Frontline Solutions Limited, a registered company, was started on 09 Sep 1994. 9429038659003 is the NZBN it was issued. This company has been run by 3 directors: Douglas Bruce Cowie - an active director whose contract began on 09 Sep 1994,
Gillian Lindsay Cowie - an active director whose contract began on 30 Apr 1999,
Kenneth John Parker - an inactive director whose contract began on 09 Sep 1994 and was terminated on 30 Apr 1999.
Last updated on 19 Sep 2024, our data contains detailed information about 1 address: Flat 1, 30 Challenger Street, St Heliers, Auckland, 1071 (category: registered, service).
Frontline Solutions Limited had been using 1/33 Ponsonby Road, Ponsonby, Auckland as their physical address up to 17 Jun 2015.
A total of 100 shares are allocated to 2 shareholders (2 groups). The first group includes 50 shares (50%) held by 1 entity. Next there is the second group which includes 1 shareholder in control of 50 shares (50%).
Previous addresses
Address #1: 1/33 Ponsonby Road, Ponsonby, Auckland, 1011 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 13 May 2011 to 17 Jun 2015
Address #2: Lay Dodd Partners, 3 Owens Road, Epsom, Auckland New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 19 Dec 2008 to 13 May 2011
Address #3: C/- Lay Dodd & Partners, 349 Remuera Road, Auckland
Physical address used from 24 Aug 1998 to 24 Aug 1998
Address #4: C/- Lay Dodd & Partners, Chartered, Accountants, Level One, 10 College, Hill, Ponsonby, Auckland
Physical address used from 24 Aug 1998 to 19 Dec 2008
Address #5: C/- Lay Dodd & Partners, 349 Remuera Road, Auckland
Registered address used from 01 Jun 1995 to 19 Dec 2008
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: May
Annual return last filed: 10 Jun 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 50 | |||
Director | Cowie, Douglas Bruce |
30 Challenger Street Saint Heliers, Auckland 1071 New Zealand |
14 May 2012 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 50 | |||
Director | Cowie, Gillian Lindsay |
30 Challenger Street Saint Heliers, Auckland 1071 New Zealand |
14 May 2012 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Entity | Lay Dodd Trustee Services Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429035360353 Company Number: 1519485 |
31 May 2007 - 14 May 2012 | |
Entity | Lovegroves Trustee Services Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429034693346 Company Number: 1651176 |
31 May 2007 - 14 May 2012 | |
Entity | Lay Dodd Trustee Services Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429035360353 Company Number: 1519485 |
31 May 2007 - 14 May 2012 | |
Individual | Cowie, Gillian Lindsay |
St Heliers Auckland |
09 Sep 1994 - 02 May 2005 |
Individual | Cowie, Douglas Bruce |
St Heliers Auckland |
09 Sep 1994 - 02 May 2005 |
Entity | Lovegroves Trustee Services Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429034693346 Company Number: 1651176 |
31 May 2007 - 14 May 2012 |
Douglas Bruce Cowie - Director
Appointment date: 09 Sep 1994
Address: 30 Challenger Street, Saint Heliers, Auckland, 1071 New Zealand
Address used since 14 May 2010
Gillian Lindsay Cowie - Director
Appointment date: 30 Apr 1999
Address: 30 Challenger Street, Saint Heliers, Auckland, 1071 New Zealand
Address used since 14 May 2010
Kenneth John Parker - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 09 Sep 1994
Termination date: 30 Apr 1999
Address: Forrest Hill, Auckland 10,
Address used since 09 Sep 1994
Ez & Ness Trustee Company Limited
33 Ponsonby Road
Rashmi Raman Trustee Services Limited
1/33 Ponsonby Road
Green Light Services Limited
1/33-35 Ponsonby Road
Rmh Investments Limited
1/33 Ponsonby Road
Cynosure Resources Limited
1/33 Ponsonby Road
Ttl Trustee Limited
Flat 2a, 33 Ponsonby Road