDb's data contains detailed information about 1 address: 8 Bond Crescent, Forrest Hill, Auckland, 0620 (types include: physical, registered).
Gp Motors Limited had been using 8 Bond Cres, Forrest Hill, Auckland 1309 as their registered address until 06 May 2010.
More names for this company, as we established at BizDb, included: from 11 Oct 1996 to 06 May 1999 they were named Oasis Exteriors Limited.
A single entity owns all company shares (exactly 100 shares) - Porter, Graham Frederick - located at 0620, Forrest Hill, Auckland.
Previous addresses
Address: 8 Bond Cres, Forrest Hill, Auckland 1309
Registered address used from 11 Apr 2000 to 06 May 2010
Address: 8 Bond Cres, Forrest Hill, Auckland 1309
Physical address used from 11 Oct 1996 to 06 May 2010
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: April
Annual return last filed: 07 Jun 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation Number of Shares: 100 | |||
Individual | Porter, Graham Frederick |
Forrest Hill Auckland 0620 New Zealand |
11 Oct 1996 - |
Graham Frederick Porter - Director
Appointment date: 16 Oct 1998
Address: Forrest Hill, North Shore City, 0620 New Zealand
Address used since 29 Apr 2010
Robert Geoffrey Paul Leane - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 11 Oct 1996
Termination date: 16 Oct 1998
Address: Ranui, Auckland,
Address used since 11 Oct 1996
David Porter Construction Limited
8 Bond Crescent
Drp Holdings Limited
8 Bond Crescent
Datatrack Limited
8 Bond Crescent
Gracon Corporation Limited
8 Bond Crescent
The Ends Of The Earth (teote) Trust
8 Bond Crescent
Allit Limited
12 B Bond Crescent