Rimmer Construction Limited was registered on 12 Aug 2014 and issued a business number of 9429041346594. This registered LTD company has been managed by 2 directors: Brendon Nutsford - an active director whose contract started on 12 Aug 2014,
Timothy Barrett - an inactive director whose contract started on 12 Aug 2014 and was terminated on 14 Jan 2019.
According to BizDb's information (updated on 15 Sep 2024), this company uses 1 address: 172 Rimmer Road, Rd 2, Helensville, 0875 (category: registered, physical).
Until 16 Aug 2019, Rimmer Construction Limited had been using 192 Rimmer Road, Helensville as their registered address.
A total of 100 shares are allotted to 1 group (1 sole shareholder). As far as the first group is concerned, 100 shares are held by 1 entity, namely:
Nutsford, Brendon (a director) located at Rd 2, Helensville postcode 0875. Rimmer Construction Limited was classified as "Building, house construction" (ANZSIC E301120).
Principal place of activity
172 Rimmer Road, Rd 2, Helensville, 0875 New Zealand
Previous addresses
Address: 192 Rimmer Road, Helensville, 0932 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 26 Jun 2019 to 16 Aug 2019
Address: 27 Mckenzie Avenue, Arkles Bay, Whangaparaoa, 0932 New Zealand
Physical address used from 13 Aug 2015 to 26 Jun 2019
Address: 27 Mckenzie Avenue, Arkles Bay, Whangaparaoa, 0932 New Zealand
Physical address used from 20 Aug 2014 to 13 Aug 2015
Address: 27 Mckenzie Avenue, Arkles Bay, Whangaparaoa, 0932 New Zealand
Registered address used from 20 Aug 2014 to 26 Jun 2019
Address: 244 Wharawhara Road, Rd 2, Katikati, 3178 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 12 Aug 2014 to 20 Aug 2014
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: August
Annual return last filed: 24 Aug 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation Number of Shares: 100 | |||
Director | Nutsford, Brendon |
Rd 2 Helensville 0875 New Zealand |
12 Aug 2014 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Barrett, Timothy |
Arkles Bay Whangaparaoa 0932 New Zealand |
12 Aug 2014 - 18 Jun 2019 |
Brendon Nutsford - Director
Appointment date: 12 Aug 2014
Address: Rd 2, Helensville, 0875 New Zealand
Address used since 12 Aug 2014
Timothy Barrett - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 12 Aug 2014
Termination date: 14 Jan 2019
Address: Arkles Bay, Whangaparaoa, 0932 New Zealand
Address used since 12 Aug 2014
Eugenia Holdings Limited
32a Wade River Road
Self Works Limited
28 Wade River Road
Skin Deep Beauty Products Limited
5 Herman Street
Perry Builders Limited
2 Herman Street
Waymar Holdings Limited
1c Wade River Road, Shop 12, The Mall
Target Electrical Limited
1 Wade River Road, Shop 12, The Mall
Brm Limited
767 Whangaparaoa Road
Duncan Building Services Limited
5 Rishworth Avenue
Hard Yardz (2013) Limited
747 Whangaparaoa Road
Jmld Enterprises Limited
760 Whangaparaoa Road
T L D Construction Limited
85b Mckenzie Avenue
Usn New Zealand Limited
7c Arkles Strand