Anmark Limited was started on 01 Mar 1995 and issued a New Zealand Business Number of 9429038522512. The registered LTD company has been run by 2 directors: Angela Maree Jones - an active director whose contract started on 01 Mar 1995,
Mark Brian Williams - an active director whose contract started on 01 Mar 1995.
According to our data (last updated on 22 Aug 2024), the company uses 1 address: 16 Cairns Crescent, Rototuna, Hamilton, 3210 (types include: physical, registered).
Up to 07 Mar 2017, Anmark Limited had been using 16 B Clarke Ave, Te Aroha, Waikato as their physical address.
A total of 100 shares are allotted to 2 groups (2 shareholders in total). When considering the first group, 50 shares are held by 1 entity, namely:
Jones, Angela Maree (an individual) located at Rototuna, Hamilton postcode 3210.
Then there is a group that consists of 1 shareholder, holds 50% shares (exactly 50 shares) and includes
Williams, Mark Brian - located at Rototuna, Hamilton.
Previous addresses
Address #1: 16 B Clarke Ave, Te Aroha, Waikato, 3320 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 16 Apr 2012 to 07 Mar 2017
Address #2: 25 Centennial Ave, Te Aroha New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 19 Mar 2010 to 16 Apr 2012
Address #3: 5640 State Highway 26, Rd2, Te Aroha
Registered & physical address used from 15 Apr 2009 to 19 Mar 2010
Address #4: 16 Cairns Crescent, Rototuna, Hamilton
Physical & registered address used from 20 Apr 2007 to 15 Apr 2009
Address #5: 16 Cairns Crescent, Cullum Brae, Hamilton
Physical & registered address used from 20 Feb 2004 to 20 Apr 2007
Address #6: 122 Old Farm Road, Hamilton
Physical & registered address used from 01 Mar 1995 to 20 Feb 2004
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: February
Annual return last filed: 26 Feb 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 50 | |||
Individual | Jones, Angela Maree |
Rototuna Hamilton 3210 New Zealand |
01 Mar 1995 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 50 | |||
Individual | Williams, Mark Brian |
Rototuna Hamilton 3210 New Zealand |
01 Mar 1995 - |
Angela Maree Jones - Director
Appointment date: 01 Mar 1995
Address: Rototuna, Hamilton, 3210 New Zealand
Address used since 07 Mar 2017
Mark Brian Williams - Director
Appointment date: 01 Mar 1995
Address: Rototuna, Hamilton, 3210 New Zealand
Address used since 07 Mar 2017
Spatial Environments Limited
16 Cairns Crescent
Hammonds Electrical Limited
10 Cairns Crescent
Sun Shine Health Care Of Tcm (traditional Chinese Medicine) Limited
389 Hukanui Road
Sunshine Hospitality Limited
389 Hukanui Road
Swrup Limited
412 Hukanui Road
Ng Builders Limited
26 Callum Brae Drive