G and E Williams Consultants Limited, a registered company, was incorporated on 12 Nov 1987. 9429039534309 is the number it was issued. "Civil engineering service" (ANZSIC M692320) is how the company has been classified. The company has been supervised by 2 directors: Emily Beatrice Williams - an active director whose contract began on 12 Nov 1987,
Gary John Williams - an active director whose contract began on 12 Nov 1987.
Updated on 15 Aug 2024, the BizDb data contains detailed information about 1 address: 107 South Manakau Road, Rd 3, Manakau, 5583 (types include: postal, registered).
G and E Williams Consultants Limited had been using 107 South Manakau Road, Rd 3, Otaki as their physical address until 12 Oct 2016.
A total of 1000 shares are issued to 2 shareholders (2 groups). The first group is comprised of 500 shares (50%) held by 1 entity. Next there is the second group which includes 1 shareholder in control of 500 shares (50%).
Previous addresses
Address #1: 107 South Manakau Road, Rd 3, Otaki, 5583 New Zealand
Physical address used from 16 Oct 2014 to 12 Oct 2016
Address #2: 107 South Manakau Road, R D 3, Otaki New Zealand
Physical address used from 24 Sep 2009 to 16 Oct 2014
Address #3: 264 Oxford Street, Levin New Zealand
Registered address used from 27 Oct 2004 to 15 Oct 2018
Address #4: South Manakau Road, Otaki
Registered address used from 29 Sep 2002 to 27 Oct 2004
Address #5: South Manakau Road, R D 1, Otaki
Physical address used from 29 Sep 2002 to 24 Sep 2009
Address #6: Same As The Registered Office
Physical address used from 31 Oct 2000 to 31 Oct 2000
Address #7: South Manakau Road, Horowhenua
Registered address used from 31 Oct 2000 to 29 Sep 2002
Address #8: South Manakau Road, Otaki
Physical address used from 31 Oct 2000 to 29 Sep 2002
Address #9: -
Physical address used from 20 Feb 1992 to 31 Oct 2000
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 1000
Annual return filing month: October
Annual return last filed: 01 Nov 2023
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 500 | |||
Individual | Williams, Emily Beatrice |
R D 3 Otaki 5583 New Zealand |
12 Nov 1987 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 500 | |||
Individual | Williams, Gary John |
R D 3 Otaki 5583 New Zealand |
12 Nov 1987 - |
Emily Beatrice Williams - Director
Appointment date: 12 Nov 1987
Address: Rd 3, Otaki, 5583 New Zealand
Address used since 17 Sep 2009
Gary John Williams - Director
Appointment date: 12 Nov 1987
Address: Rd 3, Otaki, 5583 New Zealand
Address used since 17 Sep 2009
Vidulich Properties Limited
69 South Manakau Road
Spiral Pulse Press Limited
107 South Manakau Road
Print & More Limited
111 Sounth Manakau
Toolbox Imaging Limited
111 South Manakau Road
Miles Udy Motors Limited
40 Manakau Heights Drive
Csg Trade Services Limited
8 Hanawera Ridge Road
Bjaz Consulting Limited
75 Seaview Road
Mach 1 Contracting Limited
442 Te Moana Road
Nrr Consulting Limited
30 Freyberg Crescent
Seajay Consulting Engineers Limited
42 Michael Road
Simpson Cattle And Timber Company Limited
NZ Limited Company
Westside Consulting Engineers Limited
45 Ngapaki Street