Opawa Farm Limited was started on 19 May 1994 and issued a number of 9429038611117. The registered LTD company has been supervised by 3 directors: Claire Marie Sutherland - an active director whose contract started on 19 May 1994,
Raymond Grant Sutherland - an active director whose contract started on 19 May 1994,
Kathryn Marie Sutherland - an inactive director whose contract started on 24 Jun 1997 and was terminated on 26 Jul 2002.
As stated in our database (last updated on 21 Aug 2024), this company registered 1 address: 25D Victoria Avenue, Invercargill, 9810 (category: registered, physical).
Up to 07 Dec 2020, Opawa Farm Limited had been using 208 Havelock Street, Ashburton as their registered address.
BizDb identified more names used by this company: from 19 May 1994 to 23 Jun 1997 they were named Havelock (Shelf Company No. 26) Limited.
A total of 2000 shares are allocated to 1 group (1 sole shareholder). As far as the first group is concerned, 1998 shares are held by 1 entity, namely:
Argyle Welsh Trustees Services Ltd (an other) located at Ashburton postcode 7700.
Previous addresses
Address: 208 Havelock Street, Ashburton, 7700 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 01 Aug 2003 to 07 Dec 2020
Address: Falloon Myers & Co Limited, 201-213 West Street, Ashburton
Physical address used from 18 Apr 2000 to 01 Aug 2003
Address: Messrs Falloon & Grice Ltd, 215 Tancred Street, Ashburton
Physical address used from 18 Apr 2000 to 18 Apr 2000
Address: Mesrs Falloon & Grice Ltd, 215 Tancred Street, Ashburton
Registered address used from 18 Apr 2000 to 01 Aug 2003
Address: Mesrs Falloon & Grice, 215 Tancred Street, Ashburton
Registered address used from 06 May 1999 to 18 Apr 2000
Address: Messrs Falloon & Grice, 215 Tancred Street, Ashburton
Physical address used from 06 May 1999 to 18 Apr 2000
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 2000
Annual return filing month: April
Annual return last filed: 16 Apr 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation Number of Shares: 1998 | |||
Other (Other) | Argyle Welsh Trustees Services Ltd |
Ashburton 7700 New Zealand |
29 Apr 2004 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Sutherland, Claire Marie |
Rd 4 Clydevale 9274 New Zealand |
29 Apr 2004 - 21 Jan 2019 |
Individual | Sutherland, Claire Marie |
Rd 4 Clydevale 9274 New Zealand |
29 Apr 2004 - 21 Jan 2019 |
Individual | Sutherland, Raymond Grant |
Rd 4 Clydevale 9274 New Zealand |
29 Apr 2004 - 21 Jan 2019 |
Individual | Sutherland, Kathryn Marie |
R D 16 Albury |
29 Apr 2004 - 29 Apr 2004 |
Individual | Sutherland, Raymond Grant |
Rd 4 Clydevale 9274 New Zealand |
29 Apr 2004 - 21 Jan 2019 |
Individual | Sutherland, Claire Marie |
Rd 4 Balclutha 9274 New Zealand |
29 Apr 2004 - 21 Jan 2019 |
Individual | Sutherland, Raymond Grant |
Rd 4 Balclutha 9274 New Zealand |
29 Apr 2004 - 21 Jan 2019 |
Individual | Sutherland, Claire Marie |
Rd 4 Balclutha 9274 New Zealand |
29 Apr 2004 - 21 Jan 2019 |
Individual | Sutherland, Raymond Grant |
Rd 4 Balclutha 9274 New Zealand |
29 Apr 2004 - 21 Jan 2019 |
Claire Marie Sutherland - Director
Appointment date: 19 May 1994
Address: Rd 4, Clydevale, 9274 New Zealand
Address used since 07 Feb 2024
Address: Rd 4, Clydevale, 9274 New Zealand
Address used since 14 Apr 2023
Address: Rd 4, Clydevale, 9274 New Zealand
Address used since 08 Jan 2019
Address: Rd 4, Balclutha, 9274 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Jan 2016
Raymond Grant Sutherland - Director
Appointment date: 19 May 1994
Address: Rd 4, Clydevale, 9274 New Zealand
Address used since 07 Feb 2024
Address: Rd 4, Clydevale, 9274 New Zealand
Address used since 14 Apr 2023
Address: Rd 4, Clydevale, 9274 New Zealand
Address used since 08 Jan 2019
Address: Rd 4, Balclutha, 9274 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Apr 2016
Kathryn Marie Sutherland - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 24 Jun 1997
Termination date: 26 Jul 2002
Address: R D 16, Albury,
Address used since 24 Jun 1997
Spaxton Stock Water Limited
208 Havelock Street
Stewarton Farm Limited
208 Havelock Street
T R Stack Building Limited
208 Havelock Street
Stack Farming Limited
208 Havelock Street
L & N Jones Farms Limited
208 Havelock Street
Ludemann Dairies Limited
208 Havelock Street