F M Tickner Holdings Limited, a registered company, was launched on 24 Jun 1993. 9429038873430 is the NZBN it was issued. This company has been run by 3 directors: Joanne Elizabeth Tickner - an active director whose contract started on 04 Jul 2002,
Lilian May Tickner - an inactive director whose contract started on 24 Jun 1993 and was terminated on 08 Dec 2020,
Frank Mcdonald Tickner - an inactive director whose contract started on 24 Jun 1993 and was terminated on 12 Mar 2006.
Last updated on 21 Aug 2024, the BizDb data contains detailed information about 3 addresses the company registered, specifically: Level 8, 191 Queen Street, Auckland Central, Auckland, 1010 (registered address),
Level 8, 191 Queen Street, Auckland Central, Auckland, 1010 (service address),
67 Raffles Street, Napier South, Napier, 4110 (physical address),
19 Birdwood Street, Taradale, Napier, 4112 (other address) among others.
F M Tickner Holdings Limited had been using 67 Raffles Street, Napier South, Napier as their registered address up until 02 May 2023.
More names for the company, as we found at BizDb, included: from 24 Jun 1993 to 01 Aug 1994 they were called Raffles Shelf (No 49) Limited.
A single entity controls all company shares (exactly 5 shares) - Perpetual Trust Limited - located at 1010, 191 Queen Street, Auckland.
Previous addresses
Address #1: 67 Raffles Street, Napier South, Napier, 4110 New Zealand
Registered & service address used from 03 Feb 2021 to 02 May 2023
Address #2: 19 Birdwood Street, Taradale, Napier, 4112 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 20 May 2015 to 03 Feb 2021
Address #3: 19 Birdwood Street, Taradale Napier New Zealand
Registered address used from 18 Apr 2007 to 20 May 2015
Address #4: 14 A Harvey Road, Napier New Zealand
Physical address used from 05 May 2006 to 20 May 2015
Address #5: C/o R.h. Wimsett, Chartered Accountant, 37 Cameron Road, Napier
Physical address used from 27 May 2004 to 05 May 2006
Address #6: 1972 Pakowhai Road, Pakowhai, Hawkes Bay
Registered address used from 27 May 2004 to 18 Apr 2007
Address #7: Denton Donovan, Chartered Accountants, 115n King Street, Hastings
Physical address used from 20 Apr 2000 to 20 Apr 2000
Address #8: Denton Donovan, Chartered Accountants, 115n King Street, Hastings
Registered address used from 20 Sep 1999 to 27 May 2004
Address #9: C/- Kpmg Peat Marwick, Chartered Accountant, 86 Station Street, Napier
Registered address used from 15 May 1995 to 20 Sep 1999
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 10
Annual return filing month: April
Annual return last filed: 29 Apr 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation Number of Shares: 5 | |||
Entity (NZ Limited Company) | Perpetual Trust Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429040325019 |
191 Queen Street Auckland 1010 New Zealand |
23 Apr 2023 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Tickner, Lilian May |
Taradale Napier New Zealand |
24 Jun 1993 - 14 Jan 2021 |
Entity | Cdt 5 Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429033724096 Company Number: 1890028 |
67 Raffles Street Napier 4142 New Zealand |
16 Jul 2007 - 18 Apr 2023 |
Individual | Wimsett, Rodney Harrison |
Napier New Zealand |
24 Jun 1993 - 12 May 2015 |
Individual | Tickner, Frank Mcdonald |
R.d.3 Napier |
24 Jun 1993 - 30 Apr 2006 |
Individual | Tickner, Frank Mcdonald |
R.d.3 Napier |
24 Jun 1993 - 30 Apr 2006 |
Individual | Tickner, Lilian May |
Taradale Napier New Zealand |
24 Jun 1993 - 14 Jan 2021 |
Individual | Wimsett, Rodney Harrison |
Napier New Zealand |
24 Jun 1993 - 12 May 2015 |
Entity | Perpetual Trustee Company Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429035897132 Company Number: 1343582 |
18 Apr 2023 - 23 Apr 2023 | |
Entity | Cdt 5 Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429033724096 Company Number: 1890028 |
67 Raffles Street Napier 4142 New Zealand |
16 Jul 2007 - 18 Apr 2023 |
Entity | Cdt 5 Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429033724096 Company Number: 1890028 |
67 Raffles Street Napier 4142 New Zealand |
16 Jul 2007 - 18 Apr 2023 |
Individual | Tickner, Lilian May |
Taradale Napier New Zealand |
24 Jun 1993 - 14 Jan 2021 |
Individual | Tickner, Lilian May |
Taradale Napier New Zealand |
24 Jun 1993 - 14 Jan 2021 |
Individual | Tickner, Lilian May |
Taradale Napier New Zealand |
24 Jun 1993 - 14 Jan 2021 |
Individual | Very, Hilton R |
R D 3 Napier |
24 Jun 1993 - 30 Apr 2006 |
Joanne Elizabeth Tickner - Director
Appointment date: 04 Jul 2002
Address: Rd 1, Queenstown, 9371 New Zealand
Address used since 20 Apr 2010
Lilian May Tickner - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 24 Jun 1993
Termination date: 08 Dec 2020
Address: Taradale, Napier, 4112 New Zealand
Address used since 25 Nov 2006
Frank Mcdonald Tickner - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 24 Jun 1993
Termination date: 12 Mar 2006
Address: R.d.3, Napier,
Address used since 24 Jun 1993
Bay City Vineyard Christian Fellowship Trust
23 Birdwood Street
Louise And Shane Williams Trustee Limited
10 D'arcy Place
Gary Berntsen Accounting & Taxation Services Limited
26 Birdwood Street
East Coast Ski Club Incorporated
26 Birdwood Street
Booth Tools Limited
93a Puketapu Road
Cloth Nz Limited
4 Ewan Place