Goodman Holdings Limited, a registered company, was started on 25 May 1992. 9429038998201 is the NZBN it was issued. The company has been managed by 9 directors: Lance Richard Goodman - an active director whose contract started on 25 Aug 2006,
Vaughan Norman Goodman - an active director whose contract started on 25 Aug 2006,
Marianne Therese Archer - an active director whose contract started on 25 Aug 2006,
Stanley Francis Goodman - an active director whose contract started on 25 Aug 2006,
Richard Philip Goodman - an inactive director whose contract started on 25 Aug 2006 and was terminated on 01 Jun 2020.
Last updated on 15 Aug 2024, BizDb's data contains detailed information about 1 address: 4 Anne Street, Waikanae, 5036 (type: physical, registered).
Goodman Holdings Limited had been using 59 Cuba Street, Petone as their physical address up until 21 Sep 1999.
More names used by the company, as we identified at BizDb, included: from 08 Dec 1993 to 08 Dec 1994 they were called Rick Goodman and Sons Limited, from 24 Aug 1992 to 08 Dec 1993 they were called Camgood Cabling Limited and from 25 May 1992 to 24 Aug 1992 they were called Allenby Enterprises Limited.
A single entity controls all company shares (exactly 1000 shares) - Goodman Group Holdings Limited - located at 5036, 633 Main Street, Palmerston North.
Previous addresses
Address: 59 Cuba Street, Petone
Physical & registered address used from 21 Sep 1999 to 21 Sep 1999
Address: 11 Mahara Place, Waikanae
Physical address used from 15 Oct 1998 to 21 Sep 1999
Address: Barlow & Associates, 11 Mahara Place, Waikanae
Registered address used from 15 Oct 1998 to 21 Sep 1999
Address: C/- Berry & Walker, Chartered Accountant, 1st Floor , Nz Car Parts Building, 20b Parumoana Street, Porirua
Physical address used from 30 Oct 1997 to 15 Oct 1998
Address: 5 Riverglade, Waikanae
Registered address used from 30 Oct 1997 to 15 Oct 1998
Address: 10 Seaview Road, Paraparaumu Beach
Registered address used from 04 Sep 1995 to 30 Oct 1997
Address: 1st Floor, Kelvin Chambers, 44-52 The Terrace, Wellington
Registered address used from 27 Aug 1992 to 04 Sep 1995
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 1000
Annual return filing month: February
Annual return last filed: 02 Feb 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation Number of Shares: 1000 | |||
Entity (NZ Limited Company) | Goodman Group Holdings Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429033909806 |
633 Main Street Palmerston North |
27 Sep 2006 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Goodman, Richard Philip |
Waikanae |
25 May 1992 - 04 Nov 2005 |
Individual | Goodman, Helen Ann |
Waikanae |
25 May 1992 - 04 Nov 2005 |
Ultimate Holding Company
Lance Richard Goodman - Director
Appointment date: 25 Aug 2006
Address: Waikanae, Waikanae, 5036 New Zealand
Address used since 12 Apr 2013
Vaughan Norman Goodman - Director
Appointment date: 25 Aug 2006
Address: Waikanae, Waikanae, 5036 New Zealand
Address used since 05 Oct 2022
Address: Waikanae, 5036 New Zealand
Address used since 02 Mar 2018
Address: Waikanae, 5036 New Zealand
Address used since 16 Feb 2016
Marianne Therese Archer - Director
Appointment date: 25 Aug 2006
Address: Titahi Bay, Porirua, 5022 New Zealand
Address used since 07 Feb 2008
Stanley Francis Goodman - Director
Appointment date: 25 Aug 2006
Address: Waikanae, Waikanae, 5036 New Zealand
Address used since 05 Oct 2022
Address: Waikanae, Waikanae, 5036 New Zealand
Address used since 02 Mar 2018
Address: Waikanae, 5036 New Zealand
Address used since 16 Feb 2016
Richard Philip Goodman - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 25 Aug 2006
Termination date: 01 Jun 2020
Address: Rd 1, Waikanae, 5391 New Zealand
Address used since 18 Feb 2020
Address: Waikanae, 5391 New Zealand
Address used since 16 Feb 2016
Richard Phillip Goodman - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 06 Jul 1995
Termination date: 30 Aug 2006
Address: Waikanae,
Address used since 04 Nov 2005
Helen Ann Goodman - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 06 Jul 1995
Termination date: 25 Aug 2006
Address: Waikanae,
Address used since 04 Nov 2005
Lance Richard Goodman - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 29 Jul 1992
Termination date: 06 Jul 1995
Address: Paraparaumu,
Address used since 29 Jul 1992
Rachel Mary Campbell - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 29 Jul 1992
Termination date: 06 Jul 1995
Address: Paraparaumu,
Address used since 29 Jul 1992
Goodquip Limited
4 Anne Street
Rick Goodman & Sons Limited
4 Anne Street
Kapiti Coast Museum Incorporated
9 Elizabeth Street
Atiawa Ki Whakarongotai Charitable Trust Board
11 Elizabeth Street
Waikanae Chartered Club Incorporated
8 Elizabeth Street
Groomingtails Nz Limited
4 Elizabeth Street