Unicorn Ventures Limited, a registered company, was launched on 11 Nov 2013. 9429040993256 is the NZ business identifier it was issued. "Bar - licensed" (business classification H452010) is how the company has been categorised. The company has been supervised by 6 directors: Jonah Saul Merchant - an active director whose contract started on 11 Nov 2013,
Jonah Merchant - an active director whose contract started on 11 Nov 2013,
Lachlan Sherwood Sloan - an active director whose contract started on 31 Mar 2017,
Nicholas Shewring - an inactive director whose contract started on 01 Jan 2016 and was terminated on 10 Aug 2018,
Philip Morgan Williams - an inactive director whose contract started on 11 Nov 2013 and was terminated on 25 Sep 2015.
Last updated on 30 Aug 2024, the BizDb database contains detailed information about 1 address: 103 Old Mill Road, Westmere, Auckland, 1022 (types include: registered, physical).
Unicorn Ventures Limited had been using Level 9, 4 Willamson Ave, Ponsonby, Auckland as their registered address until 22 Jun 2020.
One entity controls all company shares (exactly 66 shares) - Bdg Group Limited - located at 1022, Rd 2, Dairy Flat.
Previous addresses
Address: Level 9, 4 Willamson Ave, Ponsonby, Auckland, 1021 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 16 Dec 2019 to 22 Jun 2020
Address: Floor 4, 165 The Strand, Parnell, Auckland, 1010 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 15 Feb 2018 to 16 Dec 2019
Address: 101 Pakenham Street, Auckland Central, Auckland, 1010 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 09 Feb 2017 to 15 Feb 2018
Address: Suite 205, Ironbank, 150 Karangahape Road, Auckland, 1010 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 11 Nov 2013 to 09 Feb 2017
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 66
Annual return filing month: September
Annual return last filed: 31 Oct 2023
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation Number of Shares: 66 | |||
Entity (NZ Limited Company) | Bdg Group Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429031899864 |
Rd 2 Dairy Flat 0792 New Zealand |
01 Oct 2015 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Shewring, Nicholas |
Te Aro Wellington 6011 New Zealand |
11 Nov 2013 - 03 Feb 2015 |
Entity | Second Sphere Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037275709 Company Number: 1032421 |
11 Nov 2013 - 01 Oct 2015 | |
Entity | Second Sphere Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037275709 Company Number: 1032421 |
11 Nov 2013 - 01 Oct 2015 | |
Director | Nicholas Shewring |
Te Aro Wellington 6011 New Zealand |
11 Nov 2013 - 03 Feb 2015 |
Director | Merchant, Jonah |
Westmere Auckland 1022 New Zealand |
11 Nov 2013 - 01 Oct 2015 |
Jonah Saul Merchant - Director
Appointment date: 11 Nov 2013
Address: Westmere, Auckland, 1022 New Zealand
Jonah Merchant - Director
Appointment date: 11 Nov 2013
Address: Westmere, Auckland, 1022 New Zealand
Lachlan Sherwood Sloan - Director
Appointment date: 31 Mar 2017
Address: Rd 2, Albany, 0792 New Zealand
Address used since 31 Mar 2017
Nicholas Shewring - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 01 Jan 2016
Termination date: 10 Aug 2018
Address: Newtown, Wellington, 6021 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Jan 2016
Philip Morgan Williams - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 11 Nov 2013
Termination date: 25 Sep 2015
Address: Grey Lynn, Auckland, 1021 New Zealand
Address used since 11 Nov 2013
Nicholas Shewring - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 11 Nov 2013
Termination date: 25 Nov 2013
Address: Grey Lynn, Auckland, 1010 New Zealand
Address used since 11 Nov 2013
The New Zealand Company Limited
Flat 4i, 118 Gladstone Road
Mpjr Orthopaedics Limited
Flat 3i, 118 Gladstone Road
M. J. Jordan Limited
Flat 2k, 118 Gladstone Road
Gladstone Management (2014) Limited
Flat 4e, 118 Gladstone Road
Metrix Imports Limited
Metrix Building, 155 The Strand
Nzpm Co-operative Limited
Metrix Building, 155 The Strand
A W & M L Limited
1 Gibraltar Crescent
Dentedileonessa Limited
15 Nicholls Lane
Lc Entertainment Limited
11 York Street
Park World Limited
1b/27 Falcon Street
Saloon Saloon Limited
16 Burrows Avenue
Union Hospitality Concepts Limited
Level 2, 347 Parnell Road