Bolivar Associates Limited, a registered company, was started on 01 Aug 1986. 9429039714954 is the business number it was issued. "Human relations consultancy service" (ANZSIC M696240) is how the company is classified. The company has been supervised by 2 directors: Susan Mcleary - an active director whose contract started on 04 May 1988,
Richard Stanley Rudman - an active director whose contract started on 04 May 1988.
Updated on 16 Aug 2024, our data contains detailed information about 1 address: Po Box 73, Martinborough, 5741 (category: postal, postal).
Bolivar Associates Limited had been using 28 Grey Street, Martinbourgh as their physical address until 13 Jul 2006.
Former names for this company, as we identified at BizDb, included: from 01 Aug 1986 to 09 Aug 1993 they were named Richard Rudman Associates Limited.
A total of 100 shares are allocated to 2 shareholders (2 groups). The first group includes 49 shares (49%) held by 1 entity. Next we have the second group which consists of 1 shareholder in control of 51 shares (51%).
Other active addresses
Address #4: 28 Grey Street, Martinborough, 5711 New Zealand
Office & delivery address used from 16 Jul 2019
Address #5: P O Box 73, Martinborough, 5741 New Zealand
Invoice address used from 16 Jul 2019
Address #6: Po Box 73, Martinborough, 5741 New Zealand
Postal address used from 26 Jul 2023
Principal place of activity
28 Grey Street, Martinborough, 5711 New Zealand
Previous addresses
Address #1: 28 Grey Street, Martinbourgh
Physical address used from 01 May 2006 to 13 Jul 2006
Address #2: Spicer & Oppenheim, 89 Courtenay Place, Wellington
Registered address used from 06 Nov 2000 to 06 Sep 2007
Address #3: Grant Thornton, Level 13, 80 The Terrace, Wellington
Physical address used from 06 Nov 2000 to 01 May 2006
Address #4: C/- 3rd Floor, Cmc Building, 89 Courtenay Place, Wellington
Physical address used from 06 Nov 2000 to 06 Nov 2000
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: July
Annual return last filed: 30 Jul 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 49 | |||
Individual | Mcleary, Susan |
Martinborough 5711 New Zealand |
01 Aug 1986 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 51 | |||
Individual | Rudman, Richard Stanley |
Martinborough 5711 New Zealand |
01 Aug 1986 - |
Susan Mcleary - Director
Appointment date: 04 May 1988
Address: Martinborough, Martinborough, 5711 New Zealand
Address used since 21 Jun 2010
Richard Stanley Rudman - Director
Appointment date: 04 May 1988
Address: Martinborough, Martinborough, 5711 New Zealand
Address used since 21 Jun 2010
Peonies Limited
22a Grey St
Dedico Limited
22a Grey Street
Chester And Reilly Developments Limited
22a Grey Street
Mala Limited
34 Grey St
Vision United Trust Limited
33c Grey Street
Onesource Limited
4 Waka Lane
Bj Associates Limited
1677 Ponatahi Road
Bright Teams Limited
39 Jellicoe Street
Hr Solutions Limited
38 Bannister Street
Nudge Consulting Limited
34a Akatarawa Road
Parkvale Investments Limited
176 Woodlands Rd
The Referral Network Limited
41 Emerald Hill Drive