D & R Ganda Limited, a registered company, was registered on 27 Jun 1994. 9429038591228 is the New Zealand Business Number it was issued. "Service station operation" (business classification G400030) is how the company was categorised. The company has been supervised by 6 directors: Joanne Scholes - an active director whose contract began on 30 Nov 1994,
Dayaram Ganda - an inactive director whose contract began on 30 Nov 1994 and was terminated on 09 Mar 2024,
Margaret Ganda - an inactive director whose contract began on 30 Nov 1994 and was terminated on 12 Mar 1999,
Rasek Ganda - an inactive director whose contract began on 30 Nov 1994 and was terminated on 02 Mar 1999,
Lee Michael Christopher Robinson - an inactive director whose contract began on 27 Jun 1994 and was terminated on 30 Nov 1994.
Last updated on 18 Aug 2024, BizDb's database contains detailed information about 1 address: P O Box 40, Greymouth, 7840 (category: postal, delivery).
D & R Ganda Limited had been using 161 Tainui Street, Greymouth as their physical address until 14 Nov 2012.
Previous aliases used by this company, as we found at BizDb, included: from 27 Jun 1994 to 15 Nov 1994 they were called Malco Shelf No.16 Limited.
One entity controls all company shares (exactly 100 shares) - Scholes, Joanne - located at 7840, Halswell, Christchurch.
Principal place of activity
159-163 Tainui Street, Greymouth, 7805 New Zealand
Previous addresses
Address #1: 161 Tainui Street, Greymouth, 7805 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 31 Oct 2011 to 14 Nov 2012
Address #2: 2nd Floor, 137 Victoria Street, Christchurch, 8013 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 22 Aug 2011 to 31 Oct 2011
Address #3: 161 Tainui Street, Greymouth New Zealand
Physical address used from 13 Nov 2001 to 22 Aug 2011
Address #4: Malley & Co, 7th Floor Amp Centre, 47 Cathedral Square, Christchurch
Physical address used from 13 Nov 2001 to 13 Nov 2001
Address #5: 161 Tainui Street, Greymouth New Zealand
Registered address used from 20 Feb 1995 to 22 Aug 2011
Address #6: Malley & Co, 7th Floor Amp Centre, 47 Cathedral Square, Christchurch
Registered address used from 20 Feb 1995 to 20 Feb 1995
Address #7: Malley & Co, 7th Floor Amp Centre, 47 Cathedral Square, Christchurch
Physical address used from 27 Jun 1994 to 13 Nov 2001
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: November
Annual return last filed: 05 Nov 2023
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation Number of Shares: 100 | |||
Individual | Scholes, Joanne |
Halswell Christchurch 8025 New Zealand |
26 Nov 2003 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Ganda, Dayaram |
Halswell Christchurch 8025 New Zealand |
26 Nov 2003 - 19 Jul 2024 |
Joanne Scholes - Director
Appointment date: 30 Nov 1994
Address: Halswell, Christchurch, 8025 New Zealand
Address used since 02 Nov 2021
Address: Marsden, Greymouth, 7805 New Zealand
Address used since 12 Aug 2011
Dayaram Ganda - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 30 Nov 1994
Termination date: 09 Mar 2024
Address: Halswell, Christchurch, 8025 New Zealand
Address used since 02 Nov 2021
Address: Marsden, Greymouth, 7805 New Zealand
Address used since 12 Aug 2011
Margaret Ganda - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 30 Nov 1994
Termination date: 12 Mar 1999
Address: Greymouth,
Address used since 30 Nov 1994
Rasek Ganda - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 30 Nov 1994
Termination date: 02 Mar 1999
Address: Greymouth,
Address used since 30 Nov 1994
Lee Michael Christopher Robinson - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 27 Jun 1994
Termination date: 30 Nov 1994
Address: Christchurch,
Address used since 27 Jun 1994
James Michael Kirkland - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 27 Jun 1994
Termination date: 30 Nov 1994
Address: Christchurch,
Address used since 27 Jun 1994
D Ganda Enterprises Limited
161 Tainui Street
Half Price Rental Cars Limited
166 Tainui Street
Mitton Electronet Limited
146 Tainui Street
Amethyst Hydro Limited
146 Tainui Street
Electronet Services Limited
146 Tainui Street
Westpower Limited
146 Tainui Street
Dakah Limited
519 Depot Road
G & L Investments (2011) Limited
51 Fitzherbert Street
Graeme's Service Centre Limited
102 Main Street
Methven Motors Limited
170 Main Street
Torlesse Enterprises Limited
639 Browns Rock Road
West Coast Investment 2013 Limited
C/- 19 Herbert Street