Telmac Property Limited, a registered company, was launched on 19 Mar 1953. 9429040725376 is the NZ business number it was issued. This company has been managed by 3 directors: Tiffiny Antonia Irwin - an active director whose contract started on 30 Jul 1991,
Giselle Rowan Irwin - an active director whose contract started on 30 Jul 1991,
Giselle Rowen Irwin - an active director whose contract started on 30 Jul 1991.
Updated on 16 Aug 2024, our database contains detailed information about 3 addresses the company registered, specifically: 230C Jervois Road, Herne Bay, Auckland, 1011 (physical address),
230C Jervois Road, Herne Bay, Auckland, 1011 (service address),
38 Wharf Road, Ponsonby, Auckland, 1011 (other address),
230C Jervois Road, Herne Bay, Auckland, 1011 (registered address) among others.
Telmac Property Limited had been using 38 Wharf Road, Ponsonby, Auckland as their physical address up until 20 Sep 2022.
Previous aliases for the company, as we identified at BizDb, included: from 15 May 1964 to 15 Mar 2018 they were named Telmac Television Rental & Service 1964 Limited, from 19 Mar 1953 to 15 May 1964 they were named Palmers Displays (N.z.) Limited.
A single entity controls all company shares (exactly 900 shares) - Telmac Trustee Limited - located at 1011, Herne Bay, Auckland.
Previous addresses
Address #1: 38 Wharf Road, Ponsonby, Auckland, 1011 New Zealand
Physical address used from 20 May 2019 to 20 Sep 2022
Address #2: 46 Hamilton Rd, Herne Bay, Auckland
Physical address used from 26 May 2000 to 26 May 2000
Address #3: 230c Jervois Road, Herne Bay, Auckland, 1011 New Zealand
Physical address used from 26 May 2000 to 20 May 2019
Address #4: 46 Hamilton Rd, Herne Bay, Auckland
Registered address used from 20 Jun 1999 to 20 Jun 1999
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 900
Annual return filing month: May
Annual return last filed: 15 May 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation Number of Shares: 900 | |||
Other (Other) | Telmac Trustee Limited |
Herne Bay Auckland 1011 New Zealand |
01 Jun 2007 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Entity | Telmac Trustee Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429034596425 Company Number: 1680942 |
24 May 2006 - 27 Jun 2010 | |
Entity | Telmac Trustee Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429034596425 Company Number: 1680942 |
24 May 2006 - 27 Jun 2010 | |
Individual | Irwin, Tiffiny Antonia |
Herne Bay Auckland |
19 Mar 1953 - 24 May 2006 |
Individual | Irwin, Giselle Rowen |
Herne Bay Auckland |
19 Mar 1953 - 24 May 2006 |
Tiffiny Antonia Irwin - Director
Appointment date: 30 Jul 1991
Address: Buli, Nsw, 2516 Australia
Address used since 02 May 2023
Address: Herne Bay, Auckland, 1011 New Zealand
Address used since 30 Jul 1991
Giselle Rowan Irwin - Director
Appointment date: 30 Jul 1991
Address: Ponsonby, Auckland, 1011 New Zealand
Address used since 25 Aug 2010
Giselle Rowen Irwin - Director
Appointment date: 30 Jul 1991
Address: Ponsonby, Auckland, 1011 New Zealand
Address used since 25 Aug 2010
Tessuti 2011 Limited
224 Jervois Road
Grant Dillon Limited
222 Jervois Road
H K Psychotherapy Limited
222 Jervois Road
Weidong Trading Limited
238a Jervois Road
Nisash Limited
238a Jervois Road
P. Hogg Medical Limited
2 A Albany Road