Our Vacation Centre Nz Limited, a registered company, was incorporated on 25 Jul 2014. 9429041341162 is the NZBN it was issued. "Travel agency service" (business classification N722060) is how the company has been categorised. This company has been managed by 7 directors: Michael Joseph N. - an active director whose contract began on 01 Oct 2021,
John Anson Williams - an active director whose contract began on 31 Mar 2022,
Steven Daniel B. - an inactive director whose contract began on 18 Jan 2021 and was terminated on 01 Aug 2023,
Kevin John Sharp - an inactive director whose contract began on 25 Jul 2014 and was terminated on 31 Mar 2022,
Christine A. - an inactive director whose contract began on 31 Jul 2018 and was terminated on 27 Jul 2020.
Last updated on 25 Jul 2024, the BizDb database contains detailed information about 1 address: Suite G3, 27 Gillies Avenue, Newmarket, Auckland, 1023 (type: registered, physical).
Our Vacation Centre Nz Limited had been using Suite G3, 27 Gillies Avenue, Newmarket, Auckland as their physical address up until 04 Aug 2020.
One entity owns all company shares (exactly 40000 shares) - 093 912 791 - I.c.e. Vacations Asia Pacific Pty Ltd - located at 1023, Helensvale, Queensland.
Previous addresses
Address: Suite G3, 27 Gillies Avenue, Newmarket, Auckland, 1023 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 03 Dec 2019 to 04 Aug 2020
Address: Suite G3, 27 Gillies Avenue, Newmarket, Auckland, 1023 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 21 Dec 2016 to 03 Dec 2019
Address: 39 Maungawhau Road, Epsom, Auckland, 1023 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 25 Jul 2014 to 21 Dec 2016
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 40000
Annual return filing month: July
Financial report filing month: March
Annual return last filed: 02 Jul 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation Number of Shares: 40000 | |||
Other (Other) | 093 912 791 - I.c.e. Vacations Asia Pacific Pty Ltd |
Helensvale Queensland 4212 Australia |
25 Jul 2014 - |
Ultimate Holding Company
Michael Joseph N. - Director
Appointment date: 01 Oct 2021
John Anson Williams - Director
Appointment date: 31 Mar 2022
ASIC Name: I.c.e. Vacations Asia Pacific Pty Ltd
Address: Westfield Tc, Helensvale,, Queensland, 4212 Australia
Address: Labrador, Queensland, 4215 Australia
Address used since 31 Mar 2022
Steven Daniel B. - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 18 Jan 2021
Termination date: 01 Aug 2023
Kevin John Sharp - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 25 Jul 2014
Termination date: 31 Mar 2022
ASIC Name: I.c.e. Vacations Asia Pacific Pty Ltd
Address: Helensvale, Queensland, 4212 Australia
Address used since 27 Jul 2020
Address: Westfield Tc, Helensvale, Queensland, 4212 Australia
Address: Monerey Keys, Queensland, 4212 Australia
Address used since 25 Jul 2014
Christine A. - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 31 Jul 2018
Termination date: 27 Jul 2020
Address: Phoenix, Arizona, 85022 United States
Address used since 31 Jul 2018
John R. - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 31 Jul 2018
Termination date: 27 Jul 2020
Address: Scottsdale, Arizona, 85255 United States
Address used since 31 Jul 2018
Marcia R. - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 31 Jul 2018
Termination date: 27 Jul 2020
Address: Scottsdale, Arizona, 85255 United States
Address used since 31 Jul 2018
Whenuapai Drop Zone Limited
Suite G3, 27 Gillies Avenue
Sandman Lodge Auckland Limited
Suite 203, 27 Gillies Avenue
Pinnacle Life Limited
Level 2, Gillies Avenue Office Park
Natural Source New Zealand Limited
Suite G1, 27 Gillies Avenue
Travoliday Limited
Suite G3, 27 Gillies Avenue
Nz Ev Conversions Limited
Suite G1, 27 Gillies Avenue
Concept Travel Limited
Suite G3, 27 Gillies Avenue
Cornelius Properties Limited
Suite G3, 27 Gillies Avenue
Orion Travel Services Limited
Suite G3, 27 Gillies Avenue
Ski Travel Specialists Limited
Suite G3, 27 Gillies Avenue
Travoliday Limited
Suite G3, 27 Gillies Avenue
Whenuapai Drop Zone Limited
Suite G3, 27 Gillies Avenue