M J & K A Sinclair Limited, a registered company, was started on 01 May 1979. 9429040204628 is the NZ business number it was issued. The company has been supervised by 2 directors: Murray John Sinclair - an active director whose contract started on 18 Jun 1990,
Kerry Ann Sinclair - an active director whose contract started on 18 Jun 1990.
Updated on 25 Jul 2024, our data contains detailed information about 1 address: Building A, Level 1, Farming House, 211 Market Street South, Hastings, 4122 (category: registered, physical).
M J & K A Sinclair Limited had been using Building A, Level 1, Farming House, 211 Market Street South, Hastings as their registered address until 05 Aug 2019.
A total of 10000 shares are issued to 2 shareholders (2 groups). The first group includes 5000 shares (50%) held by 1 entity. Next we have the second group which consists of 1 shareholder in control of 5000 shares (50%).
Previous addresses
Address: Building A, Level 1, Farming House, 211 Market Street South, Hastings, 4122 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 04 Jul 2018 to 05 Aug 2019
Address: 208-210 Avenue Road East, Hastings, 4122 New Zealand
Registered address used from 08 Aug 2013 to 04 Jul 2018
Address: 208-210 Avenue Road East, Hastings, 4122 New Zealand
Physical address used from 06 Aug 2010 to 04 Jul 2018
Address: 208-210 Avenue Road East, Hastings, 4122 New Zealand
Registered address used from 06 Aug 2010 to 08 Aug 2013
Address: Whk Coffey Davidson, 208-210 Avenue Road East, Hastings New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 01 Aug 2007 to 06 Aug 2010
Address: Same As Registered Office
Physical address used from 18 Aug 1998 to 01 Aug 2007
Address: Coffey Davidson Ltd, 303n Karamu Road, Hastings
Physical address used from 18 Aug 1998 to 18 Aug 1998
Address: Coffey Davidson & Partners, Chartered Accountants, 303 N Karamu Road, Hastings
Registered address used from 01 May 1998 to 01 Aug 2007
Address: Same As Registered Office
Physical address used from 01 May 1998 to 18 Aug 1998
Address: C/- Coffey Davidson & Partners, Chartered Accountants, 120 N Karamu Road, Hastings
Registered address used from 14 Jul 1996 to 01 May 1998
Address: -
Physical address used from 17 Feb 1992 to 01 May 1998
Address: C/- Kpmg Peat Marwick, Chartered Accountants, 120 N Karamu Road, Hastings
Registered address used from 17 Feb 1992 to 14 Jul 1996
Address: Peat Marwick, 120n Karamu Road, Hastings
Registered address used from 24 Jan 1992 to 17 Feb 1992
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 10000
Annual return filing month: July
Annual return last filed: 02 Jul 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 5000 | |||
Individual | Sinclair, Murray John |
Ahuriri Napier 4110 New Zealand |
01 May 1979 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 5000 | |||
Individual | Sinclair, Kerry Ann |
Ahuriri Napier 4110 New Zealand |
01 May 1979 - |
Murray John Sinclair - Director
Appointment date: 18 Jun 1990
Address: Ahuriri, Napier, 4110 New Zealand
Address used since 29 Jul 2010
Kerry Ann Sinclair - Director
Appointment date: 18 Jun 1990
Address: Ahuriri, Napier, 4110 New Zealand
Address used since 29 Jul 2010
Tkw Holdings Limited
208-210 Avenue Road East
Dominion Buildings 2010 Limited
208-210 Avenue Road East
Zusammen Investments Limited
208-210 Avenue Road East
Hallamshire Property Limited
208-210 Avenue Road East
Tripwire Wine Consulting Limited
208-210 Avenue Road East
Ferrydale Crop Limited
208-210 Avenue Road East