Mamaj Limited was incorporated on 20 Mar 2015 and issued an NZ business identifier of 9429041665947. The registered LTD company has been managed by 3 directors: Asha Govind - an active director whose contract started on 20 Mar 2015,
Mahesh Keshav Govind - an active director whose contract started on 20 Mar 2015,
Sunita Patel - an inactive director whose contract started on 27 Jul 2016 and was terminated on 01 Apr 2019.
As stated in our data (last updated on 26 Aug 2024), this company uses 1 address: 32 Henley Road, Mount Eden, Auckland, 1024 (type: registered, physical).
Up to 08 Aug 2019, Mamaj Limited had been using 6 Aberfoyle Street, Epsom, Auckland as their registered address.
A total of 10 shares are allotted to 2 groups (2 shareholders in total). In the first group, 5 shares are held by 1 entity, namely:
Govind, Mahesh Keshav (a director) located at Mount Eden, Auckland postcode 1024.
The 2nd group consists of 1 shareholder, holds 50 per cent shares (exactly 5 shares) and includes
Govind, Asha - located at Mount Eden, Auckland. Mamaj Limited has been classified as "Rental of residential property" (business classification L671160).
Previous addresses
Address: 6 Aberfoyle Street, Epsom, Auckland, 1023 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 08 Aug 2016 to 08 Aug 2019
Address: 32 Henley Road, Mount Eden, Auckland, 1024 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 20 Mar 2015 to 08 Aug 2016
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 10
Annual return filing month: July
Annual return last filed: 29 Jul 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 5 | |||
Director | Govind, Mahesh Keshav |
Mount Eden Auckland 1024 New Zealand |
20 Mar 2015 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 5 | |||
Director | Govind, Asha |
Mount Eden Auckland 1024 New Zealand |
20 Mar 2015 - |
Asha Govind - Director
Appointment date: 20 Mar 2015
Address: Mount Eden, Auckland, 1024 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Apr 2019
Address: Camberwell, Victoria, 3124 Australia
Address used since 29 Jul 2016
Mahesh Keshav Govind - Director
Appointment date: 20 Mar 2015
Address: Mount Eden, Auckland, 1024 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Apr 2019
Address: Camberwell, Victoria, 3124 Australia
Address used since 29 Jul 2016
Sunita Patel - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 27 Jul 2016
Termination date: 01 Apr 2019
Address: Hillcrest, Auckland, 0627 New Zealand
Address used since 27 Jul 2016
Gary James Engineering Limited
3 Balmoral Road
Mt Smart Properties Limited
12 Balmoral Road
Graphic Detail Nz Limited
12 Balmoral Road
A. B. C. Photosigns Nz Limited
12 Balmoral Road
Abc Original Print Limited
12 Balmoral Road
Linear Standby Belts Limited
8 Balmoral Road
North East Capital Limited
22b Aberfoyle Street
Prashar Holdings Limited
43 Pencarrow Avenue
Southeast Hedge Mountain Limited
64 St Andrews Road
Southern Mountain Limited
64 St Andrews Road
Success Liu Limited
Flat 2, 86a King George Avenue
Vanilla Pantry Limited
8 Morvern Road