Crohloff Trustees Limited was started on 20 May 2014 and issued an NZ business identifier of 9429041243763. The registered LTD company has been supervised by 1 director, named Carey James Rohloff - an active director whose contract began on 20 May 2014.
As stated in our data (last updated on 21 Aug 2024), this company filed 1 address: 25 Drummond Crescent, Kelson, Lower Hutt, 5010 (types include: postal, office).
Up until 13 Apr 2018, Crohloff Trustees Limited had been using Level 1, 8 Raroa Road, Hutt Central, Lower Hutt as their physical address.
A total of 1 share is issued to 1 group (1 sole shareholder). When considering the first group, 1 share is held by 1 entity, namely:
Rohloff, Carey James (a director) located at Kelson, Lower Hutt postcode 5010. Crohloff Trustees Limited was classified as "Trustee service" (business classification K641965).
Principal place of activity
25 Drummond Crescent, Kelson, Lower Hutt, 5010 New Zealand
Previous addresses
Address #1: Level 1, 8 Raroa Road, Hutt Central, Lower Hutt, 5010 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 12 Apr 2016 to 13 Apr 2018
Address #2: Level 6, 15 Daly Street, Lower Hutt, Wellington, 5040 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 20 May 2014 to 12 Apr 2016
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 1
Annual return filing month: April
Annual return last filed: 08 May 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation Number of Shares: 1 | |||
Director | Rohloff, Carey James |
Kelson Lower Hutt 5010 New Zealand |
20 May 2014 - |
Carey James Rohloff - Director
Appointment date: 20 May 2014
Address: Kelson, Lower Hutt, 5010 New Zealand
Address used since 22 May 2014
Gel Business Systems Limited
25 Drummond Crescent
Gel-e (nz) Limited
25 Drummond Crescent
Business Process Enhancement Limited
25 Drummond Crescent
Outram Public Library Incorporated
C/o Mrs O Neilson
Pentad Consulting Limited
3 Outram Grove
Cards And Collectables Limited
15 Drummond Crescent
Bkl Corporate Trustee Bft Limited
41 Percy Cameron Street
Bkl Corporate Trustee M-b Limited
41 Percy Cameron Street
Bkl Corporate Trustee Met & Mft Limited
Level 8, Avalon Tower
Dr Richard Lai Foreign Exchange Limited
37 Waipounamu Drive
Miras Trustees Limited
12 Lone Tree Grove
Pipadi Trustee Limited
10 Lone Tree Grove