Tpp Properties Limited, a registered company, was started on 17 Oct 1991. 9429039055897 is the NZ business number it was issued. The company has been run by 2 directors: Anthony John Preen - an active director whose contract started on 17 Oct 1991,
John Silvester Preen - an inactive director whose contract started on 17 Oct 1991 and was terminated on 24 Feb 2003.
Last updated on 18 Jul 2024, the BizDb database contains detailed information about 1 address: 2Nd Floor, 18 Woollcombe Street, Timaru, 7910 (type: physical, service).
Tpp Properties Limited had been using 2Nd Floor, 18 Woollcombe Street, Timaru as their registered address up to 13 Jun 2016.
A total of 1000 shares are allocated to 6 shareholders (3 groups). The first group consists of 250 shares (25%) held by 3 entities. There is also a second group which consists of 2 shareholders in control of 500 shares (50%). Finally we have the third share allotment (250 shares 25%) made up of 1 entity.
Previous addresses
Address #1: 2nd Floor, 18 Woollcombe Street, Timaru, 7910 New Zealand
Registered address used from 21 Jun 2011 to 13 Jun 2016
Address #2: 2nd Floor, 18 Woollcombe Street, Timaru, 7910 New Zealand
Physical address used from 21 Jun 2011 to 13 Jun 2018
Address #3: C/-noone Ford Simpson Ltd, 2nd Floor, 18 Woollcombe Street, Timaru 7910 New Zealand
Physical address used from 10 Jun 2010 to 21 Jun 2011
Address #4: Noone Ford Simpson Ltd, 2nd Floor, 18 Woollcombe Street, Timaru 7910 New Zealand
Registered address used from 10 Jun 2010 to 21 Jun 2011
Address #5: C/-noone Ford Simpson Ltd, 18 Woollcombe Street, Timaru 7910
Physical & registered address used from 29 Mar 2010 to 10 Jun 2010
Address #6: Mcfarlane Hornsey Simpson Ltd, Chartered Accountants, 2 Sefton Street, Timaru
Physical & registered address used from 04 Jul 2006 to 29 Mar 2010
Address #7: C/-macfarlane Hornsey Matthews, Cnr Stafford And Sefton Streets, Timaru
Physical address used from 28 Apr 1999 to 04 Jul 2006
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 1000
Annual return filing month: June
Annual return last filed: 04 Jun 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 250 | |||
Individual | Smith, Richard James |
Timaru 7910 New Zealand |
31 Jul 2017 - |
Individual | Mcfarlane, John Duncan |
Maori Hill Timaru 7910 New Zealand |
31 Jul 2017 - |
Individual | Smith, Wendy Sandra |
Timaru 7910 New Zealand |
07 Sep 2009 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 500 | |||
Individual | Walton, Richard Bertram |
Timaru New Zealand |
17 Oct 1991 - |
Individual | Preen, Anthony John |
Timaru Timaru 7910 New Zealand |
17 Oct 1991 - |
Shares Allocation #3 Number of Shares: 250 | |||
Individual | Beggs, Susan Jane |
Martinborough Martinborough 5711 New Zealand |
07 Sep 2009 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Smith, Philip York |
Takapuna Auckland 0622 New Zealand |
07 Sep 2009 - 31 Jul 2017 |
Individual | Mcfarlane, John Duncan |
Timaru |
01 Jun 2005 - 29 May 2009 |
Individual | Preen, John Silvester |
Timaru |
17 Oct 1991 - 01 Jun 2005 |
Entity | Timpany Walton Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429031897426 Company Number: 131605 |
13 Jun 2011 - 31 Jul 2017 | |
Individual | Preen, Anthony John |
Timaru |
01 Jun 2005 - 29 May 2009 |
Entity | Timpany Walton Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429031897426 Company Number: 131605 |
13 Jun 2011 - 31 Jul 2017 | |
Individual | Butler, David William |
Lower Hutt New Zealand |
07 Sep 2009 - 03 Feb 2014 |
Individual | Preen, Constance Agnes |
Timaru |
01 Jun 2005 - 01 Jun 2005 |
Individual | Beggs, John Mcintyre |
Lower Hutt New Zealand |
07 Sep 2009 - 03 Feb 2014 |
Anthony John Preen - Director
Appointment date: 17 Oct 1991
Address: Timaru, Timaru, 7910 New Zealand
Address used since 07 Sep 2023
Address: West End, Timaru, 7910 New Zealand
Address used since 31 May 2000
Address: Timaru, Timaru, 7910 New Zealand
Address used since 17 Oct 1991
John Silvester Preen - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 17 Oct 1991
Termination date: 24 Feb 2003
Address: Timaru,
Address used since 17 Oct 1991
Avi 2013 Limited
2nd Floor, 18 Woollcombe Street
Kv Amps Electrical Limited
2nd Floor
Avi Solutions Limited
2nd Floor, 18 Woollcombe Street
Glamorous Nails And Foot Spa Limited
2nd Floor
Kenilworth (2013) Limited
18 Woollcombe Street
Heartland Law Trustees Limited
2nd Floor