Hobbs & Banks Limited was incorporated on 30 Jan 1987 and issued a New Zealand Business Number of 9429039651273. This registered LTD company has been run by 3 directors: Peter Gregory Hobbs - an active director whose contract started on 27 Aug 1991,
Donald Moesbury Banks - an inactive director whose contract started on 21 Jul 1995 and was terminated on 26 Jun 2013,
Rhonda Joy Currie - an inactive director whose contract started on 27 Aug 1991 and was terminated on 21 Jul 1995.
According to our data (updated on 21 Aug 2024), this company registered 1 address: 144 Tancred Street, Ashburton, 7700 (category: physical, registered).
Until 05 Jul 2017, Hobbs & Banks Limited had been using 73 Burnett Street, Ashburton as their physical address.
BizDb found old names for this company: from 17 Sep 1991 to 09 Oct 1995 they were called Hobbs and Currie Limited, from 30 Jan 1987 to 17 Sep 1991 they were called W G & L A Currie Limited.
A total of 500 shares are allocated to 2 groups (2 shareholders in total). As far as the first group is concerned, 1 share is held by 1 entity, namely:
Johnston, Diane Maree (an individual) located at Rd 22, Geraldine postcode 7992.
Then there is a group that consists of 1 shareholder, holds 99.8 per cent shares (exactly 499 shares) and includes
Hobbs, Peter Gregory - located at Rd 22, Geraldine.
Previous addresses
Address: 73 Burnett Street, Ashburton New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 22 Jan 1999 to 05 Jul 2017
Address: -
Physical address used from 22 Jan 1999 to 22 Jan 1999
Address: 201-213 West Street, Ashburton
Registered address used from 22 Jan 1999 to 22 Jan 1999
Address: Mckenzie Whittaker, Level 17 Clarendon Tower, 76 Worcester Street, Christchurch
Registered address used from 20 Feb 1992 to 22 Jan 1999
Address: C/o Ernst & Whinney, 76 Hereford St, Christchurch
Registered address used from 18 Dec 1991 to 20 Feb 1992
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 500
Annual return filing month: August
Annual return last filed: 24 Aug 2023
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 1 | |||
Individual | Johnston, Diane Maree |
Rd 22 Geraldine 7992 New Zealand |
08 Oct 2014 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 499 | |||
Individual | Hobbs, Peter Gregory |
Rd 22 Geraldine 7992 New Zealand |
30 Jan 1987 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Banks, Donald Moesbury |
Geraldine Geraldine 7930 New Zealand |
30 Jan 1987 - 30 Jul 2013 |
Peter Gregory Hobbs - Director
Appointment date: 27 Aug 1991
Address: Rd 22, Geraldine, 7992 New Zealand
Address used since 03 Aug 2015
Donald Moesbury Banks - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 21 Jul 1995
Termination date: 26 Jun 2013
Address: Geraldine, 7930 New Zealand
Address used since 26 Aug 2010
Rhonda Joy Currie - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 27 Aug 1991
Termination date: 21 Jul 1995
Address: Geraldine,
Address used since 27 Aug 1991
Ashburton Range Users Association Incorporated
C/o Messrs Spencer & Walker
Ruralco Nz Limited
97 Burnett Street
Pro-active N.z. Limited
97 Burnett Street
Diesel Performance Solutions Canterbury Limited
123 Burnett Street
Pastoral Improvements Limited
123 Burnett Street
Matthews Design Limited
123 Burnett Street