Waerenga Service Station Limited, a registered company, was registered on 13 Jun 1996. 9429038299902 is the New Zealand Business Number it was issued. The company has been managed by 4 directors: Sandra Ivy Katterns - an active director whose contract started on 18 Dec 2017,
Katrina Lee Lang - an active director whose contract started on 18 Dec 2017,
Steven Katterns - an inactive director whose contract started on 13 Jun 1996 and was terminated on 18 Dec 2017,
Rosalind Patricia Katterns - an inactive director whose contract started on 13 Jun 1996 and was terminated on 03 Nov 2011.
Last updated on 01 Aug 2024, the BizDb data contains detailed information about 1 address: 723 Pollen Street, Thames (type: registered, physical).
Waerenga Service Station Limited had been using C/-Price & Barker, Chartered Accountants, 309B Pollen Street, Thames as their registered address up until 08 Feb 2007.
All shares (1000 shares exactly) are owned by a single group consisting of 2 entities, namely:
Katterns, Sandra Ivy (an individual) located at Snells Beach, Snells Beach postcode 0920,
Lang, Katrina Lee (an individual) located at Dargaville, Dargaville postcode 0310.
Previous addresses
Address: C/-price & Barker, Chartered Accountants, 309b Pollen Street, Thames
Registered & physical address used from 26 Jan 2006 to 08 Feb 2007
Address: Waerenga Service Station, Waerenga Road, Waerenga (near Te Kauwhata)
Physical address used from 13 Nov 2000 to 13 Nov 2000
Address: 309b Pollen Street, Thames
Physical address used from 13 Nov 2000 to 26 Jan 2006
Address: Waerenga Service Station, Waerenga Road, Waerenga (near Te Kauwhata)
Registered address used from 13 Nov 2000 to 26 Jan 2006
Address: Waerenga Service Station, Waerenga Road, Waerenga (near Te Kauwhata)
Registered address used from 11 Apr 2000 to 13 Nov 2000
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 1000
Annual return filing month: February
Annual return last filed: 03 Feb 2017
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation Number of Shares: 1000 | |||
Individual | Katterns, Sandra Ivy |
Snells Beach Snells Beach 0920 New Zealand |
18 Dec 2017 - |
Individual | Lang, Katrina Lee |
Dargaville Dargaville 0310 New Zealand |
18 Dec 2017 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Katterns, Rosalind Patricia |
Waerenga |
13 Jun 1996 - 17 Nov 2011 |
Individual | Katterns, Steven |
Waerenga |
13 Jun 1996 - 18 Dec 2017 |
Sandra Ivy Katterns - Director
Appointment date: 18 Dec 2017
Address: Snells Beach, Snells Beach, 0920 New Zealand
Address used since 18 Dec 2017
Katrina Lee Lang - Director
Appointment date: 18 Dec 2017
Address: Dargaville, Dargaville, 0310 New Zealand
Address used since 18 Dec 2017
Steven Katterns - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 13 Jun 1996
Termination date: 18 Dec 2017
Address: Waerenga, Coromandel, 3781 New Zealand
Address used since 05 Feb 2016
Rosalind Patricia Katterns - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 13 Jun 1996
Termination date: 03 Nov 2011
Address: Waerenga,
Address used since 13 Jun 1996
Good Kiwi Kai Limited
723 Pollen Street
Craig Donovan Trust Company Limited
723 Pollen Street
South As Groceries Limited
723 Pollen Street
Longboard Construction Limited
723 Pollen Street
Ground Image Landscaping Limited
723 Pollen Street
R M Harden Limited
723 Pollen Street